Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2014-009204 Judge: Fox, Dewain
File Date: 6/30/2014 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Unifund C C R, L L C   Plaintiff    William Kelhoffer 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Male  Geoffrey Walker 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/6/2015  OVJ - Order Vacating Judgment  11/6/2015   
NOTE: Order 
11/3/2015  STP - Stipulation  11/3/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT 
10/30/2015  NOT - Notice  10/30/2015   
NOTE: Withdrawal of Satisfaction of Judgment 
10/26/2015  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  10/26/2015   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment 
8/3/2015  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  8/3/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD 
6/2/2015  PDO - Proposed Order Denied  6/2/2015   
NOTE: ORDER 
4/20/2015  RES - Response  4/21/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO “PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S FIRST SET OF NON-UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES” 
4/10/2015  MOT - Motion  4/13/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF NON-UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES 
3/3/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  3/3/2015   
2/27/2015  049 - ME: Judgment Signed  2/27/2015   
2/25/2015  JUD - Judgment  3/5/2015   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
2/25/2015  REQ - Request  2/26/2015   
NOTE: Request for Summary Disposition 
1/22/2015  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  1/23/2015   
NOTE: Application for Award of Attorney's Fees and Incidental Expenses 
1/22/2015  SOC - Statement Of Costs  1/23/2015   
NOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs 
1/22/2015  NOT - Notice  1/26/2015   
NOTE: E-MAIL FROM DAVID GREENBERG 
1/22/2015  NOT - Notice  1/26/2015   
NOTE: E-MAIL FROM GEOFFREY WALKER 
1/22/2015  NOT - Notice  1/26/2015   
NOTE: E-MAIL FROM GEOFFREY WALKER 
1/21/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  1/21/2015   
11/26/2014  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/26/2014   
10/27/2014  RES - Response  10/28/2014   
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Motion for Reconsideration 
10/14/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/14/2014   
10/9/2014  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  10/10/2014   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISMISSAL AND REINSTATEMENT OF CASE AND FOR DENIAL OF REQUEST OF ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS BY DEFENDANT 
9/22/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/22/2014   
9/15/2014  019 - ME: Ruling  9/15/2014   
9/15/2014  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  9/16/2014   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS 
8/8/2014  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/12/2014   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
8/5/2014  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/6/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
7/24/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/31/2014   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL & JANE DOE 
6/30/2014  COM - Complaint  7/1/2014   
6/30/2014  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  7/1/2014   
6/30/2014  CSH - Coversheet  7/1/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/16/2015  10:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
2/25/2015  F:Unifund C C R, L L C  $255.00  One Time  Costs  Vacated 
  A: Sabin Burrell         
2/25/2015  F:Unifund C C R, L L C  $3,652.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Vacated 
  A: Sabin Burrell