Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2012-050744 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Julian
File Date: 2/16/2012 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Discover Card   Plaintiff    Edward Obrien 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Unknown  Pro Per 
Kayla Burrell   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
First Scottsdale Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Blue Square Resolutins L L C   Garnishee Defendant    Matthew Saxe 
New York Community Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Amtrust Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/20/2019  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  6/21/2019   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment 
5/8/2017  ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment  5/9/2017   
NOTE: Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment / EFILE BILLING $27 
2/28/2017  NOT - Notice  3/1/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE 
1/6/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/10/2017   
12/23/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  12/27/2016   
NOTE: FOR MONIES OR PROPERTY 
9/26/2016  NOT - Notice  9/27/2016   
NOTE: Notice to Discharge and Release GaRnishee 
3/21/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  3/28/2016  Garnishee Defendant(7)  
3/18/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/23/2016   
3/10/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  3/11/2016   
NOTE: FOR MONIES OR PROPERTY 
8/17/2015  NOT - Notice  8/17/2015   
NOTE: notice to discharge and release garnishee 
7/27/2015  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  8/4/2015  Garnishee Defendant(6)  
7/17/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/22/2015   
7/1/2015  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  7/6/2015   
6/4/2015  NOT - Notice  6/4/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE 
4/21/2015  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  4/22/2015  Garnishee Defendant(5)  
NOTE: Answer Of Garnishee 
4/10/2015  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/16/2015   
4/6/2015  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  4/7/2015   
9/23/2013  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  9/24/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE 
8/9/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/14/2013   
8/6/2013  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  8/13/2013  Garnishee Defendant(4)  
7/31/2013  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  8/1/2013   
5/1/2013  NOT - Notice  5/1/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE 
1/17/2013  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  1/31/2013  Garnishee Defendant(4)  
1/16/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/18/2013   
1/2/2013  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  1/3/2013   
10/8/2012  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  10/8/2012   
NOTE: ORDER DISCHARGING AND RELEASING GARNISHEE 
9/26/2012  MOT - Motion  9/26/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE 
8/8/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/14/2012   
8/2/2012  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  8/14/2012  Garnishee Defendant(4)  
7/12/2012  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  7/18/2012   
5/31/2012  DFJ - Default Judgment  6/6/2012   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
5/29/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/29/2012   
5/24/2012  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  5/24/2012   
NOTE: Motion for entry of default jdugment without hearing 
5/24/2012  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  5/24/2012   
NOTE: Dismissal without prejudice as to J. Doe Spouse Only 
5/24/2012  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  5/24/2012   
NOTE: Affidavit for Attorney's Fees 
5/24/2012  SOC - Statement Of Costs  5/24/2012   
NOTE: Statement of costs and notice of taxation of costs 
5/24/2012  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  5/24/2012   
NOTE: Affidavit in support of motion for entry of default judgment 
4/17/2012  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  4/17/2012   
NOTE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO KAYLA BURRELL ONLY 
4/6/2012  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  4/6/2012   
NOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default 
3/16/2012  SUM - Summons  3/22/2012   
3/16/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/28/2012   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL AND KAYLA BURRELL 03/03/12 
2/16/2012  COM - Complaint  2/17/2012   
2/16/2012  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  2/17/2012   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
5/31/2012  F:Discover Card  $376.00  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin Burrell         
5/31/2012  F:Discover Card  $750.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin Burrell         
5/31/2012  F:Discover Card  $11,873.73  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin Burrell