« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2016-000410
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
1/15/2016
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Stearns Bank N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jeremy Goodman
Party Name
Hogan Manufacturing L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Kenneth Neeley
Party Name
Robert L Hogan
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kenneth Neeley
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2016
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice
Filing Date
3/9/2016
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2016
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Filing Date
2/26/2016
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
2/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2016
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Default and Application for Entry of Default
Filing Date
2/22/2016
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
2/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2016
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
2/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/4/2016
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
2/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
(Request for Hearing)NOTICE Pursuant to A.R.S. ยง 12-2405
Filing Date
1/26/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
HOGAN MANUFACTURING LLC
Filing Date
1/26/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT L HOGAN
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/2/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/4/2016
Time
10:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.