« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2014-003611 Judge: Smith, James
File Date: 5/29/2014 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Rose & Co Inc   Plaintiff    Loren Ungar 
Icearizona Hockey Co L P   Defendant    Nicole Stanton 
Icearizona Holdings L P   Defendant    Nicole Stanton 
Icearizona Manager Co L P   Defendant    Nicole Stanton 
Anthony Leblanc   Defendant  Male  Nicole Stanton 
Kory A Langhoffer   Endorsement Case  Male  Kory Langhofer 
Icearizona Hockey Co L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Icearizona Holdings L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Icearizona Manager Co L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/23/2015  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  10/23/2015   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
10/2/2015  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  10/2/2015   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 
10/1/2015  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  10/1/2015   
8/26/2015  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  8/26/2015   
8/14/2015  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  8/17/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
8/13/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  8/13/2015   
7/23/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  7/23/2015   
7/9/2015  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  7/9/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO PLACE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR AND EXTEND CASE DEADLINES 
7/6/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  7/6/2015   
7/2/2015  RES - Response  7/2/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION 
6/29/2015  REL - Reply  6/30/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 
6/29/2015  019 - ME: Ruling  6/29/2015   
6/29/2015  ORD - Order  6/29/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES 
6/26/2015  AMC - Amended Complaint  6/29/2015   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
6/23/2015  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/23/2015   
6/22/2015  STP - Stipulation  6/23/2015   
NOTE: THIRD STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINESS 
6/19/2015  NOT - Notice  6/19/2015   
NOTE: STIPULATED NOTICE RE DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION 
6/18/2015  REL - Reply  6/18/2015   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
6/16/2015  RES - Response  6/16/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF’S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND CROSS-MOTION FOR JURY TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 39(j) 
6/15/2015  RES - Response  6/15/2015   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
6/10/2015  NOT - Notice  6/10/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANTS 
6/4/2015  MTC - Motion To Compel  6/4/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION 
6/4/2015  STA - Statement  6/4/2015   
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEFICIENCIES 
6/4/2015  CER - Certificate  6/4/2015   
NOTE: RULE 37A2C CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL 
6/4/2015  STA - Statement  6/4/2015   
NOTE: RULE 37A2C STATEMENT OF COUNSEL 
5/28/2015  MOT - Motion  5/28/2015   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Demand for Jury Trial 
5/15/2015  MTA - Motion To Amend  5/18/2015   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
5/12/2015  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  5/12/2015   
NOTE: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 
4/24/2015  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/24/2015   
4/23/2015  ORD - Order  4/24/2015   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE/GOVERNING EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION 
4/22/2015  ORD - Order  4/22/2015   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING FIRST STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES 
4/21/2015  STP - Stipulation  4/22/2015   
NOTE: JOINT STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES ALLOWING ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION 
4/17/2015  STP - Stipulation  4/20/2015   
NOTE: FIRST STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES 
4/15/2015  NOT - Notice  4/16/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF JOINT STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN PRIVATE MEDIATION 
4/2/2015  ORD - Order  4/2/2015   
NOTE: ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO AMEND COMPLAINT 
3/30/2015  MOT - Motion  3/31/2015   
NOTE: Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Amend Complaint 
11/20/2014  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  11/20/2014   
11/19/2014  ORD - Order  11/25/2014   
NOTE: SCHEDULING 
11/11/2014  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  11/12/2014   
NOTE: JOINT REPORT 
11/5/2014  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  11/5/2014   
10/16/2014  APL - Application  10/22/2014   
NOTE: FOR COMMISSION TO TAKE FOREIGN DEPOSITION 
10/8/2014  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  10/8/2014   
6/26/2014  ANS - Answer  6/27/2014   
NOTE: Answer / efile billing $237 
6/3/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/19/2014   
NOTE: ICEARIZONA MANAGER CO.L.P. 
6/3/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/19/2014   
NOTE: ANTHONY LEBLANC 
6/3/2014  SUM - Summons  6/4/2014   
6/2/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/13/2014   
NOTE: ICEARIZONA HOLDINGS LP 
6/2/2014  SUM - Summons  6/6/2014   
6/2/2014  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/12/2014   
NOTE: ICEARIZONA HOCKEY CO LP 
5/29/2014  COM - Complaint  6/3/2014   
5/29/2014  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/3/2014   
5/29/2014  CSH - Coversheet  6/3/2014   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/19/2015  8:45  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center