Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-006899 Judge: Kemp, Michael
File Date: 6/9/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Advocates For Individuals With Disabilities Foundation Inc   Plaintiff    Peter Strojnik 
G M B Investments L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/14/2016  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  7/14/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
7/5/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/12/2016   
NOTE: GMB INVESTMENTS LLC 
7/5/2016  SUM - Summons  7/7/2016   
6/9/2016  COM - Complaint  6/14/2016   
6/9/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/14/2016   
6/9/2016  CSH - Coversheet  6/14/2016   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file