Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-012458 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 10/29/2015 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil eFile
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Bolton Anderson   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Florence Anderson   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Sharon Atwood   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
David Barnes   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Dawnna Barnes   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Jean Battista   Plaintiff  Unknown  Jonathan Dessaules 
Virginia Baughman   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Edward Berger   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Olga Carlson   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Kenneth Gegg   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Mary Gransden   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Joanne Greathouse   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Regina Heck   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Ray Hicks   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Linda Hicks   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Sherry Johnson-Traver   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Shirley Koers   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Susan Marsh   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
George McClain   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Sheryl McClain   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Elizabeth Mercer   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Arlef Moyer   Plaintiff  Unknown  Jonathan Dessaules 
James Napier   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Arthur Nealt   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Diane Patrakis   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Jefferson Payton   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Carole Poperowitz   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Paul Richman   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Gloria Richman   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Donna Sies   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Gay Sousek   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Anne Randall Stewart   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Wendy Wood   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Angelo Zappella   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Recreation Centers Of Sun City Inc   Defendant    Christopher Lavoy 
Petunia L L C   Plaintiff    Jonathan Dessaules 
Linda Moyer   Third Party Defendant  Female  Jonathan Dessaules 
Richard Stewart   Third Party Defendant  Male  Jonathan Dessaules 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/7/2020  ORD - Order  1/7/2020   
NOTE: Re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Applications for Attorneys’ Fees and Costs 
1/3/2020  STP - Stipulation  1/6/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Applications for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
11/8/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/8/2019   
11/5/2019  REP - Report  11/6/2019   
NOTE: Joint Status Report 
10/28/2019  ORD - Order  10/28/2019   
NOTE: CONTINUE STATUS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 
10/22/2019  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  10/23/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Continue Status/Trial Setting Conference 
10/10/2019  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/10/2019   
9/13/2019  NOT - Notice  9/18/2019   
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of its Supplemental Brief Regarding S.B. 1094 
9/10/2019  RES - Response  9/13/2019   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING S.B. 1094 
9/3/2019  NOT - Notice  9/5/2019   
NOTE: Defendant's Supplemental Brief Regarding S.B. 1094 
8/26/2019  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/26/2019   
8/21/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/21/2019   
8/21/2019  NOT - Notice  8/23/2019   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF POSITION REGARDING RETROACTIVITY ISSUE 
8/15/2019  ORD - Order  8/15/2019   
NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
8/13/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/13/2019   
8/13/2019  ORD - Order  8/13/2019   
NOTE: EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE REPLIES 
8/13/2019  NOT - Notice  8/14/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Errata re: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Amended Motion for Class Certification 
8/12/2019  ORD - Order  8/12/2019   
NOTE: EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE REPLIES 
8/12/2019  MOT - Motion  8/14/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 
8/12/2019  REL - Reply  8/14/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Amended Motion for Class Certification 
8/12/2019  STA - Statement  8/14/2019   
NOTE: Statement Noting Death of Third-Party Defendant Richard Stewart 
8/12/2019  REL - Reply  8/14/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 
8/8/2019  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  8/8/2019   
8/8/2019  STP - Stipulation  8/9/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiffs' to File Replies 
7/29/2019  STP - Stipulation  7/31/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Replies 
6/28/2019  ORD - Order  6/28/2019   
NOTE: EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE REPLIES 
6/25/2019  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  6/25/2019   
6/25/2019  STP - Stipulation  6/26/2019   
NOTE: Stipulation too Extend The Deadline for Plaintiffs' to File Replies 
6/19/2019  ORD - Order  6/19/2019   
NOTE: granting RCSC’s Motion to Exceed Page Limit and allowing the three-page extension 
6/17/2019  MOT - Motion  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Defendant's Motion to Exceed Page Limit 
6/17/2019  REL - Reply  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
6/14/2019  DCL - Declaration  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Declaration of Christopher A. LaVoy in Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/14/2019  RES - Response  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/14/2019  RES - Response  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/14/2019  DCL - Declaration  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Declaration of Jan Ek in Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/14/2019  RES - Response  6/18/2019   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification 
6/5/2019  NOT - Notice  6/6/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Agreed Additional Extension 
5/17/2019  NOT - Notice  5/20/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Second Agreed Extension 
4/30/2019  NOT - Notice  5/1/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Agreed Extension 
4/9/2019  RES - Response  4/11/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
4/9/2019  SOF - Statement Of Facts  4/11/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and In Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
4/9/2019  RES - Response  4/11/2019   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DAMAGES) 
4/9/2019  MOT - Motion  4/11/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification 
4/9/2019  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  4/11/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 
4/3/2019  NOT - Notice  4/4/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address and Law Firm 
2/26/2019  NOT - Notice  2/27/2019   
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
10/26/2018  SCO – Scheduling Order  10/26/2018   
NOTE: Order 
10/15/2018  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  10/16/2018   
NOTE: First Joint Report Regarding Phase Two 
9/27/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  9/27/2018   
9/24/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  9/24/2018   
9/17/2018  AFF - Affidavit  9/19/2018   
NOTE: Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Request for Rule 56(d) Relief 
9/17/2018  MOT - Motion  9/19/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Conduct Phase Two Discovery or Request for Rule 56d Relief 
9/6/2018  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/6/2018   
8/23/2018  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/23/2018   
8/13/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  8/13/2018   
8/10/2018  DCL - Declaration  8/14/2018   
NOTE: Declaration of Janet Ek 
8/10/2018  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  8/14/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
8/10/2018  SOF - Statement Of Facts  8/14/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
8/2/2018  MOT - Motion  8/6/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Request for an Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Class Certification 
8/1/2018  REL - Reply  8/3/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Class Certification 
7/27/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/27/2018   
7/20/2018  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  7/20/2018   
7/20/2018  079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial  7/20/2018   
7/20/2018  RES - Response  7/23/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for an Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Class Certification 
7/13/2018  NOT - Notice  7/16/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Non-Objection Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Deceased Plaintiff Gransden 
7/6/2018  RQH - Request For Hearing  7/9/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Request for an Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Class Certification 
7/5/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/5/2018   
6/25/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  6/26/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Claims by Deceased Plaintiff Mary Gransden 
6/22/2018  REL - Reply  6/26/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the Planned Community Act 
6/22/2018  REL - Reply  6/26/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 
6/6/2018  NOT - Notice  6/7/2018   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS’ TO FILE REPLY ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND REPLY ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
5/30/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  5/30/2018   
5/18/2018  RES - Response  5/22/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
5/18/2018  RES - Response  5/22/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
5/18/2018  MOT - Motion  5/22/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
5/18/2018  DCL - Declaration  5/22/2018   
NOTE: Declaration of Christopher A. LaVoy 
5/18/2018  RES - Response  5/22/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
5/2/2018  ORD - Order  5/2/2018   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES 
4/24/2018  STP - Stipulation  4/26/2018   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Certain Phase I Scheduling Order Deadlines 
3/30/2018  SOF - Statement Of Facts  4/3/2018   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE PLANNED COMMUNITY ACT, A.R.S. § 33-1801, et. seq. 
3/30/2018  MOT - Motion  4/3/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
3/30/2018  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  4/3/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the Planned Community Act 
3/19/2018  ORD - Order  3/19/2018   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES 
3/14/2018  STP - Stipulation  3/16/2018   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Certain Phase I Scheduling Order Deadlines 
3/1/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  3/1/2018   
2/21/2018  STA - Statement  2/23/2018   
NOTE: Statement NotING Death of Plaintiff Mary Gransden 
2/5/2018  REL - Reply  2/7/2018   
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
1/30/2018  NOT - Notice  1/31/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Agreed Extension 
1/11/2018  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  1/11/2018   
1/9/2018  RES - Response  1/11/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiff Gegg's Response to Statement of Facts and Counterstatement of Facts 
1/9/2018  RES - Response  1/11/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiff Gegg's Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
12/26/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue  12/26/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
12/26/2017  NOT - Notice  12/27/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
12/26/2017  NOT - Notice  12/27/2017   
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
12/21/2017  079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial  12/21/2017   
12/21/2017  ORD - Order  12/21/2017   
NOTE: EXTENDING CERTAIN SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES 
12/20/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  12/20/2017   
12/18/2017  STP - Stipulation  12/19/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Certain Phase I Scheduling Order Deadlines 
12/14/2017  NOT - Notice  12/15/2017   
NOTE: Notice of No Response to Motion to Dismiss Claims by Deceased Plaintiffs Lavina Dawson, Michael Baker, Charles Wood and Catherine Fuller 
12/12/2017  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  12/12/2017   
12/6/2017  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  12/6/2017   
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF THERESE TERRIS WITH PREJUDICE 
12/4/2017  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  12/5/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Entry of Order Dismissing Plaintiff Therese Terris With Prejudice 
11/21/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/22/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Claims by Deceased Plaintiffs Lavina Dawson, Michael Baker, Charles Wood and Catherine Fuller 
11/21/2017  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  11/22/2017   
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
11/21/2017  SOF - Statement Of Facts  11/22/2017   
NOTE: Defendant's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
11/7/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  11/7/2017   
8/25/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  8/25/2017   
8/22/2017  063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel  8/22/2017   
8/21/2017  REL - Reply  8/22/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Angelo Zappella, Paul Richman and Gloria Richman, only; and for Protective Order 
8/17/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/18/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order 
8/16/2017  ANS - Answer  8/17/2017   
NOTE: Answer to Third-Party Complaint 
8/8/2017  RES - Response  8/10/2017   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION 1) TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS ANGELO ZAPPELLA, PAUL RICHMAN AND GLORIA RICHMAN, ONLY; AND 2) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 
7/31/2017  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  8/1/2017   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service / LINDA MOYER AND RICHARD STEWART 
7/12/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  7/13/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion (1) to Dismiss Plaintiffs Angelo Zappella, Paul Richman and Gloria Richman, only; and (2) for Protective Order 
7/7/2017  STA - Statement  7/10/2017   
NOTE: Statement Noting Death of Plaintiff Catherine Fuller 
6/22/2017  SCM - Subsequent Complaint  6/23/2017   
NOTE: Third-Party Complaint 
6/20/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  6/20/2017   
6/12/2017  REL - Reply  6/14/2017   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint 
6/1/2017  NOT - Notice  6/5/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Agreed Extension 
5/22/2017  RES - Response  5/24/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint 
5/11/2017  STA - Statement  5/13/2017   
NOTE: Statement Noting Deaths of Plaintiffs Michael Baker and Charles Wood 
5/10/2017  NOT - Notice  5/12/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Suggestion of Death Pursuant to Ariz. R. Civ. P. 25 as to Plaintiff Lavina Dawson 
5/3/2017  MOT - Motion  5/5/2017   
NOTE: Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint 
4/4/2017  SCO – Scheduling Order  4/4/2017   
NOTE: AMENDMENT TO SECOND JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER 
3/29/2017  STP - Stipulation  3/30/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadlines and Amend Scheduling Order 
3/14/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/14/2017   
9/8/2016  SCO – Scheduling Order  9/8/2016   
NOTE: SECOND JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/26/2016  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  8/26/2016   
NOTE: Second Joint Report (Complex Case) 
6/15/2016  ANS - Answer  6/15/2016   
NOTE: Answer to Amended Complaint 
5/31/2016  MEM - Memorandum  6/1/2016   
NOTE: Joint Status Memorandum 
5/26/2016  AMC - Amended Complaint  5/27/2016   
NOTE: Amended Complaint 
5/25/2016  ORD - Order  5/25/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
5/19/2016  STP - Stipulation  5/19/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint 
5/12/2016  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  5/12/2016   
3/28/2016  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  3/28/2016   
3/24/2016  SCO – Scheduling Order  3/30/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED 
3/23/2016  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  3/23/2016   
NOTE: Joint Motion for Reconsideration 
3/10/2016  022 - ME: Order Signed  3/10/2016   
3/8/2016  SCO – Scheduling Order  3/11/2016   
3/4/2016  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  3/4/2016   
NOTE: Joint Report (Complex Case) 
1/21/2016  325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation  1/21/2016   
1/6/2016  NOT - Notice  1/6/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Errata to Defendant Recreation Centers of Sun City, Inc.'s Answer 
12/11/2015  CER - Certificate  12/11/2015   
NOTE: Certification of Complexity 
12/11/2015  MOT - Motion  12/11/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR DESIGNATION AS A COMPLEX CASE 
12/11/2015  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  12/11/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S CERTIFICATE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING COMPULSORY ARBITRATION 
12/11/2015  ANS - Answer  12/11/2015   
NOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $237 
11/5/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/10/2015   
NOTE: RECREATION CENTERS OF SUN CITY 
11/5/2015  SUM - Summons  11/9/2015   
10/29/2015  COM - Complaint  10/30/2015   
10/29/2015  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  10/30/2015   
10/29/2015  CSH - Coversheet  10/30/2015   
10/29/2015  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  10/30/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/1/2016  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
3/9/2017  9:00  Status Conference 
11/6/2017  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
12/4/2017  8:30  Status Conference 
12/18/2017  8:30  Status Conference 
2/9/2018  10:00  Oral Argument 
2/16/2018  14:30  Oral Argument 
8/7/2018  9:30  Oral Argument 
8/21/2018  13:30  Oral Argument 
9/25/2018  8:45  Oral Argument 
8/15/2019  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/22/2019  8:30  Oral Argument 
10/29/2019  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/8/2019  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file