« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2015-002274 Judge: Gates, Pamela
File Date: 1/27/2015 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Andrew Provencio   Plaintiff  Male  Sal Rivera 
Tiffany Young   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Matt Young   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
A & T Management L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
M & T Management L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Sunlight & Soil L L C   Cross Claimant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/3/2019  RNM - Returned Mail  5/3/2019   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
4/9/2019  NOT - Notice  4/11/2019   
NOTE: SHERIFFS LEVY ON PERSONAL PROPERTY 
4/9/2019  RWT – Return of Writ  4/11/2019   
4/9/2019  RWT – Return of Writ  4/11/2019   
4/9/2019  WRT - Writ  4/11/2019   
NOTE: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION 
4/9/2019  WRT - Writ  4/11/2019   
NOTE: OF SPECIAL EXECUTION 
4/5/2019  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/5/2019   
4/4/2019  ORD - Order  4/9/2019   
NOTE: STIPULATED / ON MOTION TO QUASH THE SHERIFFS SALE SET ON APRIL 4, 2019 AT 10:00AM AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF LIEN 
4/2/2019  MTQ - Motion To Quash  4/3/2019   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO QUASH THE SHERIFF'??S SALE SET ON APRIL 4, 2019 AT 10:00AM and SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT and RELEASE OF LIEN ARS §§ 33-964, 967 
4/2/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/5/2019   
3/7/2019  PRA - Praecipe  3/8/2019   
9/6/2018  NOT - Notice  9/7/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Entry of Stock Garnishment Judgment 
9/6/2018  PRA - Praecipe  9/7/2018   
NOTE: WRIT OF SPECIAL EXECUTION 
8/31/2018  022 - ME: Order Signed  8/31/2018   
8/30/2018  JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee  9/4/2018   
NOTE: ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
8/27/2018  RNM - Returned Mail  8/27/2018   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
8/27/2018  RNM - Returned Mail  8/27/2018   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
8/13/2018  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  8/13/2018   
8/13/2018  MEM - Memorandum  8/14/2018   
NOTE: Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) 
8/10/2018  NOT - Notice  8/14/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Association of Counsel 
8/9/2018  JUD - Judgment  8/10/2018   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
8/6/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/6/2018   
7/26/2018  APL - Application  7/27/2018   
NOTE: Application for Judgment Against Garnishee on Writ of Garnishment 
7/20/2018  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  7/23/2018  Defendant(4)  
NOTE: Answer of Garnishee Desert Medical Campus Inc. 
7/3/2018  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  7/6/2018   
7/3/2018  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/10/2018   
6/21/2018  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  6/22/2018   
6/4/2018  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  6/6/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES 
5/23/2018  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  6/1/2018   
5/21/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  5/21/2018   
5/16/2018  NOT - Notice  5/18/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Submitting Exhibits for May 18, 2018 Hearing 
5/4/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  5/7/2018   
NOTE: CLERK OF COURT, COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION ONE 
4/30/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  5/1/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
4/30/2018  AIX - Appeals Index  5/1/2018   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
4/30/2018  LET - Letter  5/1/2018   
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
4/20/2018  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  4/20/2018   
4/13/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue  4/16/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Court's Order and Request for Sanctions Against Defendant Matthew Young 
4/2/2018  RES - Response  4/3/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/NOTICE OF CROSS/COUNTER MOTIONS SANCTIONS/ORAL ARGUMENTS/EMERGENCY RELIEF RE:PLAINTIFFS 2/13/18 MOTION 
4/2/2018  MOT - Motion  4/6/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO COMPEL PALINTIFF TO PRODUCE THE 02/13/18 MOTION 
3/26/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/27/2018  Defendant(2)  
3/26/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/27/2018  Defendant(2)  
3/26/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/27/2018  Defendant(3)  
3/26/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  3/27/2018  Defendant(3)  
3/26/2018  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  3/27/2018   
NOTE: OF COSTS OF PREPARING TRANSCRIPTS ON APPEAL 
3/19/2018  056 - ME: Hearing Set  3/19/2018   
2/26/2018  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  2/26/2018   
2/26/2018  JUD - Judgment  2/26/2018   
NOTE: JUDGMENT 
2/13/2018  MOT - Motion  2/14/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT’S ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT MATTHEW YOUNG 
2/8/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  2/8/2018   
2/7/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  2/7/2018   
2/1/2018  MOT - Motion  2/2/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: EMERGENCY Motion for Clarification RE: THE COURTS APPLICATION OF LEGAL PRINCIPALS & STATUTES RE: RULINGS MADE BY, AND, OR THROUGH DISMISSED PARTY, DESERT MEDICAL CAMPUS, INC. 
2/1/2018  RES - Response  2/5/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
1/25/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  1/25/2018   
1/23/2018  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  1/24/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/ AND COSTS & PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
1/22/2018  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  1/24/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Application for Attorney Fees and Costs & Proposed Form of Judgment 
1/19/2018  MOT - Motion  1/22/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Motion for Clarification Re: 11/21/2017 Minute Entry Ruling 
1/18/2018  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  1/18/2018   
1/12/2018  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  1/12/2018   
1/11/2018  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  1/12/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
1/8/2018  ORD - Order  1/10/2018   
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT ATTORNEY'S FEE APPLICATION AND FILE PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
1/8/2018  MOT - Motion  1/10/2018  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT ATTORNEYS FEE APPLICATION AND FINAL PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
12/22/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  12/27/2017   
12/21/2017  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  12/21/2017   
12/19/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue  12/20/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT ATTORNEYS’ FEE APPLICATON AND FINAL PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
11/27/2017  081 - ME: Trial Vacated  11/27/2017   
11/20/2017  RES - Response  11/22/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/15/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/15/2017   
11/9/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/13/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S REMAINING CLAIMS AND REQUEST TO VACATE JURY TRIAL 
11/6/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  11/6/2017   
10/26/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  10/26/2017   
10/25/2017  APL - Application  10/26/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Supplement to Application for Order to Show Cause 
10/25/2017  REQ - Request  10/25/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 
10/25/2017  REQ - Request  10/25/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Request for Redaction OF Defendants' Exhibits 
10/20/2017  APL - Application  10/23/2017   
NOTE: APPLICATION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
10/19/2017  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  10/19/2017   
10/16/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/17/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: CORPORATIONS RIGHTS AS A NATURAL PERSON & MOTION TO STAY MSJ(S) PENDING APPEAL 
10/16/2017  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  10/19/2017   
10/16/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/18/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: ORAL ARGUMENTS AND/OR ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST TO STAY RE: RESTRAINING ORDER 
10/16/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/18/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: ORAL ARGUMENTS AND/OR ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST TO STAY RE: RESTRAINING ORDER 
10/16/2017  MOT - Motion  10/18/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: FOR CLARIFICATION PAM DONNER A COURT APPOINTED RECEIVER? 
10/16/2017  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  10/18/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS/CROSS CLAIMANTS/ 
10/13/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/17/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: RE: MINUTE ENTRY RULING PRECLUDING THE MY RIGHT TO A TRIAL BY JURY ON MY CLAIMS AGAINST PROVIDENCE, MOTION TO DISMISS 
10/6/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  10/6/2017   
10/4/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/4/2017   
10/4/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  10/4/2017   
10/3/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  10/3/2017   
10/1/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  10/4/2017   
9/29/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  10/4/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/29/2017  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  10/2/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Final Trial Witness List 
9/26/2017  ORD - Order  9/26/2017   
NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the relief requested 
9/25/2017  PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions  9/26/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
9/25/2017  STA - Statement  9/26/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement 
9/25/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  10/2/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/25/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  10/2/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/25/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  10/3/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/25/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  10/3/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/20/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  9/28/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/15/2017  RNM - Returned Mail  9/18/2017   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
9/14/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  9/14/2017   
9/13/2017  079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial  9/13/2017   
9/5/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/5/2017   
9/5/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  9/5/2017   
9/1/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference  9/1/2017   
8/30/2017  NOT - Notice  8/31/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DISCLOSURE OF CERTIFIED LETTER RE: AZDOR INTENT TO LEVY UNREPORTED $861,754.00 IN INCOME 45 DAY NOTICE SERVED TO TIFFANY YOUNG 08/29/2017 AND PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER 
8/29/2017  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/29/2017   
8/28/2017  NOT - Notice  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DISCLOSURE TO ALL PARTIES DISCLOSURE RE AZCC SECURITIES INVESTIGATIONS POSSESSION OF DOCUMENTS 
8/28/2017  MEM - Memorandum  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: CLARIFICATION FOLLOW UP TO MSJ HEARING 8/25/17 RE PLANTIFFS WRONGFUL STATEMENT SUNLIGH IS NOT A DEFENDANT IN THIS CASE 
8/28/2017  STA - Statement  8/29/2017  Defendant(4)  
NOTE: PROFIT AND LOSS 
8/25/2017  MOT - Motion  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO STRIKE FALSE STATMENTS MADE BY ANDREW PROVENCIO 
8/25/2017  OSC - Order To Show Cause  8/29/2017   
NOTE: EXPEDITED/ MEMORANDUM RE: UNCLE HERBS EDIBLE ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
8/25/2017  MOT - Motion  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO STRIKE 
8/25/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: ANDREW PROVENCE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF ALL LAW DEPOT PROMISSORY NOTES AND COMPLETE AUDIT LOGS 
8/25/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: ALL LAB TESTS FOR EDIBLES PRODUCED FROM UNCLE HERBS KITECHEN AND/OR DESERT MEDICAL CAMPUS INC 
8/25/2017  MOT - Motion  8/29/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: EXPEDITED / FOR CLARIFICATION, PAMELA DONNER, PROVENCIO IDENTY THEFT 
8/25/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES; ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
8/25/2017  MOT - Motion  8/29/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN TRAVELERS INSURANCE AS AN INDISPENSIBLE PARTY 
8/25/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: PROVENCIO/RIVERA TO PROVIDE GAP COMPLIANT ACCOUNTING DETAIL FOR 2017 FOR AUDITOR JOE EPPS 
8/25/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: SAL RIVERA TO PROVIDE COPIES OF ALL PUBLISHED ARTICLES, BYLAWS, OPERTING AGREEMENTS FOR ENTITIES NAMED OR DIRECTLY RELATED TO LITIGATION PROCEEDINGS 
8/25/2017  REQ - Request  8/29/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: FOR RULE 56D RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS 4 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTS; EMERGENCY ORAL ARGUMENTS REQUESTED 
8/21/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  8/21/2017   
8/21/2017  MIL - Motion In Limine  8/21/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS "EVIDENCE" AND WITNESSES DISCLOSED AFTER THE DISCOVERY CUT OFF 
8/21/2017  MOT - Motion  8/21/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order 
8/8/2017  REL - Reply  8/9/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANTS’ COUNTERCLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS FOR: 1. Statutory Misappropriation of Trade Secret (against Plaintiff); 2. Common Law Misappropriation of Confidential information (against Plaintiff); 3. Injunctive Relief (against Plaintiff); 4. Statutory Misappropriation of Trade Secret (against Desert Medical Campus); 5. Common Law Misappropriation of Confidential Information (against Desert Medical Campus) 
8/8/2017  REL - Reply  8/9/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's reply in support of HIS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE YOUNG DEFENDANTS’ CLAIMS FOR BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, CONVERSION AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT 
8/8/2017  REL - Reply  8/9/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON HIS DEFAMATION CLAIM 
8/7/2017  MOT - Motion  8/8/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion to Eliminate Requirement of a Second Settlement Conference 
8/7/2017  RES - Response  8/8/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Matthew Young's Emergency Motion to Compel Mandatory Indemnification with Advancement Fees and/or Alternative Motion for Breach of Contract/Summary Judgment 
8/7/2017  RES - Response  8/8/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motions to Enjoin (1) Teri Masterson (2) Pamela K Donner (3) Francis and (4) Erika Baczek, (5) Steve and (6) Lucinda Mahoney, (7) Mahoneypro, LLC, Valuesolutions, LLC (8) Mark Jacott and (9) Susan Jacott as Indispensable Parties 
8/7/2017  RES - Response  8/8/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Expedited Motion to Disqualify Attorney Sal Rivera 
8/3/2017  MOT - Motion  8/4/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Further Orders 
8/3/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/4/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Desert Medical Campus, Inc Without Prejudice 
8/3/2017  MOT - Motion  8/7/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY RULING ON PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF AND AGAINST SUNLIGHT & SOIL, LLC AND M & T MANAGEMENT, LLC 
7/28/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  7/28/2017   
7/24/2017  RES - Response  7/26/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO THE YOUNG DEFENDANTS’ “COMPLAINT, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MOTION TO ENJOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTY PAM DONNER, IDENTITY THEFT OF M&T MANAGEMENT, TIFFANY YOUNG’S PERSONAL IDENTITY CONTEMPT OF COURT 
7/24/2017  RES - Response  7/26/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to THE YOUNG Defendant's Motion to Compel Complete Insurance Policies 
7/19/2017  OSC - Order To Show Cause  7/21/2017   
NOTE: FAILURE TO MEDATE AS ORDERED BY THIS COURT 
7/19/2017  RES - Response  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIALL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/19/2017  RES - Response  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JDUGMENT 
7/19/2017  RES - Response  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMNMARY JDUGMENT-TRADE SECRET AND MOTION TO STRIKE QUASH AND OR VACATE PULS SANCTIONS BAD FAITH AND FUTHER CORSS AND/OR COUNTER CLAIM 
7/19/2017  RES - Response  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JDUGMENT - DEFAMATION 
7/19/2017  RES - Response  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-TRADE SECRET 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN TERI MASTERSON AS AN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES 
7/19/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: EXPEDITED / AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PLAINTIFF REFUSES TO PROVIDE COMPLETE INSURANCE POLICIES 
7/19/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/21/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: EMERGENCY / MANDATORY INDEMNIFICATION WITH ADVANCEMENT FEES AND/OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR BREECH OF CONTRACT / SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN STEVE AND LUCINDA MAHONEY, MAHONEYPRO, LLC VALUESOLUTIONS, LLC AND OTHER XYZ PARTIES TO BE NAMES AS AN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES, PAMELA K DONNER, FRANCIS AND ERICA BACZEK 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: EXPEDITED / TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY SAL RIVERA 
7/19/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: ALL PAYMENTS MADE TO MATTHEW YOUNG FOR DMC WAGES 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/21/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN ARIZONA COMPEREHENSIVE RESTURANT RETAIL SERVICES, LLC AND GOLDEN TOMATOES, LLC & OTHER XYZ PARTIES TO BE NAMED AS AN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES 
7/19/2017  MOT - Motion  7/24/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO ENJOIN MARC JACOTT AND SUSAN JACOTT HUSBAND AND WIFE AS AN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES 
7/19/2017  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  7/21/2017   
7/19/2017  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  7/24/2017  Defendant(2)  
7/10/2017  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/11/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PLAINTIFF REFUSES TO PROVIDE COMPLETE INSURANCE POLICIES 
7/5/2017  REQ - Request  7/6/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: FOR ORAL ARGUMENT 
7/5/2017  AMC - Amended Complaint  7/6/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: COMPLAINT, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MOTION TO ENJOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTY PAM DONNER, IDENTITY THEFT OF M & T MANAGEMENT, TIFFANY YOUNG'S PERSONAL IDENTITY CONTEMPT OF COURT REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUEMENT 
6/29/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting  6/29/2017   
6/27/2017  STA - Statement  6/28/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Disclosure  
6/21/2017  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  6/22/2017   
NOTE: Joint Status Report 
6/14/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  6/14/2017   
6/13/2017  NOT - Notice  6/14/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Addendum to PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS’ CLAIMS FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 3. CONVERSION; 4. UNJUST ENRICHMENT 
6/13/2017  ORD - Order  6/15/2017   
NOTE: THE YOUNG DEFENDANTS SHALL NOT COMMUNICATE,INTERFERE,TAKE OR ATTEMPT TO TAKE,ATTEMPT TO ACCESS OR TAKE LEGAL ACTION AGAINST DMC OPERATIONS 
6/12/2017  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/14/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/MOTOIN TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF AND AGAINST SUNLIGHT & OIL, LLC AND M&T MANAGEMENT 
6/12/2017  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/14/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS FOR 
6/12/2017  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/14/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON HIS DEFAMATION CLAIM 
6/12/2017  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  6/14/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS FOR: BREACH OF COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; CONVERSION; UNJUST ENRICHMENT 
5/12/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  5/17/2017  Defendant(3)  
5/12/2017  RES - Response  5/17/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN OTC 7 PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER 
5/12/2017  MOT - Motion  5/17/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER 
5/12/2017  MOT - Motion  5/17/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND 
5/12/2017  MOT - Motion  5/17/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER 
5/10/2017  RES - Response  5/12/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO THE YOUNG DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER 
5/9/2017  NOT - Notice  5/10/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANCE OF ADDRESS FOR LAW FIRM  
5/4/2017  APL - Application  5/5/2017  Defendant(3)  
NOTE: EXPEDITED/FOR STIPULATED PAYMENT FOR MATTHEW YOUNG WAGES DURING RECEIVERSHIP 
5/4/2017  RES - Response  5/5/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL / IN OPPOSITION TO AIKEN SCHENK HAWKINS AND RICCIARDI PC MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL DATED 04/12/17 
5/4/2017  RES - Response  5/5/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE / PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER 
4/26/2017  APL - Application  4/27/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Supplement to Application for Order to Show Cause AND PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER 
4/20/2017  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel  4/20/2017   
4/20/2017  RES - Response  4/19/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ IN OPPOSITION TO AIKEN SCHENK HAWKINS & RICCIARDI PCS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL DATED 4/12/2017 
4/18/2017  RES - Response  4/19/2017  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: EX PARTE/ IN OPPOSITION TO AIKEN SCHENK HAWKINS & RICCIARDI PCS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL 
4/12/2017  REL - Reply  4/14/2017   
NOTE: Reply in Support of its Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 
4/4/2017  ORD - Order  4/4/2017   
NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED continuing the deadline for the Parties to complete the Second Settlement Conference to July 10, 2017. 
3/30/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue  4/3/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Continue Deadline to Participate in a Settlement Conference 
3/29/2017  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  3/29/2017   
3/24/2017  RES - Response  3/27/2017   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiff's Application for Order to Show Cause 
3/21/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  3/22/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw As Counsel 
3/16/2017  056 - ME: Hearing Set  3/16/2017   
3/13/2017  PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause  3/13/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Application for Order to Show Cause 
3/9/2017  NOF - Notice Of Filing  3/10/2017   
NOTE: Notice of filing Final Report 
3/8/2017  ORD - Order  3/9/2017   
NOTE: Amended Notice of Settlement Conference 
1/30/2017  ORD - Order  1/31/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement Conference 
1/9/2017  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  1/9/2017   
1/9/2017  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  1/9/2017   
12/20/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  12/20/2016   
12/16/2016  ORD - Order  12/21/2016   
NOTE: TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP APPROVE FINAL ACCOUNTING EXONERATE BOND 
11/29/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  12/1/2016   
NOTE: Objection to Receiver's Proposed Order 
11/22/2016  REP - Report  11/28/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: Superior Court Receiver's Report for October 2016 and Notice of Intent to Pay Receiver's Fees and Expenses 
11/17/2016  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  11/18/2016   
NOTE: Joint Status Memorandum 
11/15/2016  NOT - Notice  11/17/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP; APPROVE FINAL ACCOUNTING; EXONERATE BOND; AND RELEASE RECEIVER 
10/27/2016  NMR - Not Of Filing Monthly Report  10/28/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S REPORT FOR SEPTEMBER 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
10/20/2016  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/20/2016   
10/20/2016  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  10/27/2016   
10/11/2016  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted  10/11/2016   
10/11/2016  STA - Statement  10/12/2016   
NOTE: Matthew and Tiffany Young's Closing Brief 
10/11/2016  STA - Statement  10/12/2016   
NOTE: Andrew Provencio's Closing Argument and Brief 
10/7/2016  ORD - Order  10/11/2016   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR CLOSING BRIEFS/ARGUMENT 
10/4/2016  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  10/5/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation and Motion to Continue Deadline for Closing Briefs/Argument 
9/26/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/26/2016   
9/23/2016  012 - ME: Trial  9/23/2016   
9/22/2016  WSH - Worksheet  9/23/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL / HEARING 
9/22/2016  012 - ME: Trial  9/22/2016   
9/21/2016  REP - Report  9/22/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: Superior Court Receiver's Report for August 2016 and Notice of Intent to Pay Receiver's Fees and Expenses 
9/21/2016  012 - ME: Trial  9/21/2016   
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF ANDREW RICHARD PROVENCIO 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: THE DEPOSITION OF KEVIN SINGER 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: THE DEPOSITION OF ANDREW PROVENCIO 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MATTHEW YOUNG 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF TIFFANY YOUNG 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: RECORDED INTERVIEW OF BRIAN JENKINS 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: DEPOSITION OF BEEJAN JANKA 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF TIFFANY YOUNG 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MATTHEW YOUNG 
9/19/2016  NOT - Notice  10/20/2016   
NOTE: RECORDED INTERVIEW OF STACI SCHOLL 
9/2/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  9/2/2016   
8/30/2016  STA - Statement  8/31/2016   
NOTE: Joint Pretrial Statement Pretrial Hearing Scheduled for August 31, 2016 
8/26/2016  ORD - Order  8/26/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT 
8/26/2016  REP - Report  8/26/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S REPORT FOR JULY 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
8/25/2016  MCO - Motion To Continue  8/26/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Deadline to File Joint Pretrial Statement 
8/23/2016  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  8/24/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT 
7/28/2016  REP - Report  7/28/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S REPORT FOR JUNE 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
7/26/2016  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  7/26/2016   
7/12/2016  MEM - Memorandum  7/13/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Memorandum, Regarding Status of Discovery 
7/8/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  7/8/2016   
7/8/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  7/8/2016   
6/30/2016  REP - Report  7/1/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S REPORT FOR APRIL 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
6/15/2016  REP - Report  6/16/2016   
NOTE: Joint Report 
5/27/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  5/27/2016   
5/23/2016  RES - Response  5/24/2016   
NOTE: Response to Receivers Request for Status Conference 
5/19/2016  ORD - Order  5/19/2016   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES 
5/19/2016  REP - Report  5/20/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS REPORT FOR APRIL 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
5/16/2016  RES - Response  5/16/2016   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES 
5/10/2016  NOT - Notice  5/10/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address for Law Firm 
5/9/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  5/9/2016   
5/4/2016  REQ - Request  5/4/2016   
NOTE: Receiver's Request for Status Conference 
4/29/2016  MOT - Motion  5/2/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES 
4/28/2016  REP - Report  4/28/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: Superior Court Receiver's Report for March 2016 and Notice of Intent to Pay Receiver's Fees and Expenses 
4/7/2016  089 - ME: Trial Setting  4/7/2016   
4/1/2016  REP - Report  4/1/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S REPORT FOR FEBRUARY 2016 AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
3/30/2016  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  3/31/2016   
NOTE: Joint Report 
3/18/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  3/18/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 
3/11/2016  ORD - Order  3/11/2016   
NOTE: Order GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION 
3/10/2016  MOT - Motion  3/10/2016   
NOTE: Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record For Defendant, M & T Management, LLC, With Client Consent 
3/7/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  3/14/2016   
3/2/2016  REP - Report  3/3/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S JANUARY 2016 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
2/23/2016  RES - Response  2/24/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to THE Defendants Motion to Consolidate 
2/16/2016  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  2/16/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
2/16/2016  RES - Response  2/17/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Monica Baviera and Jean Charles Richer's Response to Motion to Consolidate 
2/16/2016  RES - Response  2/17/2016   
NOTE: MONICA BAVIERA AND JEAN CHARLES RICHER’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
2/12/2016  ORD - Order  2/12/2016   
NOTE: ORDER TO CONTINUE BRIEFING DEADLINE ON DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
2/10/2016  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  2/10/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Continue Briefing Deadline on Defendants' Motion to Consolidate 
2/2/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/2/2016   
2/2/2016  REP - Report  2/3/2016  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S Reply In Support of Motion for Removal of Dockets From The Courts Record 
1/28/2016  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  1/28/2016   
NOTE: Motion to Consolidate 
1/27/2016  RES - Response  1/27/2016   
NOTE: Receiver's Response to Joint Disclosure of Accounting Expert 
1/22/2016  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  1/25/2016   
NOTE: JOINT STATUS REPORT 
1/15/2016  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/19/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS LIST OF LAY WITNESSES REGARDING ACCOUNTING AND OWNERSHIP ISSUES 
1/11/2016  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  1/11/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUSNEL 
1/8/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  1/8/2016   
NOTE: Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel With Client Consent 
1/5/2016  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  1/5/2016   
NOTE: Order 
12/29/2015  MOT - Motion  12/29/2015   
NOTE: Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for Defendants, Counterclaimants, and Cross-Claimants Tiffany Young, Matthew Young, and SuNlight & Soil, LLC, With Client Consent 
12/21/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  12/21/2015   
12/18/2015  REP - Report  12/18/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S NOVEMBER 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
12/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  12/8/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION EXHIBIT A 
12/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  12/8/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUCTIONS EXHIBIT B 
12/4/2015  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  12/8/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION EXHIBIT C 
11/25/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  11/25/2015   
11/20/2015  REP - Report  11/20/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S OCTOBER 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
11/19/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed  11/19/2015   
11/17/2015  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  11/19/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED 
11/17/2015  MTI – Motion to Intervene  11/17/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO INTERVENE and TO BRING CLAIMS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS and JOIN ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS-EFILE BILLING $319.00 
11/16/2015  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/16/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's List of Witnesses and Exhibits for November 23, 2015 Hearing  
11/16/2015  STP - Stipulation  11/16/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction 
11/9/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  11/9/2015   
11/9/2015  REQ - Request  11/10/2015   
NOTE: Request for Court Reporter 
11/6/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  11/6/2015   
11/6/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/6/2015   
11/5/2015  087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued  11/5/2015   
11/5/2015  RPI - Response to Petition for Injunction Against Harassment  11/5/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MATTHEW YOUNG’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR IMMEDIATE INJUNCTION AGAINST HARRASSMENT 
11/5/2015  MOT - Motion  11/5/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S JOINDER IN THE RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
11/3/2015  REL - Reply  11/4/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Reply in Support of his Verified Application for Receiver for all DMC Affiliated Entities  
11/3/2015  APL - Application  11/4/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Immediate Injunction Against Harrassment  
10/30/2015  MOT - Motion  10/30/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Order to Show Cause 
10/29/2015  REL - Reply  10/29/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES 
10/22/2015  RES - Response  10/22/2015   
NOTE: Tiffany Young and Matthew Young's Response to Plaintiff's Verified Application for Receiver for All DMC-Affiliated Entities 
10/21/2015  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  10/21/2015   
10/21/2015  REP - Report  10/21/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S SEPTEMBER 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
10/15/2015  MEM - Memorandum  10/15/2015   
NOTE: Receiver's Status Memorandum 
10/15/2015  MEM - Memorandum  10/15/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Status Memorandum 
10/15/2015  MEM - Memorandum  10/16/2015   
NOTE: Tiffany Young and Matthew Young's Status Memorandum 
10/14/2015  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/14/2015   
NOTE: Defendant Tiffany Young's Objection and Response Affidavit to Support Attorneys' Fees 
10/9/2015  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/9/2015   
10/7/2015  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance  10/7/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation to Continue Evidentiary Hearing Set for October 16, 2015 
9/30/2015  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  9/30/2015   
NOTE: Affidavit in Support of Attorneys' Fees 
9/24/2015  REP - Report  9/25/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: Superior Court Receiver's August 2015 Report and Notice of Intent to Pay Receiver's Fees and Expenses  
9/16/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/16/2015   
9/14/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/14/2015   
9/14/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  9/22/2015   
9/10/2015  WSH - Worksheet  9/15/2015   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
9/9/2015  APL - Application  9/9/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ANDREW PROVENCIO’S VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR RECEIVER FOR ALL DMC-AFFILIATED ENTITIES 
9/9/2015  APL - Application  9/9/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's ANDREW PROVENCIO'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF CONTEMPT OF COURT ORDER AND REQUEST FOR SACTIONS 
9/8/2015  005 - ME: Hearing  9/8/2015   
8/28/2015  REQ - Request  8/31/2015   
NOTE: Request for Court Reporter 
8/28/2015  REP - Report  8/31/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S JULY 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
8/27/2015  STA - Statement  8/28/2015   
NOTE: Tiffany Young and Matthew Young's Pretrial Brief 
8/27/2015  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  8/28/2015   
NOTE: JOINT LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
8/17/2015  ORD - Order  8/17/2015   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE ORDER  
8/13/2015  STP - Stipulation  8/13/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order 
8/12/2015  RES - Response  8/13/2015   
NOTE: RECEIVER’S RESPONSE TO MATTHEW YOUNG’S INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE SOLE MEMBER OF SUNLIGHT & SOIL, LLC’S VERIFIED CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST DESERT MEDICAL CAMPUS, INC. 
8/11/2015  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/11/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING MONTHLY REQUESTS FOR PAYMENT OF JABURG & WILK ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS 
8/10/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  8/10/2015   
8/3/2015  NOT - Notice  8/3/2015   
NOTE: RECEIVER’S LIST OF ITEMS BELIEVED TO BE PROPERTY OF DESERT MEDICAL CAMPUS 
8/3/2015  REL - Reply  8/3/2015   
NOTE: JOINDER IN RECEIVER’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATT YOUNG TO TURNOVER RECEIVERSHIP ASSETS, FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THEM FOR THEIR FAILURE TO DO SO TO DATE, AND FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-RECEIVERSHIP EXPENSES 
8/3/2015  NOT - Notice  8/4/2015   
NOTE: TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATTHEW YOUNG’S LIST OF PROPERTY IN DISPUTE 
8/3/2015  NOT - Notice  8/4/2015   
NOTE: JOINDER IN RECEIVER’S LIST OF ITEMS BELIEVED TO BE PROPERTY OF DESERT MEDICAL CAMPUS 
7/29/2015  REL - Reply  7/30/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATT YOUNG TO TURNOVER RECEIVERSHIP ASSETS, FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THEM FOR THEIR FAILURE TO DO SO TO DATE, AND FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-RECEIVERSHIP EXPENSES 
7/22/2015  REP - Report  7/23/2015  Defendant(4)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S JUNE 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
7/17/2015  RES - Response  7/17/2015   
NOTE: TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATTHEW YOUNG’S RESPONSE TO THE RECEIVER’S MOTION TO COMPEL TURNOVER OF RECEIVERSHIP ASSETS, FOR SANCTIONS, AND FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-RECEIVERSHIP EXPENSES 
7/16/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  7/16/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S JOINDER IN RECEIVER SINGER’S MOTION TO COMPEL TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATT YOUNG TO TURNOVER RECEIVERSHIP ASSETS, FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THEM FOR THEIR FAILURE TO DO SO TO DATE, AND FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-RECEIVERSHIP EXPENSES 
7/6/2015  085 - ME: Conference  7/6/2015   
7/6/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set  7/6/2015   
7/1/2015  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  7/1/2015   
7/1/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  7/2/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
6/26/2015  MOT - Motion  6/29/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MATTHEW YOUNG’S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION 
6/26/2015  MEM - Memorandum  6/29/2015   
NOTE: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO SUPPORT MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION 
6/26/2015  DCL - Declaration  6/29/2015   
NOTE: Declaration of Matthew Young In Support of Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction 
6/25/2015  DCL - Declaration  6/25/2015   
NOTE: Declaration of Pamela Donner in Support of Receiver's Motion to Compel Turnover, and for Order Enjoining Parties From Certain Actions 
6/25/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  6/25/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL TIFFANY YOUNG AND MATT YOUNG TO TURNOVER RECEIVERSHIP ASSETS, FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THEM FOR THEIR FAILURE TO DO SO TO DATE, AND FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-RECEIVERSHIP EXPENSES 
6/24/2015  REP - Report  6/24/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVER’S MAY 2015 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVER’S FEES AND EXPENSES 
6/12/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  6/12/2015   
6/9/2015  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  6/11/2015   
5/28/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  5/28/2015   
5/27/2015  REP - Report  5/29/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES 
5/22/2015  RES - Response  5/22/2015   
NOTE: YOUNGS’ RESPONSE TO MOTION TO APPROVE MANAGEMENT CONSULTING SERVICES AGREEMENT BETWEEN RECEIVER AND 4FRONT ADVISORS, LLC 
5/22/2015  ANS - Answer  5/22/2015   
NOTE: Tiffany Young's Matthew Young's and M&T Managment LLC's Answer to Second Amended Verified Complaint and Tiffany Young's and Matthew Youngs Verified Counterclaims Against Andrew Provencio and Matthew Young's Individually and as the Sole Member of Sunlight 
5/22/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  5/22/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF MATTHEW YOUNG AND M&T MANAGEMENT, LLC 
5/20/2015  REP - Report  5/21/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: RECEIVERS CASE STATUS/FOR THE MAY 26 2015 CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING 
5/20/2015  MOT - Motion  5/20/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Approve Management Consulting Services Agreement Between Receiver and 4Front Advisors, LLC 
5/14/2015  RES - Response  5/14/2015   
NOTE: Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Request for Summary Ruling 
4/27/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  4/27/2015   
4/27/2015  NOF - Notice Of Filing  4/28/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: OF RECEIVER'S INVENTORY OF PROPERTY 
4/22/2015  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  4/22/2015   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
4/21/2015  BON - Bond  4/22/2015   
4/20/2015  AFF - Affidavit  4/24/2015  Receiver(7)  
NOTE: OATH OF RECEIVER 
4/17/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/20/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
4/13/2015  005 - ME: Hearing  4/13/2015   
4/10/2015  NOT - Notice  4/13/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction 
4/10/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set  4/10/2015   
4/9/2015  REQ - Request  4/10/2015   
NOTE: Request for Modification of Court's Preliminary Injunction in Connection with Plaintiff's Request for Order to Show Cause 
4/8/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  4/8/2015   
4/8/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set  4/8/2015   
4/7/2015  APL - Application  4/8/2015   
NOTE: Supplement to Plaintiff's Application and Memorandum in Support of Order to Show Cause and Emergency and Immediate Relief Requested 
4/7/2015  RES - Response  4/8/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT TIFFANY YOUNG’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S APPLICATION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
4/7/2015  REL - Reply  4/8/2015   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Application and Memorandum in Support of Order to Show Cause and Emergency and Immediate Relief Requested 
4/6/2015  APL - Application  4/7/2015   
NOTE: Application and Memorandum in Support of Order to Show Cause and Emergency and Immediate Relief Requested 
4/3/2015  APL - Application  4/6/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS TIFFANY YOUNG’S AND MATT YOUNG’S VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER 
4/3/2015  MOT - Motion  4/6/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Tiffany Young's and Matt Young's Motion for Expedited Consideration on Verified Application for Appointment of Receiver 
4/1/2015  OAR - Order Appointing Receiver  4/22/2015   
3/26/2015  ORD - Order  3/26/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING ANDY PROVENCIO’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR CLOSING BRIEF 
3/26/2015  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  3/26/2015   
3/25/2015  NOT - Notice  3/26/2015   
NOTE: Notice re Correspondence Relevant to Special Master Issues 
3/24/2015  MOT - Motion  3/25/2015   
NOTE: Andy Provencio's Motion to Exceed Page Limit For Closing Brief 
3/24/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  4/1/2015   
3/23/2015  ORD - Order  3/23/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SUBMITTAL OF CLOSING BRIEFS 
3/23/2015  NOT - Notice  3/24/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS TIFFANY YOUNG’S AND MATT YOUNG’S CLOSING ARGUMENT REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING 
3/23/2015  STA - Statement  3/25/2015   
NOTE: Andy Provencio's Closing Brief 
3/19/2015  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  3/19/2015   
3/19/2015  STP - Stipulation  3/20/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation and Request to Extend Deadline for Submittal of Closing Briefs 
3/18/2015  005 - ME: Hearing  3/18/2015   
3/17/2015  WSH - Worksheet  3/20/2015   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
3/16/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings  3/27/2015   
NOTE: KATE E ROUNDY/FEBRUARY 9 2015 
3/16/2015  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings  3/30/2015   
NOTE: 02/03/15 MARTY HERDER 
3/13/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  3/16/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Compel Immediate Compliance with Special Master's Orders 
3/11/2015  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  3/11/2015   
3/10/2015  AMC - Amended Complaint  3/11/2015   
NOTE: Andrew Provencio's Second Amended Verified Complaint 
3/9/2015  STA - Statement  3/10/2015   
NOTE: Joint Pretrial Statement 
3/5/2015  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/5/2015   
3/3/2015  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  3/3/2015   
2/27/2015  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  2/27/2015   
2/27/2015  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  2/27/2015   
2/27/2015  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  2/27/2015   
2/25/2015  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  2/25/2015   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY 
2/20/2015  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel  2/20/2015   
2/20/2015  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  2/20/2015   
NOTE: Order 
2/19/2015  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  2/19/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR TIFFANY YOUNG WITH CLIENT CONSENT 
2/17/2015  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  2/18/2015   
NOTE: Substitution of Counsel 
2/13/2015  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  2/17/2015   
NOTE: Motion To Withdraw As Counsel Of Record for Tiffany Young With Client Consent 
2/11/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set  2/11/2015   
2/9/2015  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  2/17/2015   
2/6/2015  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  2/12/2015   
2/6/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  2/6/2015   
2/5/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/6/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
2/5/2015  AMC - Amended Complaint  2/6/2015   
NOTE: Andrew Provencio's First Amended Verified Complaint 
2/5/2015  056 - ME: Hearing Set  2/5/2015   
2/4/2015  REL - Reply  2/4/2015   
NOTE: Andrew Provencio's Reply in Support of His Motion to Disqualify Attorney Jon Collins and His Firm From Representing Any Part in This Litigation 
2/4/2015  RES - Response  2/4/2015   
NOTE: Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 
2/4/2015  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/4/2015   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
2/2/2015  RES - Response  2/3/2015   
NOTE: Response to Motion to Disqualify 
2/2/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/3/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
2/2/2015  AFF - Affidavit  2/3/2015   
NOTE: Affidavit of Tiffany Young RE: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Disqualify 
1/30/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/5/2015   
NOTE: TIFFANY YOUNG 
1/30/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/5/2015   
NOTE: MATT YOUNG 
1/30/2015  SUM - Summons  2/3/2015   
1/30/2015  SUM - Summons  2/3/2015   
1/29/2015  MOT - Motion  1/29/2015   
NOTE: ANDREW PROVENCIO'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY JON COLLINS AND HIS FIRM FROM RESPRESENTING ANY PARTY IN THIS LITIGATION 
1/27/2015  COM - Complaint  1/28/2015   
1/27/2015  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  1/28/2015   
1/27/2015  CSH - Coversheet  1/28/2015   
1/27/2015  APL - Application  1/28/2015   
NOTE: ANDREW PROVENCIO'S/ FOR AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH NOTICE 
1/27/2015  OSC - Order To Show Cause  1/28/2015   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/3/2015  8:30  Order To Show Cause 
2/9/2015  10:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
2/27/2015  9:30  Status Conference 
3/3/2015  8:30  Status Conference 
3/10/2015  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
3/16/2015  9:30  Trial 
3/17/2015  9:30  Trial 
4/8/2015  8:30  Status Conference 
4/10/2015  14:00  Hearing 
4/23/2015  8:30  Hearing 
5/26/2015  8:30  Status Conference 
7/1/2015  11:00  Status Conference 
7/1/2015  15:00  Status Conference 
9/3/2015  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
9/10/2015  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
10/16/2015  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
11/23/2015  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
11/23/2015  9:00  Order To Show Cause 
1/29/2016  13:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
4/5/2016  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
5/24/2016  8:30  Status Conference 
6/14/2016  9:30  Status Conference 
7/7/2016  8:30  Status Conference 
8/26/2016  13:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/31/2016  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
9/19/2016  9:30  Trial 
9/20/2016  9:30  Trial 
9/21/2016  9:30  Trial 
9/22/2016  9:30  Trial 
12/16/2016  8:45  Status Conference 
1/5/2017  9:30  Status Conference 
3/9/2017  9:00  Civil Settlement Conference 
4/5/2017  9:00  Civil Settlement Conference 
4/18/2017  9:00  Order To Show Cause 
6/27/2017  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/25/2017  13:30  Oral Argument 
8/30/2017  9:30  Status Conference 
9/29/2017  13:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/16/2017  9:30  Trial 
11/27/2017  9:30  Trial 
4/19/2018  10:30  Hearing 
5/18/2018  9:00  Hearing 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
9/8/2018  F:Andrew Provencio  $3,325.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Matt Young         
2/26/2018  F:Andrew Provencio  $19,049.10  One Time  Costs   
  A: Tiffany Young         
  A: Matt Young         
2/26/2018  F:Andrew Provencio  $244,277.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Tiffany Young         
  A: Matt Young         
click here for Law Library Resource Center