Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2015-013391 | Judge: | Thomason, Timothy |
File Date: | 12/7/2015 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Nicholas Bonnes | Plaintiff | Male | Scott Ambrose |
Angelina Merrill | Plaintiff | Female | David Teselle |
Erika Elam-Prewitt | Plaintiff | Female | Holly Kammerer |
Donna Rector | Plaintiff | Female | Brian Dault |
Anastacia Moore | Plaintiff | Female | Holly Kammerer |
Mary Salinas | Plaintiff | Female | Brian Dault |
Jane Meier | Plaintiff | Female | Brian Dault |
Biological Resource Center Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Stephen Gore | Defendant | Male | Timothy O'Connor |
Sally Gore | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Linda Olson | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Dennis L Furr | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Michael J Bauer | Defendant | Male | Heather Bushor |
International Biological Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Arthur Rathburn | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Elizabeth Rathburn | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Platinum Medical L L C | Defendant | Matthew Pierce | |
Charles Oddo | Defendant | Male | Matthew Pierce |
Amy Oddo | Defendant | Female | Matthew Pierce |
Sutton Memorial Funeral Home Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Vista Hospice Care Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
C L P Healthcare Services Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
International Biological Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Arthur Rathburn | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Elizabeth Rathburn | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Platinum Medical Inc | Defendant | Eileen Gilbride | |
Sutton Memorial Funeral Home Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Vista Hospice Care Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
C L P Healthcare Services Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Theodore Barnes-Breen | Plaintiff | Male | Brian Dault |
John T Chaney | Plaintiff | Male | Michael Burg |
Nancy Culver | Plaintiff | Female | Michael Burg |
Lee Ann Druding | Plaintiff | Female | Brian Dault |
Michelle Gill | Plaintiff | Female | Brian Dault |
Jill Hansen | Plaintiff | Female | Michael Burg |
Troy Harp | Plaintiff | Male | Michael Burg |
Francis Mattiussi | Plaintiff | Male | Holly Kammerer |
Chris McHenry | Plaintiff | Male | Brian Dault |
Phyllis Meadows | Plaintiff | Female | Michael Burg |
Helen Peterson | Plaintiff | Female | Michael Burg |
Gwen Timmerman | Plaintiff | Female | Michael Burg |
Platinum Training L L C | Defendant | Eileen Gilbride | |
Erin Greene | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Gwendolyn Aloia | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Betty Beach | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Debbie Beaugez | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Virginia Canavero | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Tanya Caruso | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Maria Clements | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Nancy Cooper | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Erika Elam-Prewitt | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Agnes Hansen | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Samantha Hetherington | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
John Peterson | Plaintiff | Male | Pro Per |
James Stauffer | Plaintiff | Male | Pro Per |
Suzanne Visser | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Richelle Wallace | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Joann Waller | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Amanda Waterman | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Constance Berman | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Susan Berman | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Nancy Wagner | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Estate Of Frances Mattiussi, The | Plaintiff | Pro Per | |
Maricopa County Creditor | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per | |
Burg Simpson | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/19/2022 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 8/19/2022 | |
8/19/2022 | EMF - Email Filed | 8/23/2022 | |
NOTE: EMIAL FILED | |||
8/18/2022 | ORD - Order | 8/24/2022 | |
NOTE: REINSTATING JANUARY 24 2020 FINAL JUDGMENT | |||
7/12/2022 | MOT - Motion | 7/14/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO ENFORCE THE MANDATE OF THE ARIZONA COURT OF APPEALS – DIVISION ONE | |||
6/7/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 6/8/2022 | |
6/7/2022 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 6/8/2022 | |
3/28/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 3/29/2022 | |
3/28/2022 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 3/29/2022 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS | |||
3/22/2022 | MOT - Motion | 3/28/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF COURT OF APPEALS OPINION DATED FEBRUARY 15, 2022 AND MOTION TO RE-ENTER JANUARY 24, 2020 FINAL JUDGMENT | |||
2/3/2022 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit | 2/4/2022 | |
NOTE: $42,474.11 PAID TO JONES SKELTON & HOCHULO PLC | |||
2/2/2022 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 2/8/2022 | |
NOTE: $49.46 FOR ESCROW MGMT INTEREST FOR PLATINUM TRAINING LLC | |||
1/25/2022 | OOR - Order Of Release | 1/28/2022 | |
NOTE: SECOND AMENDED / GRANTING MOTION TO / SUPERSEDEAS FUNDS | |||
1/24/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Second Amended Motion to Release Supersedeas Funds to Defendants Oddo and Platinum | |||
1/7/2022 | OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds | 1/7/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELEASE SUPERSEDEAS FUNDS | |||
1/5/2022 | OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds | 1/5/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELEASE SUPERSEDEAS FUNDS | |||
1/5/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Amended Motion to Release Supersedeas Funds to Defendants Oddo and Platinum | |||
11/29/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/30/2021 | |
11/29/2021 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 11/30/2021 | |
11/29/2021 | MOT - Motion | 12/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Release Supersedeas Funds to Defendants Oddo and Platinum | |||
5/24/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
5/24/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
5/13/2021 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/14/2021 | |
2/25/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 3/1/2021 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
2/25/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index | 3/1/2021 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
2/10/2021 | MEM - Memorandum | 2/12/2021 | |
1/6/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 1/6/2021 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
1/6/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index | 1/6/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
12/23/2020 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/24/2020 | |
11/25/2020 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 11/25/2020 | |
11/24/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED JUDGMENT | |||
11/13/2020 | NOT - Notice | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND NOTICE OF LODGING | |||
11/3/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 11/3/2020 | |
10/8/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 10/8/2020 | |
9/30/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/30/2020 | |
9/2/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 9/3/2020 | |
8/27/2020 | MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear | 8/28/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE FOR JUDGMENT/DEBTOR EXAMINATION-PD $30 RECEIPT 27926824 | |||
8/27/2020 | MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear | 8/28/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE FOR JUDGMENT/DEBTOR EXAMINATION-PAID $30 RECEIPT 27926824 | |||
8/24/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/25/2020 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
8/19/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 8/20/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
8/19/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 8/20/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
8/7/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/10/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER | |||
8/6/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Notice of Transcript Order | |||
7/15/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Notice of Appeal / eFile Billing $100.00 | |||
7/14/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Notice of Appeal / eFile Billing $100.00 | |||
7/7/2020 | NOT - Notice | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |||
7/7/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CLARIFY AND AMEND DEFAULT JUDGMENTS PURSUANT TO RULES 59(D), 55(C), AND 60(B)(6) | |||
6/24/2020 | WSH - Worksheet | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: EXHIBIT | |||
6/23/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/23/2020 | |
6/22/2020 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 6/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
6/22/2020 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 6/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
6/17/2020 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 6/17/2020 | |
6/15/2020 | REL - Reply | 6/16/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS GORE'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS A MATTER OF CONSTITUTIONAL LAW | |||
6/15/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 6/15/2020 | |
6/9/2020 | ORD - Order | 6/9/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND TO GORE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS TO MATTER OF CONSITITUTIONAL LAW | |||
6/8/2020 | RES - Response | 6/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion for Reduction of Punitive Damages as a Matter of Constitutional Law | |||
6/5/2020 | MOT - Motion | 6/5/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS’ TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS GORE’S MOTION FOR REDUCTION IN PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS A MATTER OF CONSTITUTIONAL LAW | |||
6/3/2020 | ORD - Order | 6/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Extending Plaintiffs Time to Respond to Gore Defendants’ Motion for Reduction of Punitive Damages as a Matter of Constitutional Law | |||
6/3/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 6/11/2020 | |
6/1/2020 | MEM - Memorandum | 6/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Default HEARING MEMORANDUM | |||
6/1/2020 | MOT - Motion | 6/2/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS’ TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS GORE’S MOTION FOR REDUCTION IN PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS A MATTER OF CONSTITUTIONAL LAW | |||
5/15/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/15/2020 | |
5/15/2020 | ORD - Order | 5/15/2020 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO COURT MINUTE ENTRY DATED MAY 7, 2020 | |||
5/13/2020 | MOT - Motion | 5/13/2020 | |
NOTE: OINT MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO COURT MINUTE ENTRY DATED MAY 7, 2020 | |||
5/8/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/8/2020 | |
5/6/2020 | NOT - Notice | 5/8/2020 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
5/6/2020 | REL - Reply | 5/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS GORE’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE GORE’S REQUEST TO REOPEN TIME FOR APPEAL UNDER ARCAP 9(F) AND FOR DELAYED APPEAL UNDER RULE 60(b) | |||
5/6/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 5/7/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
5/6/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 5/7/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
5/5/2020 | MOT - Motion | 5/6/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT RATHBURNS DOCUMENT FILED APRIAL 27, 2020 | |||
4/30/2020 | STA - Statement | 5/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Gore's Briefing Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Post-Trial Motions and Appeal | |||
4/29/2020 | RES - Response | 4/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Gore Defendants' Requests to Reopen Time for Appeal under ARCAP 9(f) and for Delayed Appeal under Rule 60(b) | |||
4/28/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/28/2020 | |
4/27/2020 | STA - Statement | 4/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Brief Re Timeliness of Due Process Challenge | |||
4/27/2020 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 4/29/2020 | |
NOTE: AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARTHUR RATHBURN | |||
4/16/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/16/2020 | |
4/16/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 4/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Cross Appeal | |||
4/10/2020 | REL - Reply | 4/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Gore's Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Gore Defendants' Motion for Rule 6(B)(2) Extension and Motion for Rule 60 Extension | |||
4/6/2020 | REC - Receipt | 4/9/2020 | |
4/1/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 4/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / EFILE BILLING $100.00 | |||
4/1/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 4/2/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
4/1/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 4/2/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
3/31/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/31/2020 | |
3/31/2020 | NOT - Notice | 4/1/2020 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
3/27/2020 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 3/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Deposit in Lieu of Supersedeas Bond / receipt | |||
3/27/2020 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 3/31/2020 | |
NOTE: $42,424.65/PLATINUM TRAINING LLC ET AL/SUPERSEDEAS BOND | |||
3/26/2020 | RES - Response | 3/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Gore Defendants' Motion for Rule 6(b)(2) | |||
3/24/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/24/2020 | |
3/24/2020 | ORD - Order | 3/24/2020 | |
NOTE: REGARDING SUPERSEDEAS BOND | |||
3/24/2020 | JUD - Judgment | 3/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
3/24/2020 | RES - Response | 3/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Srike the Gore Defendant's Motion for New Trial or Remittitur | |||
3/20/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
3/20/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC. | |||
3/20/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANTS ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
3/17/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/18/2020 | |
NOTE: Supplemental and Amended Motion to Strike Gore Defendants Untimely Motion for New Trial or Remittitur | |||
3/16/2020 | REL - Reply | 3/18/2020 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF RULE 54(B) JUDGMENT | |||
3/13/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike Gore Defendants' Untimely Motion for New Trial or Remittitur | |||
3/13/2020 | CER - Certificate | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Amended Certificate of Service for Defendants Biological Resource Center of Illinois, LLC, Donald A. Greene, Donald A. Greene II Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment | |||
3/13/2020 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS | |||
3/13/2020 | ANA - Amended Notice Of Appeal | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Amended Notice of Appeal | |||
3/13/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Order Regarding Supersedeas Bond | |||
3/13/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY HEARING AGAINST BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC. | |||
3/13/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY HEARING AGAINST ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
3/13/2020 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS | |||
3/12/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Gore's Motion for Reduction of Punitive Damages as a Matter of Constitutional Law; Rule 59 Motion for New Trial or Remittitur | |||
3/6/2020 | ORD - Order | 3/6/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PLATINUM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CORRECT JUDGEMENT THE COURT HAS ALREADY ENTERED THE AMENDED JUDGMENT REQUEST IN THAT MOTION | |||
3/3/2020 | RES - Response | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Response of Defendants Biological Resource Center of Illinois, LLC, Donald A. Greene and Donald A. Greene II to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment | |||
3/3/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/3/2020 | |
3/2/2020 | MOT - Motion | 3/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion for Entry of Signed Order | |||
2/26/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: application FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC. | |||
2/26/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
2/26/2020 | AFF - Affidavit | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANTS ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
2/26/2020 | AFF - Affidavit | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Affifavit of Service of Process Upon Defendant Biological Resource Center Inc | |||
2/26/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Association of Counsel | |||
2/25/2020 | JUD - Judgment | 2/25/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/25/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/25/2020 | |
2/24/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal - EFILE BILLING $100 | |||
2/21/2020 | MOT - Motion | 2/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment | |||
2/20/2020 | RES - Response | 2/21/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC., CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION TO CORRECT JUDGMENT | |||
2/10/2020 | MOT - Motion | 2/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Platinum Medical, LLC, Platinum Medical, Inc., Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion To Correct Judgment -and- Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
2/7/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 2/7/2020 | |
2/7/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Association and Limited Appearance of Appellate Counsel | |||
2/5/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE / OF PLAINTIFFS BEECHER BARNESBREEN CANAVERO CLEMENTS HETHERINGTON MERRILL AND STAUFFERS ACTION | |||
2/4/2020 | MOT - Motion | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
2/3/2020 | NOT - Notice | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
1/31/2020 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 2/4/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS BEECHER, BARNESBREEN, CANAVERO, CLEMENTS, HETHERINGTON, MERRILL AND STAUFFER ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/28/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/28/2020 | |
1/24/2020 | JUD - Judgment | 1/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
1/24/2020 | JUD - Judgment | 1/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
1/21/2020 | REL - Reply | 1/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Platinum Medical, LLC, Platinum Medical, Inc., Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion For An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs | |||
1/9/2020 | RES - Response | 1/10/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO THE PLATINUM DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS | |||
1/7/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 1/7/2020 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF BONNES’ ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/7/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 1/7/2020 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF FRANCIS MATTIUSSI’S ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/3/2020 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 1/6/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF FRANCIS MATTIUSSI’S ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/3/2020 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 1/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiff Bonnes' Action with Prejudice | |||
12/23/2019 | SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment | 12/24/2019 | |
NOTE: Proposed Judgment | |||
12/20/2019 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 12/20/2019 | |
12/19/2019 | STP - Stipulation | 12/20/2019 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE REGARDING THE PLATINUM AND ODDO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS | |||
12/18/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 12/18/2019 | |
12/13/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/13/2019 | |
12/13/2019 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 12/16/2019 | |
NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
12/13/2019 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
12/13/2019 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
12/10/2019 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 12/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Platinum Medical, LLC, Platinum Medical, Inc., Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Costs | |||
12/10/2019 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, Charles Oddo And Amy Oddo's Statement Of Costs | |||
12/4/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/4/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 11/27/2019 | |
11/21/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/21/2019 | |
11/20/2019 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 | 11/21/2019 | |
11/20/2019 | NOT - Notice | 11/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Notice of Lodging Proposed Forms of Judgment | |||
11/20/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/20/2019 | |
11/20/2019 | JJF - Judgment For Jury Fees | 11/26/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
11/19/2019 | WSH - Worksheet | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING / | |||
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | VER - Verdict | 11/20/2019 | |
11/18/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/15/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/15/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | JUD - Judgment | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF JOHN PETERSONS JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO AND AMY ODDO | |||
11/15/2019 | JUD - Judgment | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MICHELE GILLS JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AMY ODDO AND STEPHEN GORE | |||
11/15/2019 | JUD - Judgment | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF CHRIS MCHENRYS JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO AND AMY ODDO | |||
11/14/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/14/2019 | |
11/14/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/13/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/13/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/13/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/12/2019 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: FINAL / | |||
11/12/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/12/2019 | |
11/8/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/8/2019 | |
11/7/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/7/2019 | |
11/6/2019 | NOT - Notice | 11/7/2019 | |
NOTE: OFFER OF PROOF FOR PLAINTIFFS ERIKA ELAMPREWITT AND ANASTASIA MOORE | |||
11/6/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/6/2019 | |
11/6/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/6/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/6/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/6/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/5/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/5/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/5/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/5/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/5/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 11/6/2019 | |
NOTE: AMENDED DEFENDANT GORE’S DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS OF HAYLEY WOODS AND SAM KAZEMI | |||
11/4/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/4/2019 | |
11/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 11/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Designation of Depositions of Hayley Woods and Sam Kazemi | |||
11/1/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 11/1/2019 | |
10/31/2019 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/4/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Motion to Dismiss Plainitffs Moore and Elam-Prewitt | |||
10/31/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/31/2019 | |
10/31/2019 | ORD - Order | 10/31/2019 | |
NOTE: 1. The Stipulated Motion for Protective Order is granted. 2. Joseph Waters testimony in this matter will be limited to the area of document authentication. No party may seek to elicit testimony from Mr. Waters regarding his mental impressions, opinion work product, or prosecutorial decision-making related to Mr. Waters’ prosecution of Defendant Stephen Gore in State of Arizona v. Stephen Douglas Gore, Maricopa County Superior Court Case No. CR2015-005246-001 or the investigation leading to the guilty plea in that matter | |||
10/31/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/31/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/30/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/29/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/29/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY / | |||
10/28/2019 | MOT - Motion | 10/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion for Protective Order | |||
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/20/2019 | |
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 05/25/18 BY PAMELA J MAYER | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 11/1/2017 BY SOMMER E GREENE | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED 10/30/2018 BY KELLY R REXROAT | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 11/29/19 BY JUDY A ORLANDI | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 06/18/18 BY KELLY R REXROAT | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 01/29/19 BY LISA A WHEELER | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 10/31/2019 BY KELLY R REXROAT | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/13/2019 | |
NOTE: 01/30/19 BY GREGORY R SNYDER | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: STEPHEN DOUGLAS GORE / DECEMBER 15 2016 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: KRISTEN LIETZ / JUNE 19 2018 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: BENJAMIN WINTERS / JANUARY 29 2018 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: CHARLES ODDO / OCTOBER 30 2018 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: BENJAMIN WINTERS / JANUARY 29 2018 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: DONALD A GREENE II / NOVEMBER 28 2018 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: GEORGE SNYDER / JANUARY 30 2019 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: GEORGE SNYDER / JANUARY 30 2019 | |||
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/15/2019 | |
NOTE: GEORGE SNYDER / JANUARY 30 2019 | |||
10/24/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/24/2019 | |
10/24/2019 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/21/2019 | |
NOTE: BENJAMIN WINTERS / JANUARY 29 2018 | |||
10/22/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 10/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Proposed Jury Instructions | |||
10/22/2019 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset | 10/22/2019 | |
10/21/2019 | RES - Response | 10/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Declaration of Joseph Waters | |||
10/21/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 10/21/2019 | |
10/21/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/21/2019 | |
10/18/2019 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 10/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Partial Settlement | |||
10/17/2019 | REQ - Request | 10/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Request for Court Reporter | |||
10/17/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/21/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF LODGING | |||
10/16/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 10/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Platinum Training LLC's Memorandum re First Phase Jury Instructions | |||
10/16/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 10/17/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION ON AGENCY | |||
10/16/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 10/18/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
10/16/2019 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 10/18/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Amended Witness List for Phase One of Trial | |||
10/16/2019 | MOT - Motion | 10/18/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO ALLOW DECLARATION OF JOSEPH WATERS TO LAY FOUNDATION FOR EXHIBITS A-D IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY | |||
10/16/2019 | DCL - Declaration | 10/18/2019 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF JOSEPH WATERS | |||
10/16/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/18/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE REGARDING THE DECLARATION OF MARK CWYNAR | |||
10/16/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/16/2019 | |
10/15/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 10/16/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gore's Notice Re: Proposed Final Jury Instructions and Interrogatory | |||
10/15/2019 | MOT - Motion | 10/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss All Claims by Plaintiff Canavero | |||
10/11/2019 | REL - Reply | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Platinum Training, LLCs Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Motion to Substitute Estate of Frances Mattiussi | |||
10/11/2019 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 10/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Platinum Training LLC's Witness List For Phase One Of Trial | |||
10/11/2019 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 10/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Witness List for Phase One of Trial | |||
10/10/2019 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 10/11/2019 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC. | |||
10/10/2019 | MEM - Memorandum | 10/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC First Phase Trial Memorandum re Agency | |||
10/10/2019 | STA - Statement | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Supplement to Joint Pretrial Statement | |||
10/10/2019 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS | |||
10/10/2019 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC. | |||
10/10/2019 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANT BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER INC | |||
10/9/2019 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 10/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Platinum Training, LLC's Rule 25 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Decedent Beecher's Claims | |||
10/8/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/10/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE REGARDING ESTIMATED LENGTH OF PHASE ONE OF TRIAL | |||
10/8/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/8/2019 | |
10/7/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/8/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF CHRIS MCHENRY’S NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
10/7/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/8/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF JOHN PETERSON’S NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
10/7/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/8/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MICHELE GILL’S NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
10/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/7/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice OF NOT WAIVING RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL | |||
10/3/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/9/2019 | |
10/2/2019 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/3/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles and Amy Oddo's Objection to Form of Judgment | |||
10/2/2019 | RES - Response | 10/4/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE ESTATE OF FRANCES MATTIUSSI | |||
10/1/2019 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 10/1/2019 | |
9/30/2019 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 9/30/2019 | |
9/27/2019 | NOT - Notice | 10/1/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT RE: COURT REPORTER | |||
9/26/2019 | REL - Reply | 9/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles and Amy Oddo's Reply in Support of Motion for Separate Trials | |||
9/26/2019 | REL - Reply | 9/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion for Summary Judgment on Negligence Claims | |||
9/26/2019 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Platinum Defendants' And Oddo Defendants' Response And Objections To Plaintiffs' Statement Of Facts In Support Of Their Response To Defendants Platinum, Charles And Amy Oddo's Motion For Summary Judgment On Negligence Claims | |||
9/26/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/30/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF CHRIS MCHENRY’S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/24/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 9/27/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles and Amy Oddo's FIRST Supplement TO Requested Jury Instructions | |||
9/20/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/25/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NEGLIGENCE CLAIMS | |||
9/20/2019 | RES - Response | 9/25/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NEGLIGENCE CLAIMS | |||
9/20/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/20/2019 | |
9/19/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 9/19/2019 | |
9/18/2019 | RES - Response | 9/23/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO THE PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS | |||
9/18/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/25/2019 | |
9/13/2019 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 9/17/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE ESTATE OF FRANCES MATTIUSSI | |||
9/13/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/18/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Brief Re: Whether "Concern" About The Identity Of The Cremated Remains Is A Claim | |||
9/13/2019 | MEM - Memorandum | 9/18/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL MEMORANDUM RE: PLAINTIFFS’ CLAIM CONCERNING THE FEAR REGARDING THE IDENTITY OF DONORS’ CREMAINS | |||
9/11/2019 | ORD - Order | 9/11/2019 | |
NOTE: SUBSTITUTING PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCES MATTIUSSI FOR PLAINTIFF FRANCES MATTIUSSI | |||
9/11/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/16/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRANING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AMY ODDO AND STEPHEN GORE’S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFERS OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/11/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/16/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRANING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFERS OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/10/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/19/2019 | |
9/10/2019 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 9/10/2019 | |
9/5/2019 | MOT - Motion | 9/10/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCES MATTIUSSI FOR PLAINTIFF FRANCES MATTIUSSI | |||
9/4/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/4/2019 | |
9/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, Amy Oddo's Addendum re Requested Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms | |||
9/4/2019 | MOT - Motion | 9/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, Amy Oddo's Motion for Separate Trials | |||
9/4/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/6/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
9/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/6/2019 | |
NOTE: SPECIAL VERDICT FORM—ALL CLAIMS EXCEPT RACKETEERING (SEPARATE FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF, EXCEPT PLAINTIFFS CULVER, HANSEN, STAUFFER) | |||
9/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/6/2019 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS | |||
9/4/2019 | NOT - Notice | 9/6/2019 | |
NOTE: SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (FOR USE WITH BOTH GENERAL OR SPECIAL VERDICT FORMS) | |||
9/3/2019 | MOT - Motion | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Motion Requesting Court Reporter for Pre-Trial Conference | |||
8/28/2019 | RES - Response | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4 RE: IN LIMINE REQUEST FOR PROHIBITION OF “BLAME THE MESSENGER” ARGUMENT FOR THIRD PARTY LIABILITY OF NEWS AND LAW ENFORCEMENT ORGANIZATIONS WITHOUT LEGAL OR EXPERT SUPPORT | |||
8/28/2019 | RES - Response | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Response To Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine Number 2 Re: Allegations Of The Complaint Are Not Evidence | |||
8/28/2019 | RES - Response | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Response To Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine Number 1 Re: Prohibition On Mixing Differing Burdens Of Proof | |||
8/28/2019 | RES - Response | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Response To Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine Number 3 Re: In Limine Request For Prohibition On Invading The Attorney-Client Privilege | |||
8/28/2019 | RES - Response | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Response To Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine Number 5 Re: Certain Defendants' Failure To Disclose Documents | |||
8/28/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
8/28/2019 | NOT - Notice | 8/29/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’s REQUESTED VOIR DIRE AND JURY QUESTIONNAIRE | |||
8/28/2019 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 8/30/2019 | |
NOTE: DefendantS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES AND AMY ODDO'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS | |||
8/28/2019 | STA - Statement | 8/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
8/26/2019 | RES - Response | 8/27/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3 RE: PHOTOGRAPHS OF ANATOMICAL SPECIMENS SEIZED IN JANUARY 2014 RAID | |||
8/26/2019 | RES - Response | 8/28/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 RE: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE TESTING AND MEMORANDUM | |||
8/26/2019 | RES - Response | 8/28/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2 RE: SPECULATION INVOLVING CREMATED REMAINS | |||
8/26/2019 | RES - Response | 8/28/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 RE: PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
8/26/2019 | RES - Response | 8/28/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF FBI AGENT MARK CWYNAR | |||
8/23/2019 | ORD - Order | 8/26/2019 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
8/23/2019 | NOT - Notice | 8/27/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS NO. 42 | |||
8/22/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/28/2019 | |
8/22/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 8/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
8/21/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/28/2019 | |
8/21/2019 | RES - Response | 8/23/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO THE PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
8/21/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 8/23/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS | |||
8/20/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 8/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum, Amy Oddo and Charles Oddo's Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Their Motions For Summary Judgment On Negligence Claims | |||
8/20/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 8/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion For Summary Judgment On Negligence Claims | |||
8/20/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/26/2019 | |
8/14/2019 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: OF DANA FOX | |||
8/14/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 8/14/2019 | |
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3 IN LIMINE REQUEST FOR PROHIBITION ON INVADING THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEDGE | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 5 RE: PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 5 RE: CERTAIN DEFENDANTS’ FAILURE TO DISCLOSE DOCUMENTS | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, and Amy Oddo's Motion In Limine Number 4 Re: Mark Cwynar And Other Irrelevant, Unfairly Prejudicial And Waste Of Time Evidence | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2 RE: ALLEGATIONS OF THE COMPLAINT ARE NOT EVIDENCE | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4 IN LIMINE REQUEST FOR PROHIBITION OF “BLAME THE MESSENGER” ARGUMENT FOR THIRD PARTY LIABILITY OF NEWS AND LAW ENFORCEMENT ORGANIZATIONS WITHOUT LEGAL OR EXPERT SUPPORT | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/14/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3 RE: PHOTOGRAPHS OF ANATOMICAL SPECIMENS SEIZED IN JANUARY 2014 RAID | |||
8/12/2019 | MOT - Motion | 8/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Dana Fox | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, and Amy Oddo's Motion In Limine Number 1 Re: Department Of Defense Testing AND MEMORANDUM | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/13/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1 RE: PROHIBITION ON MIXING DIFFERING BURDENS OF PROOF | |||
8/12/2019 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, and Amy Oddo's Motion In Limine Number 2 Re: Speculation Involving Cremated Remains | |||
8/8/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/8/2019 | |
8/7/2019 | MOT - Motion | 8/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motions in Limine | |||
8/7/2019 | ORD - Order | 8/8/2019 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
8/5/2019 | MOT - Motion | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Traning, LLC, Charles Oddo and Amy Oddo's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Negligence Claims | |||
8/5/2019 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant Platinum Training, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration on Vicarious Liability Under Theory of Respondeat Superior | |||
7/22/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/22/2019 | |
7/8/2019 | STA - Statement | 7/9/2019 | |
NOTE: Rule 25 Statement Noting the Death of Plaintiff Francis Mattiussi | |||
7/8/2019 | STA - Statement | 7/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Rule 25 Statement Noting the Death of Plaintiff Suzanne Beecher | |||
7/5/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/5/2019 | |
6/19/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/19/2019 | |
6/3/2019 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 6/5/2019 | |
6/3/2019 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 6/5/2019 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |||
5/31/2019 | NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault | 6/4/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC., PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO, AND AMY ODDO’S Notice of Non-Parties At Fault | |||
5/28/2019 | REL - Reply | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Oddo and Platinum Defendants' Reply to Their Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of John Nicoletti | |||
5/28/2019 | REL - Reply | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: ODDO AND PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ REPLY TO THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ANGELA MCARTHUR AND BRANDI SCHMITT | |||
5/28/2019 | REL - Reply | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Platinum Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims by all Plaintiffs | |||
5/28/2019 | REL - Reply | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS BY ALL PLAINTIFFS | |||
5/28/2019 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ AND ODDO DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS’ COMBINED STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS PLATINUM, CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
5/17/2019 | ANS - Answer | 5/20/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum Medical, LLC, Platinum Medical, Inc., Platinum Training, LLC, Charles Oddo, and Amy Oddo's Answer to the Third Amended Complaint | |||
5/14/2019 | ORD - Order | 5/14/2019 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS ODDO AND PLATINUM TO FILE THEIR REPLIES REGARDING THE TWO PENDING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY | |||
5/13/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 5/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/10/2019 | STP - Stipulation | 5/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants Oddo and Platinum to File Their Replies Regarding the Two Pending Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony | |||
5/7/2019 | ORD - Order | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON THE PLATINUM AND ODDOS’ MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE | |||
5/6/2019 | RES - Response | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
5/6/2019 | RES - Response | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO ODDO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
5/6/2019 | RES - Response | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO ODDO AND PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ANGELA MCARTHUR AND BRANDI SCHMITT | |||
5/6/2019 | RES - Response | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO ODDO AND PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN NICOLETTI | |||
5/6/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ COMBINED STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS PLATINUM, CHARLES AND AMY ODDO’S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
5/3/2019 | MOT - Motion | 5/6/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON THE PLATINUM AND ODDOS’ MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY | |||
5/1/2019 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/2/2019 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
5/1/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 5/1/2019 | |
4/30/2019 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 5/1/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/29/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 4/29/2019 | |
4/24/2019 | RES - Response | 4/25/2019 | |
NOTE: Oddo and Platinum Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint | |||
4/11/2019 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/11/2019 | |
4/10/2019 | STP - Stipulation | 4/11/2019 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN NICOLETTI, ANGELA MCARTHUR AND BRANDI SCHMITT | |||
4/8/2019 | ORD - Order | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: granting leave to the Oddos to exceed the Local Rules page limitation, and may file a Motion for Summary Judgment consisting of up to nineteen pages | |||
4/5/2019 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO CONFORM TO EVIDENCE ESTABLISHED IN DISCOVERY | |||
4/5/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Platinum Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims by All Plaintiffs | |||
4/5/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Charles and Amy Oddo's Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims by All Plaintiffs | |||
4/5/2019 | MOT - Motion | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Oddo and Platinum Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of John Nicoletti | |||
4/5/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum, Amy Oddo and Charles Oddo's Omnibus Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motions for Summary Judgment | |||
4/5/2019 | MOT - Motion | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: ODDO AND PLATINUM DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ANGELA MCARTHUR AND BRANDI SCHMITT | |||
4/4/2019 | MOT - Motion | 4/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on the Oddos' Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
4/2/2019 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 4/2/2019 | |
4/1/2019 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 4/2/2019 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
4/1/2019 | AIX - Appeals Index | 4/2/2019 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
3/29/2019 | ORD - Order | 3/29/2019 | |
NOTE: that the deadline for the Parties to file Dispositive 2I Motions and Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony shall be April 5, 2019 | |||
3/29/2019 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 3/29/2019 | |
NOTE: with prejudice Illinois Defendants ONLY | |||
3/29/2019 | LET - Letter | 4/1/2019 | |
3/27/2019 | MOT - Motion | 3/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines for Dispositive Motions and Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony | |||
3/26/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 3/26/2019 | |
3/14/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/14/2019 | |
3/5/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/5/2019 | |
3/5/2019 | NOT - Notice | 3/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging | |||
2/28/2019 | NOT - Notice | 3/1/2019 | |
NOTE: NotICE of Transcript Order | |||
2/22/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 2/22/2019 | |
2/20/2019 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default by Hearing | |||
2/20/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service of Process UPON DEFENDANTS ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
2/20/2019 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ARTHUR AND ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
2/20/2019 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED statement of costs | |||
2/20/2019 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal // EFILE BILLING $100 | |||
2/5/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 2/5/2019 | |
2/5/2019 | REP - Report | 2/6/2019 | |
NOTE: SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER’S REPORT OF JANUARY 31, 2019 CONFERENCE | |||
2/5/2019 | NOT - Notice | 2/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging | |||
2/4/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 2/4/2019 | |
1/22/2019 | ORD - Order | 1/22/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT OF ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR CLAIM THAT THIS COURT LACKS PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THEM | |||
1/17/2019 | REL - Reply | 1/17/2019 | |
NOTE: REPLY OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR CLAIM THAT THIS COURT LACKS PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THEM | |||
1/17/2019 | STP - Stipulation | 1/18/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Page Limit OF ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR CLAIM THAT THIS COURT LACKS PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THEM | |||
1/4/2019 | RES - Response | 1/7/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC., DONALD GREENE SR., AND DONALD GREENE JR’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
1/3/2019 | STP - Stipulation | 1/4/2019 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT OF PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
12/17/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/17/2018 | |
12/12/2018 | NOT - Notice | 12/12/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Removal of Action From Consolidated Matter | |||
11/14/2018 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 11/14/2018 | |
11/8/2018 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 11/9/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
11/1/2018 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 11/1/2018 | |
10/31/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/31/2018 | |
10/29/2018 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/30/2018 | |
NOTE: Opposition of Defendants BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC., DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II to Plaintiffs' Request and Amended Request for Rule 56(d) Relief and for Expedited Hearing | |||
10/26/2018 | REQ - Request | 10/29/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDED REQUEST FOR RULE 56(d) RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
10/25/2018 | REQ - Request | 10/25/2018 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR RULE 56(d) RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
10/5/2018 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 10/5/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC., DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR CLAIM THAT THIS COURT LACKS PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
8/28/2018 | NOT - Notice | 8/29/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE AND AFFIDAVIT OF BARRY C. SCHNEIDER PURSUANT TO RULE 53(A)(2) | |||
8/28/2018 | NOT - Notice | 8/29/2018 | |
NOTE: Special Discovery Master's Notice of First Meeting and Oral Argument On Fulling Briefed Pending Motions | |||
8/24/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/24/2018 | |
8/24/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/24/2018 | |
8/17/2018 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 8/20/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS AND ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO THIS COURT’S JUNE 18, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY | |||
8/15/2018 | ORD - Order | 8/16/2018 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING EXPERT OPINION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE | |||
8/8/2018 | REL - Reply | 8/10/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER | |||
8/8/2018 | REL - Reply | 8/10/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO MOTION TO EXTEND EXPERT OPINION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE BY THIRTY (30) DAYS | |||
8/1/2018 | RES - Response | 8/2/2018 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO BRCIL DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO SEVER | |||
8/1/2018 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 8/2/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Platinum/Oddo/Brcil/Greene's Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Opinion Disclosure Deadline by Thirty Days | |||
7/23/2018 | MOT - Motion | 7/25/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM / ODDO’S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT BRCIL’S MOTION TO SEVER | |||
7/20/2018 | MOT - Motion | 7/23/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND EXPERT OPINION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE BY THIRTY (30) DAYS | |||
7/18/2018 | MOT - Motion | 7/19/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II MOTION TO SEVER | |||
7/3/2018 | NOT - Notice | 7/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of AgreED Discovery Master | |||
6/27/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 6/27/2018 | |
6/1/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/6/2018 | |
5/10/2018 | NOT - Notice | 5/11/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME OF FIRM AND ADDRESS AND DISASSOCIATE PRO HAC VICE CO-COUNSEL | |||
4/25/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/25/2018 | |
4/16/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/16/2018 | |
4/13/2018 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/13/2018 | |
4/9/2018 | REL - Reply | 4/11/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO LINDA OLSON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONTEMPT PURSUANT TO RULE 45(f) | |||
4/2/2018 | RES - Response | 4/4/2018 | |
NOTE: NON-PARTY LINDA OLSON’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR CONTEMPT PURSUANT TO RULE 45(f) | |||
3/28/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/28/2018 | |
3/27/2018 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 3/27/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
3/20/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/20/2018 | |
3/16/2018 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 3/19/2018 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
3/14/2018 | MOT - Motion | 3/16/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR CONTEMPT PURSUANT TO RULE 45(f) | |||
2/28/2018 | REL - Reply | 3/1/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ FEE APPLICATION | |||
2/21/2018 | RES - Response | 2/22/2018 | |
NOTE: Response In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Fee Application | |||
2/19/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/20/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
2/15/2018 | REL - Reply | 2/15/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply To Platinum Defendants' Response In Opposition To The Plaintiffs' Motion To Consolidate | |||
2/7/2018 | RES - Response | 2/7/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC., PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO AND AMY ODDO'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
2/3/2018 | REL - Reply | 2/13/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
2/2/2018 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 2/6/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS Application for AttORNEy Fees and Costs AWARDED BY THIS COURT IN ITS' JANUARY 12, 2018 ORDER | |||
1/29/2018 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 1/29/2018 | |
1/26/2018 | RES - Response | 1/29/2018 | |
NOTE: ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO THE PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
1/25/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 1/25/2018 | |
1/19/2018 | MCD - Motion To Consolidate | 1/23/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Case with Suzanne Beecher, Surviving Spouse of Brent Beecher, et al. v. Biological Resource Center, Inc., et al., Case #: CV2015-013391 | |||
1/17/2018 | ORD - Order | 1/17/2018 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
1/11/2018 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 1/12/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE TO DISASSOCIATE MICHAEL J. PONZO AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS | |||
1/10/2018 | STP - Stipulation | 1/11/2018 | |
NOTE: Joint Request for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order | |||
1/5/2018 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 1/9/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS AND ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS' JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S DECEMBER 12, 2017 MINUTE ENTRY | |||
12/14/2017 | RES - Response | 12/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Response | |||
12/13/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/13/2017 | |
12/11/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/11/2017 | |
12/11/2017 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 12/12/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration AND CLARIFICATION | |||
12/6/2017 | REQ - Request | 12/6/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REQUEST FOR A COURT REPORTER | |||
11/29/2017 | NDE - Notice Of Deposition | 11/30/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF BENJAMIN WINTERS | |||
11/9/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 11/9/2017 | |
11/3/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/3/2017 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, AND DONALD GREENE | |||
10/27/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Entry of Protective Order | |||
10/25/2017 | RES - Response | 10/26/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREEN II’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
10/6/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/9/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, AND DONALD GREENE | |||
9/7/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/7/2017 | |
8/14/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/17/2017 | |
8/10/2017 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/15/2017 | |
7/18/2017 | ORD - Order | 7/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
7/18/2017 | ORD - Order | 7/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
7/17/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/27/2017 | |
NOTE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE DOCUMENTS | |||
7/11/2017 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 7/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
7/5/2017 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 7/6/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
7/5/2017 | MOT - Motion | 7/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Disassociate DREW R. FERRANDINI AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
7/5/2017 | MOT - Motion | 7/6/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DIASSOCIATE LINA B MELIDONIAN AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
6/15/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/15/2017 | |
6/15/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 6/16/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
6/14/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/14/2017 | |
6/13/2017 | MOT - Motion | 6/15/2017 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME TO RETAIN NEW COUNSEL FOR PLATINUM TRAINING LLC PLATINUM MEDICAL INC AND PLATINUM MEDICAL LLC | |||
5/24/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2017 | |
NOTE: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC | |||
5/12/2017 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 5/12/2017 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
5/10/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 5/10/2017 | |
5/10/2017 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel | 5/10/2017 | |
5/9/2017 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
5/9/2017 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 5/9/2017 | |
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER | |||
4/27/2017 | NOT - Notice | 4/28/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS, PLATINUM AND ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ DISCOVERY PLAN PURSUANT TO THIS COURT’S JANUARY 18, 2017 MINUTE ENTRY | |||
4/26/2017 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 4/27/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR PLATINUM DEFENDANTS | |||
3/22/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/22/2017 | |
3/16/2017 | NOT - Notice | 3/20/2017 | |
3/16/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/16/2017 | |
3/9/2017 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 3/10/2017 | |
3/9/2017 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 3/10/2017 | |
3/8/2017 | NOT - Notice | 3/9/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS, PLATINUM AND ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS’ DISCOVERY PLAN PURSUANT TO THIS COURT’S JANUARY 18, 2017 MINUTE ENTRY | |||
1/18/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 1/18/2017 | |
1/13/2017 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 1/13/2017 | |
NOTE: ORDER re: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
1/9/2017 | MOT - Motion | 1/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel pro hac vice | |||
12/23/2016 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 12/23/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER DECLINING APECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION | |||
12/22/2016 | ANS - Answer | 12/23/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
12/19/2016 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/19/2016 | |
12/14/2016 | NOT - Notice | 12/15/2016 | |
NOTE: Authority in Support of RespONSE to the Court Order dateD DecEMBER 6, 2016 | |||
12/13/2016 | ORD - Order | 12/13/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUPPLEMENT OBEJCTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS’ SUPOENA DUCES TECUM | |||
12/13/2016 | RES - Response | 12/15/2016 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO THE COURT ORDER DATED DECEMBER 6, 2016 | |||
12/8/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 12/9/2016 | |
NOTE: SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUPPLEMENT OBJECTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS’ SUBPOENA | |||
12/8/2016 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/8/2016 | |
12/5/2016 | RES - Response | 12/6/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II EXPEDITED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING SPECIAL ACTION IN COURT OF APPEALS | |||
12/2/2016 | MOT - Motion | 12/6/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II EXPEDITED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING SPECIAL ACTION IN COURT OF APPEALS | |||
11/22/2016 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 11/23/2016 | |
NOTE: Joint SCHEDULING MEMORANDUM | |||
11/17/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 11/17/2016 | |
11/16/2016 | NOT - Notice | 11/22/2016 | |
NOTE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE DOCUMENTS | |||
11/15/2016 | ORD - Order | 11/15/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUPPLEMENT OBEJCTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS’ SUPOENA DUCES TECUM | |||
11/9/2016 | RES - Response | 11/10/2016 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS STEPHEN & SALLY GORE’S MOTION TO EXTEND 30 DAY DEADLINE FOR VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION | |||
11/7/2016 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/7/2016 | |
11/4/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 11/7/2016 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Supplement Objection and Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena | |||
11/2/2016 | NOT - Notice | 11/3/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Contacting Arizona Attorney Generals Office Regarding October 24 2016 Order | |||
10/26/2016 | RES - Response | 10/27/2016 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO UNFILED MOTION TO MODIFY & DISMISS SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF STEPHEN GORE & SALLY GORE | |||
10/24/2016 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/24/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | REL - Reply | 10/25/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DR. BAUER’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS RE: JURISDICTION | |||
10/24/2016 | REL - Reply | 10/25/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DR. BAUER’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS RE: IMMUNITY | |||
10/17/2016 | REL - Reply | 10/18/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12 (b)(6) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY ACCORDED DEFENDANTS UNDER TWO ILLINOIS STATUTES AND THE ECONOMIC LOSS DOCTRINE | |||
10/17/2016 | REL - Reply | 10/18/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12 (b)(2) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE REGARDING LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
10/5/2016 | ORD - Order | 10/5/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
9/30/2016 | MOT - Motion | 10/3/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion FOR LEAVE to Exceed Page Limit | |||
9/30/2016 | RES - Response | 10/3/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DR. BAUER’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT RE: JURISDICTION AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DR. BAUER’S JOINDER IN BRCIL’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JURISDICTION) | |||
9/30/2016 | RES - Response | 10/3/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DR BAUERS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT RE IMMUNITY AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DR BAUERS JOINDER IN BRCILS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
9/30/2016 | RES - Response | 10/3/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF IILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE, AND DONALD A. GREENE II TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLANIT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY UDER TWO ILLINOIS STATUES AND THE ECONOMIC LOSS DOCTRINE | |||
9/30/2016 | RES - Response | 10/3/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE, AND DONALD A. GREENE II MOTION [SIC] TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)2) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE REGARDING LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
9/23/2016 | ANS - Answer | 9/26/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC., PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, CHARLES ODDO and AMY ODDO’S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |||
9/16/2016 | ORD - Order | 9/16/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
9/12/2016 | ORD - Order | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
9/9/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DR. BAUER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT RE: JURISDICTION AND DEFENDANT DR. BAUER'S JOINDER IN BRCIL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JURTSDICTION) | |||
9/9/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DR. BAUER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Re: IMMUNITY AND DEFENDANT DR. BAUER'S JOINDER IN BRCIL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (IAGA) | |||
9/8/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/8/2016 | |
NOTE: MOTION OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12 (b)(6) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON IMMUNITY FROM LIABILITY ACCORDED DEFENDANTS UNDER TWO ILLINOIS STATUTES AND THE ECONOMIC LOSS DOCTRINE | |||
9/8/2016 | MOT - Motion | 9/9/2016 | |
NOTE: ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICITON | |||
9/8/2016 | MDJ - Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction | 9/9/2016 | |
NOTE: MOTION OF DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND DONALD A. GREENE II TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12 (b)(2) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE REGARDING LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
9/7/2016 | MOT - Motion | 9/8/2016 | |
NOTE: ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
9/1/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 9/1/2016 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING PREDICATE OFFENSE | |||
8/26/2016 | NOT - Notice | 8/26/2016 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata | |||
8/22/2016 | REL - Reply | 8/23/2016 | |
NOTE: Arizona Attorney General's Office's Reply in Support of its Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena | |||
8/15/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/15/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
8/15/2016 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/15/2016 | |
8/8/2016 | RES - Response | 8/9/2016 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE to ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICES Objection & Motion to Quash PLAINTIFFS SUBPOENA | |||
8/4/2016 | NOT - Notice | 8/5/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION RESPONSE TO FREEDOM OF INFORMATION REQUESTS | |||
7/29/2016 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/29/2016 | |
7/29/2016 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 7/29/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER re: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
7/29/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/29/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
7/27/2016 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 7/27/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
7/21/2016 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/21/2016 | |
7/21/2016 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/22/2016 | |
NOTE: Arizona Attorney Generals Offices Objection & Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena | |||
7/11/2016 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 7/14/2016 | |
7/1/2016 | RES - Response | 7/5/2016 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena | |||
6/28/2016 | ORD - Order | 6/28/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SUPOENA DUCES TECUM | |||
6/24/2016 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 6/27/2016 | |
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint | |||
6/20/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 6/20/2016 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum | |||
6/17/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 6/17/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
6/17/2016 | MTQ - Motion To Quash | 6/20/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Quash Subpoena | |||
6/2/2016 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/2/2016 | |
5/26/2016 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 5/26/2016 | |
5/23/2016 | NOT - Notice | 5/23/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Association and Appearance as Counsel of Record for Defendant Linda Olson | |||
5/20/2016 | REL - Reply | 5/23/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO F'URR AND BAUER'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF F'ILING AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FURR AND BAUER'S MOTION TO DISMISS F'OR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
5/20/2016 | RES - Response | 5/23/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DENNIS F'URR, DO AND MICHAEL BAUER, MD'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL EXIIIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO THE ILLINOIS AND COLORADO DEF'ENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DTSMISS PURSUANT TO 12(BX2) | |||
5/20/2016 | REL - Reply | 5/23/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO FURR AND BAUER’S RULE 19 MOTION TO JOIN PLAINTIFFS AS INDISPENSABLE PARTIES | |||
5/19/2016 | REL - Reply | 5/19/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO THE ILLINOIS AND COLORADO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(B)(2) ONLY | |||
5/18/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 5/18/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
5/17/2016 | RES - Response | 5/18/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREEN, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO THE ILLINOIS AND COLORADO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(B)(2) , | |||
5/16/2016 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 5/16/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS DR DENNIS FURR AND DR. MICHAEL BAUER’S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
5/16/2016 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 5/16/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREENE, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) A.R.C.P | |||
5/16/2016 | MOT - Motion | 5/16/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO THE ILLINOIS AND COLORADO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(B)(2) ONLY | |||
5/13/2016 | ANS - Answer | 5/16/2016 | Defendant(22) |
NOTE: Defendants response to complaint and affirmative defenses with proof of service-efile billing $237.00 | |||
5/11/2016 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 5/11/2016 | |
5/11/2016 | RES - Response | 5/12/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DENNIS FURR AND MICHAEL J. BAUER, MD’S RULE 19 MOTION TO JOIN PLAINTIFFS AS INDISPENSABLE PARTIES | |||
5/10/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/10/2016 | |
5/9/2016 | REL - Reply | 5/10/2016 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss | |||
5/6/2016 | RES - Response | 5/9/2016 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Dennis L. Furr, Do's and Michael J. Bauer, MD's Motion to Strike | |||
5/5/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 5/5/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
5/5/2016 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 5/5/2016 | |
4/28/2016 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/29/2016 | |
4/28/2016 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/29/2016 | |
4/27/2016 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/27/2016 | |
4/27/2016 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 4/27/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
4/27/2016 | RES - Response | 4/27/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT LINDA OLSON; OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 56(F), ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
4/26/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/26/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/22/2016 | REL - Reply | 4/22/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/22/2016 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 4/25/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
4/21/2016 | REL - Reply | 4/21/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREEN, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) A.R.C.P | |||
4/19/2016 | ORD - Order | 4/19/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/19/2016 | ORD - Order | 4/19/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/18/2016 | RES - Response | 4/19/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/18/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/18/2016 | |
NOTE: JOINDER IN PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC; PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC.; PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC; CHARLES ODDO AND AMY ODDO’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/18/2016 | MOT - Motion | 4/18/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT DENNIS FURR AND MICHAEL BAUER’S RULE 19 MOTION TO JOIN PLAINTIFFS’ SPOUSES AS INDISPENSABLE PARTIES | |||
4/18/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 4/18/2016 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FURR AND BAUER TO FILE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/18/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/18/2016 | |
NOTE: Joinder in Linda Olson's Motion to Dismiss | |||
4/15/2016 | MOT - Motion | 4/15/2016 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/8/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/8/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Complaint of Defendant Linda Olson | |||
4/4/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/8/2016 | |
4/4/2016 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 4/4/2016 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/4/2016 | RES - Response | 4/5/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREENE, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) A.R.C.P. | |||
4/4/2016 | RES - Response | 4/5/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS DR. DENNIS FURR AND DR. MICHAEL BAUER’S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
4/1/2016 | ORD - Order | 4/1/2016 | |
NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, granting Plaintiffs until April 4, 2016 to file a Response to Defendants’ Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Arizona Rules of Civil Procedure. | |||
3/29/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 3/29/2016 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREENE, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) A.R.C.P. | |||
3/29/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 3/30/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss | |||
3/28/2016 | NOT - Notice | 3/28/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm Address | |||
3/24/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/30/2016 | |
NOTE: LINA OLSON | |||
3/24/2016 | ORD - Order | 3/24/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER STRIKING BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER, INC.’S ANSWER | |||
3/22/2016 | NOT - Notice | 3/22/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Exhibits TO DEFENDANTS FURR AND BAUERS MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
3/17/2016 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 3/17/2016 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
3/16/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 3/16/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
3/15/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/18/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ELIZABETH RATHBURN | |||
3/15/2016 | SUM - Summons | 3/17/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
3/14/2016 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ | |||
3/14/2016 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ | |||
3/14/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2016 | |
3/14/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/INTERNATIONAL BIOLOGICAL INC | |||
3/14/2016 | MDJ - Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction | 3/15/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS DR. DENNIS FURR AND DR. MICHAEL BAUER' S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION | |||
3/11/2016 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 3/14/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS, LLC, DONALD A. GREENE AND WIFE SANDRA GREENE, DONALD A. GREEN, II AND WIFE ERIN GREENE, MELISSA J. WILLIAMS, A SINGLE PERSON, KURT KLITZKE AND WIFE NANCY KLITZKE AND MOLLIE STATHOPOLOUS AND HUSBAND CHRIS STATHOPOLOUS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) A.R.C.P | |||
3/8/2016 | ORD - Order | 3/8/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER (Defendants Dr. Michael Bauer and Dr. Dennis Furr have until March 14, 2016 to file a responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint) | |||
3/3/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 3/3/2016 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint | |||
3/2/2016 | OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service | 3/2/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS ARTHUR RATHBURN, ELIZABETH RATHBURN AND INTERNATIONAL BIOLOGICAL, INC. | |||
2/25/2016 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 2/25/2016 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service of Process for Defendants | |||
2/25/2016 | MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service | 2/26/2016 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE ARTHUR RATHBURN, ELIZABETH RATHBURN AND INTERNATIONAL BIOLOGICAL, INC. | |||
2/25/2016 | MOT - Motion | 2/26/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike Biological Resource Center, Inc.s Answer | |||
2/23/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/24/2016 | |
2/23/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/24/2016 | |
NOTE: CLP HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC | |||
2/22/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/23/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/22/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/23/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/22/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/24/2016 | |
NOTE: CHARLES ODDO | |||
2/22/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/24/2016 | |
NOTE: AMY C ODDO | |||
2/17/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/18/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
2/17/2016 | STP - Stipulation | 2/18/2016 | |
NOTE: Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time and Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint | |||
2/16/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/17/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/16/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/19/2016 | |
NOTE: DONALD A GREEN II/ERIN GREENE | |||
2/16/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/19/2016 | |
NOTE: PLATINUM TRAINING LLC | |||
2/16/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/19/2016 | |
NOTE: PLATINUM MEDICAL LLC | |||
2/16/2016 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 2/16/2016 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
2/16/2016 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 2/16/2016 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR DEFENDANTS PLATINUM MEDICAL, LLC, PLATINUM MEDICAL, INC., PLATINUM TRAINING, LLC, and CHARLES ODDO and AMY ODDO | |||
2/12/2016 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 2/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
2/12/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
2/12/2016 | MOT - Motion | 2/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Expedited Motion For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint | |||
2/11/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/11/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
2/10/2016 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 2/10/2016 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR DEFENDANTS MICHAEL J. BAUER, MD and JANE DOE BAUER | |||
2/5/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/5/2016 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service /DENNIS FURR | |||
2/3/2016 | ANS - Answer | 2/8/2016 | Defendant(10) |
2/2/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/3/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/2/2016 | SUM - Summons | 2/3/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
2/2/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/4/2016 | |
NOTE: MOLLIE STATHOPOULOUS | |||
2/2/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/4/2016 | |
NOTE: MELISSA J. WILLIAMS | |||
1/26/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/27/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/KURT KLITZKE AND JANE DOE KLITZKE | |||
1/26/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/15/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: STEPHEN GORE | |||
1/15/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: SALLY GORE | |||
1/15/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER INC | |||
1/15/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/15/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/15/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/15/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/19/2016 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
1/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/12/2016 | |
NOTE: MOLLIE STATHOPOULOUS | |||
1/11/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/12/2016 | |
NOTE: MELISSA J WILLIAMS | |||
1/11/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/13/2016 | |
1/11/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/13/2016 | |
1/8/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/11/2016 | |
1/8/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/12/2016 | |
NOTE: KURT KLITZKE PHD | |||
1/4/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/5/2016 | |
1/4/2016 | SUM - Summons | 1/5/2016 | |
1/4/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2016 | |
NOTE: BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER OF ILLINOIS LLC | |||
1/4/2016 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2016 | |
NOTE: DONALD A GREENE II | |||
12/30/2015 | ANS - Answer | 1/4/2016 | Defendant(10) |
NOTE: PAID | |||
12/28/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/29/2015 | |
NOTE: DONALD A GREENE | |||
12/28/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/29/2015 | |
NOTE: PLATINUM MEDICAL LLC | |||
12/28/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/29/2015 | |
12/28/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/29/2015 | |
12/28/2015 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 12/28/2015 | |
NOTE: First Amended Complaint | |||
12/18/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/21/2015 | |
12/18/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/22/2015 | |
NOTE: SUTTON MEMORIAL FUNERAL HOME INC | |||
12/17/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/18/2015 | |
NOTE: BIOLOGICAL RESOURCE CENTER INC | |||
12/17/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/18/2015 | |
12/16/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/18/2015 | |
NOTE: VISTA HOSPICE CARE INC | |||
12/16/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/17/2015 | |
12/14/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2015 | |
NOTE: STEPHEN GORE | |||
12/14/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/15/2015 | |
NOTE: SALLY GORE | |||
12/14/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2015 | |
12/14/2015 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2015 | |
12/7/2015 | COM - Complaint | 12/8/2015 | |
12/7/2015 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/8/2015 | |
12/7/2015 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/8/2015 | |
12/7/2015 | NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials | 12/8/2015 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/25/2016 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
8/8/2016 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
11/1/2016 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
11/10/2016 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
12/15/2016 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/11/2017 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
3/10/2017 | 15:30 | Status Conference |
3/16/2017 | 14:30 | Status Conference |
5/4/2017 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
6/9/2017 | 15:30 | Status Conference |
8/30/2017 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
11/6/2017 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
12/5/2017 | 14:40 | Status Conference |
1/12/2018 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
3/23/2018 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
6/18/2018 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
8/22/2018 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
10/30/2018 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
1/31/2019 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
2/1/2019 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
3/15/2019 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
3/18/2019 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
3/29/2019 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/30/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
6/14/2019 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
7/18/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
8/13/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
9/6/2019 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/17/2019 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
9/27/2019 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
10/14/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/17/2019 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/21/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/21/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/24/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/28/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/29/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/30/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/31/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/4/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/5/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/6/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/7/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/12/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/13/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/14/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/18/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/19/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
12/16/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
4/22/2020 | 10:00 | Default Hearing |
6/5/2020 | 13:30 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
6/22/2020 | F:Nicholas Bonnes | $671.80 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Angelina Merrill | |||||
F:Erika Elam-Prewitt | |||||
A: Arthur Rathburn | |||||
A: Elizabeth Rathburn | |||||
6/22/2020 | F:Nicholas Bonnes | $75,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
F:Angelina Merrill | |||||
F:Erika Elam-Prewitt | |||||
A: Arthur Rathburn | |||||
A: Elizabeth Rathburn | |||||
6/22/2020 | F:Suzanne Visser | $405.50 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Biological Resource Center Inc | |||||
6/22/2020 | F:Suzanne Visser | $75,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Biological Resource Center Inc | |||||
6/17/2020 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
3/24/2020 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
2/25/2020 | F:Platinum Training L L C | $169.76 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Platinum Medical L L C | |||||
F:Platinum Medical Inc | |||||
F:Charles Oddo | |||||
F:Amy Oddo | |||||
A: Nancy Culver | |||||
A: Lee Ann Druding | |||||
A: Jill Hansen | |||||
A: Troy Harp | |||||
A: Gwen Timmerman | |||||
A: Gwendolyn Aloia | |||||
A: Tanya Caruso | |||||
A: Erika Elam-Prewitt | |||||
A: Agnes Hansen | |||||
A: Amanda Waterman | |||||
A: Jane Meier | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Platinum Training L L C | $30,411.53 | One Time | Principal | |
F:Platinum Medical L L C | |||||
F:Platinum Medical Inc | |||||
F:Charles Oddo | |||||
F:Amy Oddo | |||||
A: John T Chaney | |||||
A: Nancy Culver | |||||
A: Lee Ann Druding | |||||
A: Jill Hansen | |||||
A: Troy Harp | |||||
A: Phyllis Meadows | |||||
A: Gwen Timmerman | |||||
A: Gwendolyn Aloia | |||||
A: Betty Beach | |||||
A: Debbie Beaugez | |||||
A: Tanya Caruso | |||||
A: Nancy Cooper | |||||
A: John Peterson | |||||
A: Suzanne Visser | |||||
A: Richelle Wallace | |||||
A: Joann Waller | |||||
A: Amanda Waterman | |||||
A: Erika Elam-Prewitt | |||||
A: Donna Rector | |||||
A: Anastacia Moore | |||||
A: Mary Salinas | |||||
A: Jane Meier | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Platinum Medical L L C | $5,000.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Platinum Medical Inc | |||||
F:Charles Oddo | |||||
F:Amy Oddo | |||||
F:Platinum Training L L C | |||||
A: Nancy Culver | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Platinum Training L L C | $5,000.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Platinum Medical L L C | |||||
F:Platinum Medical Inc | |||||
F:Charles Oddo | |||||
F:Amy Oddo | |||||
A: Jill Hansen | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Tanya Caruso | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Tanya Caruso | $1,500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Nancy Culver | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Nancy Culver | $1,500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Nancy Cooper | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Nancy Cooper | $1,500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Gwen Timmerman | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Gwen Timmerman | $750,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Lee Ann Druding | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Lee Ann Druding | $750,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Troy Harp | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Troy Harp | $500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Jill Hansen | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Jill Hansen | $500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Debbie Beaugez | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Debbie Beaugez | $500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Agnes Hansen | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Agnes Hansen | $500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Gwendolyn Aloia | $5,000,000.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
1/24/2020 | F:Gwendolyn Aloia | $500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Sally Gore | |||||
F:Maricopa County Creditor | $2,176.79 | One Time | Judgment for Jury Fees | ||
A: Burg Simpson | |||||
A: Donna Rector | |||||
A: Mary Salinas | |||||
A: Jane Meier | |||||
A: John T Chaney | |||||
A: Phyllis Meadows | |||||
A: Helen Peterson | |||||
A: Betty Beach | |||||
A: Suzanne Visser | |||||
A: Richelle Wallace | |||||
A: Joann Waller | |||||
A: Amanda Waterman | |||||
F:Maricopa County Creditor | $2,176.79 | One Time | Judgment for Jury Fees | ||
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
11/15/2019 | F:Chris McHenry | $75,000.00 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Charles Oddo | |||||
A: Amy Oddo | |||||
A: Platinum Training L L C | |||||
11/15/2019 | F:Michelle Gill | $75,000.00 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Charles Oddo | |||||
A: Amy Oddo | |||||
A: Platinum Training L L C | |||||
11/15/2019 | F:John Peterson | $75,000.00 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied |
A: Stephen Gore | |||||
A: Charles Oddo | |||||
A: Amy Oddo | |||||
A: Platinum Training L L C |