« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2012-090430
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Thompson
File Date:
2/13/2012
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Alan Dick
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
David Dick
Party Name
Crystal Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2012
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
7/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRYSTAL REYNOLDS SERVED 03/12/12
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
2/15/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.