Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-055588 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Julian
File Date: 5/14/2015 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Koranda L L C   Plaintiff    Scott Baluha 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Kayla M Burrell   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/4/2015  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  9/4/2015   
9/2/2015  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  9/2/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice 
8/21/2015  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  8/26/2015   
NOTE: SABIN L BURRELL & KAYLA M BURRELL AKAK KAYLA M JANTZ 
8/19/2015  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  8/19/2015   
7/24/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed  7/24/2015   
7/23/2015  ORD - Order  7/24/2015   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE 
7/17/2015  MOT - Motion  7/17/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Alternate Service 
5/14/2015  COM - Complaint  5/15/2015   
5/14/2015  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  5/15/2015   
5/14/2015  CSH - Coversheet  5/15/2015   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file