« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2014-053393
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Julian
File Date:
5/23/2014
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David J Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Deponte
Party Name
Brian E Pinzon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Ronald Huser
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2014
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/3/2014
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Dismissal
Filing Date
10/29/2014
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2014
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2014
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
6/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Agreement to Plaintiff's Certificate on Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
6/26/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER / E-FILE BILLING $237
Filing Date
6/10/2014
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRIAN E PINZON
Filing Date
5/23/2014
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2014
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2014
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.