« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2014-050997
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Blanchard
File Date:
6/2/2014
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Paul Johnson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Nancy Swift
Party Name
Audrey Johnson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Nancy Swift
Party Name
Michael Burns
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Justin Burns
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Terilyn Burns
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Camelback Consign & Design L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2015
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/6/2015
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
351- Me: Excuse Arbitrator From List
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2015
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
2/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2015
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2014
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
12/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2014
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/5/2014
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2014
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
8/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION & AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST MICHAEL BURNS, JANE DOE BURNS AND CAMELBACK CONSIGN & DESIGN, LLC BY DEFAULT & WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
8/20/2014
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
8/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF COSTS
Filing Date
8/20/2014
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
8/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Filing Date
7/31/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2014
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/31/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
7/29/2014
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
7/29/2014
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit on Default and Entry of Default
Filing Date
7/28/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/4/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TERILYN BURNS
Filing Date
7/28/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/4/2014
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
JUSTIN BURNS
Filing Date
7/17/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TERILYN BURNS AND JOHN DOE
Filing Date
7/14/2014
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUSTIN BURNS AND JANE DOE BURNS
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TERILYN BURNS AND JOHN DOE
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
7/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHAEL BURNS AND JANE DOE
Filing Date
6/30/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Filing Date
6/23/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPARTE MOTION TO ALLOW ALTERNATIVE SERVICE UNDER ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
6/3/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
11/25/2014
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Paul Johnson, Audrey Johnson
A: Michael Burns
A: Michael Burns
Amount
$663.01
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
11/25/2014
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Paul Johnson, Audrey Johnson
A: Michael Burns
A: Michael Burns
Amount
$20,920.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status