Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2015-003315 | Judge: | Pineda, Susanna |
File Date: | 3/9/2015 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Daniel Russo | Plaintiff | Male | Caroline Pilch |
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System | Defendant | Charles Grube | |
Brian Tobin | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
Richard Petrenka | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
Gregory Ferguson | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
Lauren Kingry | Defendant | Female | Charles Grube |
Jeff McHenry | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
Randie Stein | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
William C Davis | Defendant | Male | Charles Grube |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/5/2017 | JUD - Judgment | 9/5/2017 | |
NOTE: FINAL DECLARATORY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION | |||
8/31/2017 | STP - Stipulation | 9/1/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Entry of Judgment Resolving All Remaining Issues | |||
7/13/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/13/2017 | |
7/6/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/7/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Unresolved Issues for July 10, 2017 Status Conference | |||
5/8/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 5/8/2017 | |
5/4/2017 | JUD - Judgment | 5/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
4/13/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/13/2017 | |
4/7/2017 | REQ - Request | 4/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Request to Reconvene Oral Argument on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment | |||
1/20/2016 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/20/2016 | |
12/7/2015 | ORD - Order | 12/7/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY FILING OF JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER | |||
11/30/2015 | MOT - Motion | 11/30/2015 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Stay Filing of Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order Until Ruling on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment | |||
10/30/2015 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 10/30/2015 | |
10/21/2015 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/21/2015 | |
9/8/2015 | REL - Reply | 9/9/2015 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY SUPPORTING THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
8/17/2015 | RES - Response | 8/17/2015 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Controverting Statement of Facts | |||
8/17/2015 | REL - Reply | 8/17/2015 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment and Response Opposing Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
8/13/2015 | ORD - Order | 8/13/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING A JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER | |||
8/12/2015 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 8/12/2015 | |
8/11/2015 | MOT - Motion | 8/11/2015 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend The Date for Filing A Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order | |||
8/5/2015 | 339 - ME: 100 Day Notice | 8/5/2015 | |
7/31/2015 | STP - Stipulation | 7/31/2015 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Extending Time For Summary Judgment Reply Under Ariz. R. Civ. P. 56(c)(2) | |||
7/20/2015 | RES - Response | 7/20/2015 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Response Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
7/20/2015 | RES - Response | 7/20/2015 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Facts Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
7/14/2015 | STP - Stipulation | 7/14/2015 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE UNDER ARIZ. R. CIV. P. 56(C) (2) | |||
6/8/2015 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 6/8/2015 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
6/8/2015 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 6/8/2015 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF DANIEL RUSSO’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
4/21/2015 | ANS - Answer | 4/22/2015 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER / CO-CHARGE R# 24481276 | |||
4/21/2015 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/22/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance for Defendants | |||
3/13/2015 | SUM - Summons | 3/17/2015 | |
3/12/2015 | SUM - Summons | 3/17/2015 | |
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: PUBLIC SAFETY PERSONNELL RETIREMENT SYSTEM | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: JEFF MCHENRY | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: LAUREN KINGRY | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: WILLIAM C DAVIS | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: GREGORY FERGUSON | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: RANDIE STEIN | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: RICHARD PETRENKA AND PUBLIC SAFETY PERSONNEL RETIREMEMT SYSTEM | |||
3/12/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: BRIAN TOBIN | |||
3/9/2015 | COM - Complaint | 3/10/2015 | |
3/9/2015 | CSH - Coversheet | 3/10/2015 | |
3/9/2015 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/10/2015 | |
3/9/2015 | NOT - Notice | 3/10/2015 | |
NOTE: OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY REGARDING LEGISLATIE CHANGES TO ARS 38-853.01 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/28/2015 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
5/4/2017 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
7/10/2017 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
9/29/2017 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
9/5/2017 | F:Daniel Russo Jr. | $18,265.50 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System | |||||
9/5/2017 | F:Daniel Russo Jr. | $597.30 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System | |||||
5/4/2017 | F:Daniel Russo Jr. | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System | |||||
A: Brian Tobin | |||||
A: Richard Petrenka | |||||
A: Gregory Ferguson | |||||
A: Lauren Kingry | |||||
A: Jeff McHenry | |||||
A: Randie Stein | |||||
A: William C Davis |