Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-009394 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Fox
File Date: 9/25/2015 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Steve Madrid   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
David C Madrid   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/23/2022  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  2/25/2022   
NOTE: Satisfaction of judgment 
2/23/2022  SJG - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO GARNISHEE ONLY  2/25/2022   
NOTE: Satisfaction of judgment against garnishee 
2/2/2022  JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee  2/2/2022   
NOTE: Order 
1/26/2022  APL - Application  1/31/2022   
NOTE: Application for judgment against garnishee 
1/6/2022  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/11/2022   
1/6/2022  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/11/2022   
NOTE: DAVID C MADRID 
12/20/2021  ORD - Order  12/20/2021   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO JOIN THIRD PARTY PURSUANT TO A.R.S. ยง12-1595 
12/9/2021  MOT - Motion  12/13/2021   
NOTE: Motion to join third party 
11/29/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/2/2021   
11/29/2021  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  12/3/2021   
11/29/2021  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  12/13/2021  Garnishee Defendant(3)  
11/17/2021  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  11/24/2021   
3/2/2016  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  3/2/2016   
2/26/2016  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  3/2/2016  Defendant(2)  
2/26/2016  ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees  3/2/2016   
2/26/2016  ANS - Answer  3/1/2016  Defendant(2)  
2/24/2016  DFJ - Default Judgment  3/2/2016   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
2/9/2016  SOC - Statement Of Costs  2/9/2016   
NOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs 
2/9/2016  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  2/9/2016   
NOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Judgment by Default Without Hearing 
2/9/2016  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  2/9/2016   
NOTE: Affidavit in support of attorneys fees 
11/25/2015  NOT - Notice  11/25/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
11/5/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/6/2015   
NOTE: STEVE MADRID 
11/5/2015  SUM - Summons  11/6/2015   
9/25/2015  COM - Complaint  9/29/2015   
9/25/2015  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  9/29/2015   
9/25/2015  CSH - Coversheet  9/29/2015   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
2/24/2016  F:U S Collections West Inc  $720.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Steve Madrid         
2/24/2016  F:U S Collections West Inc  $360.00  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Steve Madrid         
2/24/2016  F:U S Collections West Inc  $3,777.61  One Time  Interest  Satisfied 
  A: Steve Madrid         
2/24/2016  F:U S Collections West Inc  $12,784.10  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Steve Madrid