« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2014-011724
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
9/18/2014
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Gillette
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Shannon Gillette
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Zachary Wicker
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Heather Bennett
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Alan Branch
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Ashley Branch
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Tony Collins
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Valerie Taylor-Collins
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Cary Heath
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jacqueline Heath
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jason McIntyre
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Cheri McIntyre
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jan Miller
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Deborah Ortiz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Martin Peraza
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Barbara Peraza
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
David Zipser
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Michelle Zipser
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jesus Cabrales
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Irene Candelaria
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jan Wohlfert
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shawn Cunningham
Party Name
Jesse Hughes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
DOUGLAS NELSON
Party Name
Maleisa Hughes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
DOUGLAS NELSON
Party Name
Austin Flake
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Dennis Wilenchik
Party Name
Logan Flake
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Dennis Wilenchik
Party Name
Green Acre Cage Free Dog Boarding
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
DOUGLAS NELSON
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order that the matter be continued on the
dismissal calendar through October 15, 2018
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
5/3/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
5/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
3/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be continued on the dismissal calendar through May 1, 2018.
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Clarification of Dates in 11/3/17 Ruling
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Counsel
Filing Date
8/16/2017
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be continued
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
4/3/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2017
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order that the matter be continued on the
dismissal calendar through August 25, 2017
Filing Date
3/28/2017
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be continued on the dismissal calendar through May
1, 2017.
Filing Date
1/11/2017
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of change of email address
Filing Date
3/4/2016
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/25/2016
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
2/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
12/14/2015
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice of Pending Matters
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
11/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2015
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Judge
Filing Date
11/4/2015
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Rule 16 Conference
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Regarding Continuance
on Dismissal Calendar
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Continue on Dismissal Calendar
Filing Date
3/13/2015
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
3/9/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS HUGHES AND GREEN ACRE DOG BOARDING
Filing Date
3/4/2015
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/26/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/25/2015
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
JESSE HUGHES
Filing Date
12/12/2014
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Acceptance and Waiver of Service for Defendants Jesse Hughes and Maleisa Hughes
Filing Date
12/8/2014
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Acceptance and Wavier of Service for Defendants Austin Flake and Logan Flake
Filing Date
9/18/2014
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2014
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2014
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2014
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
9/19/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/5/2016
Time
9:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/7/2017
Time
9:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/18/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/3/2017
Time
9:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/9/2018
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/20/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/27/2018
Time
9:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/12/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.