« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2014-009542
Judge:
Coury, Christopher
File Date:
7/8/2014
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Dr Sky Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Matthew Maerowitz
Party Name
Hogan Manufacturing L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
STANLEY HAMMERMAN
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2015
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2015
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDERED the above-referenced case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and
each party pay its own attorneys’ fees and costs.
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING ORAL
ARGUMENT
Filing Date
4/17/2015
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
4/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT PENDING FINALIZED SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
4/7/2015
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
4/3/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF DR. SKY, INC.’S REPLY RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE ACKNOWLEDGED DEBT
Filing Date
3/30/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTROVERTING STATEMENT
OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
RE ACKNOWLEDGED DEBT
Filing Date
3/25/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION
FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
RE ACKNOWLEDGED DEBT
Filing Date
3/6/2015
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF DR. SKY, INC.’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE ACKNOWLEDGED DEBT
Filing Date
3/6/2015
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF DR. SKY, INC.’S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE ACKNOWLEDGED DEBT
Filing Date
1/5/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/10/2014
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING ORAL ARGUMENT, WITHDRAWING MOTION TO COMPEL, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE
Filing Date
11/25/2014
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Vacate Oral Argument, Withdraw Motion to Compel, and For Appointment of Judge Pro Tempore
Filing Date
11/19/2014
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
11/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEATH; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/31/2014
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2014
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel
Filing Date
10/6/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/7/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Filing Date
9/16/2014
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
9/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
8/5/2014
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
8/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF AGREEMENT
REGARDING COMPULSORY
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
8/4/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer / efile billing $237
Filing Date
7/21/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
HOGAN MANUFACTURING LLC
Filing Date
7/8/2014
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2014
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2014
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
7/9/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/5/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/21/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/29/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/19/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.