Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-006681 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 5/12/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Advocates For Individuals With Disabilities L L C   Plaintiff    Peter Strojnik 
David Ritzenthaler   Plaintiff  Male  Peter Strojnik 
G M B Investments L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/28/2016  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  7/28/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
5/27/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/3/2016   
NOTE: GMB INVESTMENTS LLC 
5/27/2016  SUM - Summons  6/1/2016   
5/12/2016  COM - Complaint  5/13/2016   
5/12/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/13/2016   
5/12/2016  CSH - Coversheet  5/13/2016   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file