« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-051915 Judge: Bailey, Cynthia
File Date: 5/14/2015 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Janet Frintner   Plaintiff  Female  Donald Yearin 
Anasazi Village Condominiums Homeowners Association Inc   Defendant    Francis Passaro 
A A M, L L C   Defendant    Jeffrey Smith 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/12/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  8/12/2016   
NOTE: ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE 
8/11/2016  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  8/11/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 
5/23/2016  ORD - Order  5/23/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES 
5/19/2016  STP - Stipulation  5/19/2016   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines 
3/1/2016  ORD - Order  3/1/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES 
2/25/2016  MOT - Motion  2/25/2016   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines 
11/11/2015  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  11/11/2015   
10/21/2015  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  10/21/2015   
10/13/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  10/13/2015   
10/12/2015  SCO – Scheduling Order  10/13/2015   
10/7/2015  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  10/7/2015   
NOTE: Joint Report 
7/31/2015  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  7/31/2015   
NOTE: Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration 
7/31/2015  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  7/31/2015   
NOTE: Rule 38 Jury Trial Request 
7/31/2015  ANS - Answer  7/31/2015   
NOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $237 
6/17/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/18/2015   
NOTE: AAM LLC 
6/12/2015  ANS - Answer  6/12/2015   
NOTE: Defendant AAM, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint / EFILE BILLING $237 
6/12/2015  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  6/12/2015   
NOTE: Defendant AAM, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration 
6/12/2015  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  6/12/2015   
NOTE: Defendant AAM LLC's Demand for Jury Trial 
6/11/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/16/2015   
NOTE: AAM LLC 
5/27/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/29/2015   
NOTE: ANASAZI VILLAGE CONDOMINIUMS HOA 
5/14/2015  COM - Complaint  5/18/2015   
5/14/2015  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/18/2015   
5/14/2015  CSH - Coversheet  5/18/2015   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center