« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2013-002471
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Fox
File Date:
3/15/2013
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Irene Montoya
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Anthony Coury
Party Name
Jason Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Anthony Coury
Party Name
Aureliano Alcucer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Vicki Driscoll
Party Name
Edith Gonzalez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Vicki Driscoll
Party Name
Martin Alcocer Trujillo
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Vicki Driscoll
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/22/2013
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
8/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2013
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Arbitration Date
Filing Date
5/29/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Association of Counsel
Filing Date
5/17/2013
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer / eFile Billing $227.00
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Firm Name
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARTIN ALCOCER TRUJILLO & JANE DOE TRUJILLO
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AURELIANO ALCUCER & JANE DOE ALCUCER
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
EDITH GONZALEZ AND JOHN DOE GONZALEZ
Filing Date
3/15/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2013
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
3/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2013
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
3/18/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.