Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-006626 Judge: Smith, James
File Date: 5/11/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Advocates For Individuals With Disabilities L L C   Plaintiff    Peter Strojnik 
David Ritzenthaler   Plaintiff  Male  Peter Strojnik 
Sharon Lynn Olsen   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
James R Olsen   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
State Of Arizona   Intervenor    Matthew Du Mee 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/22/2016  CME - Credit Memo  9/22/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo 
9/19/2016  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  9/20/2016   
NOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR LIMITED PURPOSES, SET A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ALLOW LEAVE TO SERVE BY OTHER MEANS AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION 
6/20/2016  ANS - Answer  6/22/2016  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: ANSWER 
5/25/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/2/2016   
NOTE: SHARON LYNN AND JAMES R OLSEN 
5/25/2016  SUM - Summons  5/26/2016   
5/11/2016  COM - Complaint  5/12/2016   
5/11/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/12/2016   
5/11/2016  CSH - Coversheet  5/12/2016   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file