« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2014-011778 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 9/16/2014 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2384   Plaintiff    SUSAN MARTIN 
American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960   Plaintiff    SUSAN MARTIN 
Administrative Supervisory Professional & Technical Employees Association   Plaintiff    SUSAN MARTIN 
Frank Piccioli   Plaintiff  Male  SUSAN MARTIN 
Ron Ramirez   Plaintiff  Male  SUSAN MARTIN 
Debra Novak Scott   Plaintiff  Female  SUSAN MARTIN 
Luis Schmidt   Plaintiff  Male  SUSAN MARTIN 
City Of Phoenix   Defendant    Colin Campbell 
City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System   Defendant    Colin Campbell 
City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board   Defendant    Colin Campbell 
Marshall Pimentel   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
Jason Stokes   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/5/2019  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel  6/5/2019   
10/29/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  10/30/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
10/29/2018  AIX - Appeals Index  10/30/2018   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
10/16/2018  MEM - Memorandum  10/17/2018   
1/23/2018  LET - Letter  1/24/2018   
1/22/2018  AIX - Appeals Index  1/23/2018   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
1/22/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  1/23/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
12/21/2017  NOT - Notice  12/21/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Transcripts Ordered 
12/21/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/21/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel 
12/14/2017  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  12/15/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal/EFILE BILLING $94 
11/16/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  11/16/2017   
11/16/2017  JUD - Judgment  11/16/2017   
NOTE: FINAL 
11/3/2017  REL - Reply  11/6/2017   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Defendants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
10/12/2017  NOT - Notice  10/13/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Defendants' First Extension of Time re Reply in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
10/6/2017  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/9/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
10/3/2017  063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel  10/3/2017   
9/27/2017  STP - Stipulation  9/28/2017   
NOTE: AGREED SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS 
9/6/2017  STP - Stipulation  9/7/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation re Amended Proposed Form of Judgment 
8/24/2017  ORD - Order  8/24/2017   
NOTE: ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS’ TO FILE OBJECTIONS RE: DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
8/22/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/23/2017   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS’ TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
8/22/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/23/2017   
NOTE: Agreed First Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
8/15/2017  NOT - Notice  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment 
8/15/2017  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 
8/11/2017  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  8/11/2017   
8/4/2017  REL - Reply  8/7/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Related Case 
8/2/2017  RES - Response  8/4/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer 
7/26/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  7/26/2017   
7/12/2017  005 - ME: Hearing  7/12/2017   
7/11/2017  NOT - Notice  7/12/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Submission of Courtesy Copies of Some of Plaintiffs' Principle Cases 
6/28/2017  MTT - Motion To Transfer  6/29/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Transfer Related Case 
6/22/2017  REL - Reply  6/23/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
6/16/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  6/16/2017   
6/16/2017  NOT - Notice  6/19/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS 
6/9/2017  MOT - Motion  6/13/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/9/2017  REL - Reply  6/13/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
5/10/2017  RES - Response  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Controverting and Additional Statement of Facts in Support of Their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
5/10/2017  MOT - Motion  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
5/10/2017  REL - Reply  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 
5/10/2017  RES - Response  5/12/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
5/4/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  5/4/2017   
3/28/2017  NOT - Notice  3/29/2017   
NOTE: Notice of First Agreed Extension of Time for the Parties to File Remaining Summary Judgment Briefing 
3/20/2017  ORD - Order  3/20/2017   
NOTE: ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/20/2017  NOF - Notice Of Filing  3/22/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING THE SIGNED DECLARATION OF DEBRA NOVAK-SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/15/2017  063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel  3/15/2017   
3/15/2017  MOT - Motion  3/17/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 
3/15/2017  RES - Response  3/17/2017   
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Response to Defendants’ Separate Statement of Facts and Controverting Statement of Facts and Plaintiffs’ Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs’ Motion for Summary Judgment 
3/15/2017  MOT - Motion  3/17/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/7/2017  STP - Stipulation  3/8/2017   
NOTE: AGREED THIRD EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
2/17/2017  STP - Stipulation  2/21/2017   
NOTE: JOINT STIPULATION RE AUTHENTICITY AND FOUNDATION OF DOCUMENTS 
2/17/2017  STP - Stipulation  2/21/2017   
NOTE: JOINT STIPULATED FACTS 
2/7/2017  NOT - Notice  2/9/2017   
NOTE: AGREED SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
2/1/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/1/2017   
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #1 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #2 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #3 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #4 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #25 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #27 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #29 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: DOCUMENT #30 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/31/2017  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  2/1/2017   
NOTE: CORRECTED DOCUMENT #4 FROM DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG (8/11/16) 
1/24/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  1/24/2017   
1/24/2017  STP - Stipulation  1/25/2017   
NOTE: AGREED FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
1/6/2017  NOT - Notice  1/9/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Erratum Regarding Document #4 Lodged Under Seal and Motion for In-Camera Review of Correct Document 
1/6/2017  NOT - Notice  1/9/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Document Under Seal 
1/5/2017  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  1/5/2017   
12/23/2016  ORD - Order  12/23/2016   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
12/22/2016  NOT - Notice  12/23/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Documents Under Seal 
12/21/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  12/21/2016   
12/20/2016  SOF - Statement Of Facts  12/22/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 
12/20/2016  MOT - Motion  12/22/2016   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 
12/20/2016  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  12/22/2016   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 
12/9/2016  MEM - Memorandum  12/13/2016   
NOTE: JOINT STATUS MEMORANDUM 
11/30/2016  ORD - Order  11/30/2016   
NOTE: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE FOR ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG 
11/22/2016  STP - Stipulation  11/23/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE FOR ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG 
11/14/2016  ANS - Answer  11/15/2016   
NOTE: ANSWER TO AMENDED VERIFIED CLASS ACTION AND SPECIAL ACTION COMPLAINT 
11/4/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/4/2016   
11/4/2016  STP - Stipulation  11/7/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
11/4/2016  NOT - Notice  11/7/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE  
11/4/2016  STP - Stipulation  11/7/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
10/28/2016  063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel  10/28/2016   
10/26/2016  ORD - Order  10/26/2016   
NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the stipulation and extending Defendants’ deadline to respond to Plaintiffs’ Amended Verified Class Action and Special Action Complaint to November 14, 2016. 
10/26/2016  MOT - Motion  10/27/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG  
10/26/2016  REL - Reply  10/27/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG 
10/21/2016  STP - Stipulation  10/24/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED COMPLAINT 
10/21/2016  STP - Stipulation  10/24/2016   
NOTE: AGREED SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS ORDER ON DISCOVERY 
10/19/2016  STP - Stipulation  10/20/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATION RE APPLICABILITY OF COURT’S RULINGS ON CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MONEY DAMAGES TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
10/6/2016  STP - Stipulation  10/7/2016   
NOTE: AGREED FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY RE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS’ FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER ON DISCOVERY 
10/6/2016  STP - Stipulation  10/7/2016   
NOTE: AGREED FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG 
10/3/2016  AMC - Amended Complaint  10/4/2016   
NOTE: AMENDED VERIFIED CLASS ACTION AND SPECIAL ACTION COMPLAINT 
9/30/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  9/30/2016   
9/30/2016  RES - Response  10/3/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS’ FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT’S ORDER ON DISCOVERY 
9/30/2016  RES - Response  10/3/2016   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG 
9/23/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/23/2016   
9/15/2016  NOT - Notice  9/20/2016   
NOTE: LITIGATION TIMELINE SHOWING 20 MONTHS OF DELAY 
9/9/2016  NOT - Notice  9/9/2016   
NOTE: First Agreed Extension of Time re Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel 
8/30/2016  MTC - Motion To Compel  8/31/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANTS’ PRIVILEGE LOG 
8/29/2016  MOT - Motion  8/30/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' Failure to Comply with Court's Order on Discovery 
8/25/2016  ORD - Order  8/25/2016   
NOTE: ORDER SETTING REMAINING DEADLINES 
8/24/2016  REL - Reply  8/25/2016   
NOTE: Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
8/24/2016  REL - Reply  8/25/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Reply in Further Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 
8/19/2016  NOT - Notice  8/22/2016   
NOTE: JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/11/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/11/2016   
8/3/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  8/4/2016   
NOTE: Application for Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff ASPTEA 
8/2/2016  RES - Response  8/3/2016   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
8/2/2016  RES - Response  8/3/2016   
NOTE: Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
7/25/2016  STP - Stipulation  7/26/2016   
NOTE: FIRST AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
7/19/2016  REL - Reply  7/20/2016   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ RULE 12(c) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE DAMAGES CLAIMS 
7/18/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  7/18/2016   
7/15/2016  NOT - Notice  7/15/2016   
NOTE: FIRST AGREED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE AND REPLY RE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 
7/6/2016  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/7/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
7/6/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/7/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Signature of Debra Novak-Scott on Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
6/30/2016  NOT - Notice  6/30/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ RULE 12(c) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE DAMAGES CLAIMS 
6/30/2016  RES - Response  6/30/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ RULE 12(c) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE DAMAGES CLAIMS 
6/30/2016  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/1/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Signature of Frank Piccioli on Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
6/29/2016  MOT - Motion  6/30/2016   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 
6/21/2016  STP - Stipulation  6/22/2016   
NOTE: Agreed First Extension of Time to File Response and Reply Re: Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Re Damages Claims 
6/3/2016  MOT - Motion  6/6/2016   
NOTE: Rule 12c Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Re Damages Claims 
5/31/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/31/2016   
5/25/2016  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  5/26/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel With Consent 
5/16/2016  RNM - Returned Mail  5/16/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
5/16/2016  NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney  5/16/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel 
4/27/2016  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  4/27/2016   
4/25/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  4/25/2016   
4/19/2016  REQ - Request  4/20/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO STAY 
4/11/2016  REL - Reply  4/12/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 
4/4/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  4/5/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY 
3/24/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  3/24/2016   
3/21/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/21/2016   
3/14/2016  MOT - Motion  3/14/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' Motion to Stay Proceedings 
1/15/2016  ORD - Order  1/15/2016   
NOTE: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND REMAINING DEADLINES 
1/7/2016  STP - Stipulation  1/7/2016   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Remaining Deadlines 
11/18/2015  ORD - Order  11/18/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND REMAINING DEADLINES 
11/16/2015  STP - Stipulation  11/16/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Remaining Deadlines 
10/20/2015  ORD - Order  10/20/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND REMAINING DEADLINES 
10/16/2015  STP - Stipulation  10/16/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Remaining Deadlines 
10/15/2015  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  10/15/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
7/1/2015  SCO – Scheduling Order  7/1/2015   
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER 
6/26/2015  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  6/26/2015   
NOTE: JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT 
1/21/2015  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  1/21/2015   
11/4/2014  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  11/4/2014   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION TO WESLEY STOCKARD 
11/4/2014  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  11/4/2014   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION TO SUSAN HOFFMAN 
10/30/2014  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  10/31/2014   
NOTE: Motion and Consent of Mark Ogden for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan Hoffman 
10/30/2014  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  10/31/2014   
NOTE: Motion and Consent of Mark Ogden for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Wesley Stockard 
10/20/2014  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  10/21/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ CERTIFICATION OF AGREEMENT WITH PLAINTIFFS’ CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION 
10/20/2014  ANS - Answer  10/21/2014   
NOTE: Answer to Complaint 
10/14/2014  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  10/15/2014   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
10/9/2014  ORD - Order  10/9/2014   
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 
10/6/2014  STP - Stipulation  10/7/2014   
NOTE: Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint 
9/22/2014  SUM - Summons  9/25/2014   
9/22/2014  SUM - Summons  9/25/2014   
9/22/2014  SUM - Summons  9/25/2014   
9/22/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/29/2014   
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM BOARD 
9/22/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/29/2014   
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM 
9/22/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/29/2014   
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX 
9/16/2014  COM - Complaint  9/17/2014   
9/16/2014  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  9/17/2014   
9/16/2014  CSH - Coversheet  9/17/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/2/2016  8:45  Pre-Trial Conference 
3/22/2016  10:30  Status Conference 
4/21/2016  11:00  Oral Argument 
5/4/2016  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
5/27/2016  8:30  Status Conference 
7/12/2016  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/12/2016  13:30  Status Conference 
9/15/2016  10:00  Oral Argument 
12/2/2016  9:00  Oral Argument 
12/2/2016  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
12/16/2016  14:30  Oral Argument 
3/10/2017  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
7/10/2017  9:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
11/16/2017  F:City Of Phoenix  $338.00  One Time  Costs   
  F:City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System         
  F:City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board         
  F:Marshall Pimentel         
  F:Jason Stokes         
  A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2384         
  A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960         
  A: Administrative Supervisory Professional & Technical Employees Association         
11/16/2017  F:City Of Phoenix  $141,986.70  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  F:City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System         
  F:City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board         
  F:Marshall Pimentel         
  F:Jason Stokes         
  A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2384         
  A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960         
  A: Administrative Supervisory Professional & Technical Employees Association         
click here for Law Library Resource Center