« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2015-092916
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Thompson
File Date:
8/7/2015
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Discover Bank
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Douglas Christensen
Party Name
Jaime R Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2016
Description
323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv
Docket Date
2/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2016
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/11/2015
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
11/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.