« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2015-004240
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
4/10/2015
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Flagstaff Living Wage Coalition, The
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mikkel Jordahl
Party Name
Steven Levin
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Mikkel Jordahl
Party Name
Nicole Marie Ruiz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Mikkel Jordahl
Party Name
State Of Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Driscoll-Maceachron
Party Name
Mark Brnovich
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Driscoll-Maceachron
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
STJ - Stipulated Judgment
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL STIPULATED JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment
Docket Date
6/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/10/2015
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
6/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief
Filing Date
6/9/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Second Supplemental Affidavit of Flagstaff Living Wage Coalition (Eva Putzova-Chairperson)
Filing Date
6/1/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: THIRD STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE
Filing Date
5/28/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Stipulated Motion to Extend Answer Deadline
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: SECOND STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Answer Deadline
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Extend Answer Deadline
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Delivery On: (1) Office of the Speaker of Arizona House of Representatives and (2) Office of the President of Arizona State Senate
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARK BRNOVICH
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS / OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS / AFFIDAVIT OF FLAGSTAFF LIVING WAGE COALITION
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/1/2015
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Flagstaff Living Wage Coalition, The, Steven Levin, Nicole Marie Ruiz
A: State Of Arizona
Amount
$7,500.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status