« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2012-053230
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
5/29/2012
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lightspeed Media Corporation
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Steven Goodhue
Party Name
World Timbers Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Joshua Mayes
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2013
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WORLD TIMBERS INC'S Answer
Filing Date
11/6/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2012
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2012
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
10/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant World Timbers, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
7/23/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Repsonse to DEFENDANTS WORLD TIMBERS INC'S Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/5/2012
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant World Timbers, Inc., Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant World Timbers, Inc., Motion to Dismiss/efile billing $223
Filing Date
6/21/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2012
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/2/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.