Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2014-055132 Judge: Julian, Melissa
File Date: 12/15/2014 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Koranda L L C   Plaintiff    Scott Baluha 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Unknown  Geoffrey Walker 
Community Of Sabin L Burrell And Kayla Burrell, The   Defendant    Geoffrey Walker 
Kayla Burrell   Defendant  Female  Geoffrey Walker 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/13/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed  10/13/2015   
10/12/2015  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  10/13/2015   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
10/8/2015  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  10/8/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 
9/25/2015  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  9/25/2015   
9/22/2015  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  9/22/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
9/14/2015  RES - Response  9/15/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RETAIN CASE WITHOUT PLACEMENT ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND CROSS-MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE 
9/11/2015  MCO - Motion To Continue  9/11/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion to Retain the Case without Placement on the Dismissal Calendar  
9/9/2015  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  9/9/2015   
8/27/2015  005 - ME: Hearing  8/27/2015   
8/24/2015  AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail  8/24/2015   
NOTE: Affidavit of Proof of Mailings 
8/10/2015  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/10/2015   
8/4/2015  REL - Reply  8/5/2015   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss 
7/31/2015  RES - Response  7/31/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT 
7/15/2015  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  7/15/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
7/6/2015  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  7/8/2015   
NOTE: SABIN L BURRELL & KAYLA BURRELL 
6/19/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/19/2015   
6/10/2015  REL - Reply  6/10/2015   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default 
6/5/2015  RES - Response  6/5/2015   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default 
5/28/2015  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  5/28/2015   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
5/27/2015  MOT - Motion  5/27/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default 
5/22/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/22/2015   
5/20/2015  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  5/20/2015   
5/20/2015  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  5/20/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Application for Entry of Default 
5/20/2015  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  5/20/2015   
NOTE: Application for Default and Entry of Default 
4/17/2015  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  4/23/2015   
NOTE: SABIN L BURRELL AND KAYLA BURRELL 
3/27/2015  ORD - Order  3/27/2015   
NOTE: ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE 
3/27/2015  OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service  3/27/2015   
NOTE: Order 
3/25/2015  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  3/25/2015   
3/24/2015  MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service  3/25/2015   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service 
3/24/2015  MOT - Motion  3/25/2015   
NOTE: Motion for Alternate Service 
12/15/2014  COM - Complaint  12/17/2014   
12/15/2014  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  12/17/2014   
12/15/2014  CSH - Coversheet  12/17/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/25/2015  10:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file