« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2012-010330
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
7/2/2012
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Frank Piccioli
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Susan Martin
Party Name
Debra Novak-Scott
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Daniel Bonnett
Party Name
Ronald Ramirez
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Daniel Bonnett
Party Name
American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Susan Martin
Party Name
American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2384administrative Sup
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Susan Martin
Party Name
City Of Phoenix
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
J Ogden
Party Name
City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
J Ogden
Party Name
City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
J Ogden
Party Name
Luis Schmidt
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Susan Martin
Party Name
Stuart Casey
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Virginia Cota
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Paul Enniss
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Vivian Escobar
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John F Estes
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Philip Koda
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John Lay
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Louis Matamoros
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
David Meiner
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Joan Olson
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Willie R Price
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
David Robinson
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL /
Filing Date
4/19/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Final Judgment
Filing Date
10/19/2020
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
10/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER FROM SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
10/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVERSED AND REMANDED
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2016
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
12/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
12/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
11/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Transcript
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF
ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
11/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
11/21/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION
OF TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
11/18/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF
TRANSCRIPT ORDERING AND
STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON
APPEAL
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Transcripts
Filing Date
11/15/2016
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
11/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL - EFILE BILLING $92.00
Filing Date
11/14/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT
ORDERING AND STATEMENT OF
ISSUES ON APPEAL
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL-efile billing $92.00
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
9/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2016
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2016
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
9/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal
Filing Date
9/22/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING REVISED PROPOSED FORM OF RULE 54(c) JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/21/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
ASSOCIATION WITH COUNSEL
WILLIAM G. FAIRBOURN
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO FILE LIMITED SURREPLY ADDRESSING PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/24/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/24/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LIMITED SURREPLY ADDRESSING PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
DEFENDANTS’ FEE PETITION
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Reply in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO APPLICATION
FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’
FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/8/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREED THIRD EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO FILE REPLIES RE PLAINTIFFS' AND INTERVENORS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DEFENDANTS' FEE PETITION
Filing Date
7/25/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND AGREED EXTENSION OF
TIME TO FILE REPLIES RE:
PLAINTIFFS’ APPLICATION FOR
ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND
DEFENDANTS’ FEE PETITION
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Application for Fees and Costs
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ FEE PETITION
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Proposed Form of Rule 54(c) Judgment
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREED FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO FILE RESPONSES AND REPLIES RE PLAINTIFFS' AND INTERVENORS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DEFENDANTS' FEE PETITION
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING FEE AGREEMENT
RE: PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’
FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ FEE PETITION
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’
FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING AND FILING
REVISED PROPOSED FORM OF RULE
54(c) JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ STATEMENT OF COSTS AND EXPENSES AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2016
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
5/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Reply in Support of Motion to Set Damages and Other Equitable Relief
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Response to Defendants' Objections to Proposed Form of Judgment
Filing Date
5/6/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE
LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ AND
INTERVENORS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT
OF MOTION TO SET DAMAGES AND
OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF
Filing Date
4/15/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Form of Judgment
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Motion to Set Damages and Appropriate Equitable Relief
Filing Date
4/12/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion to Strike and Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Separate Statement of Facts and Expert Report
Filing Date
3/25/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel
Filing Date
3/21/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to Report on Economic Damages Relating to the Improper Exclusion of Accrued Unused Sick Leave in the Final Average Compensation and other Identified Individuals Used to Calculate Their Respective Benefits dated March 21, 2016
Filing Date
3/21/2016
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE MOTION
TO SET DAMAGES AND
APPROPRIATE EQUITABLE RELIEF,
PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF
UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT
OF MOTION TO SET DAMAGES AND
OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF
Filing Date
2/19/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
MOTION TO SET DAMAGES AND
APPROPRIATE EQUITABLE
RELIEF AND MEMORANDUM OF
POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN
SUPPORT THEREOF
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Granting Stipulation
and Request to Extend Time for
Plaintiffs/Intervenors to File
Motion to Set Damages
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Plaintiffs/Intervenors to File Motion to Set Damages
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/4/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2015
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2015
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
10/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Memorandum Re: Remaining Matters and Proposed Schedule
Filing Date
9/30/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/9/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/25/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS’
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT
COURT’S FINDINGS OF FACT AND
CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Plaintiffs/Intervenors to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Request for Status Conference
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
MOTION TO AMEND AND
SUPPLEMENT COURT’S FINDINGS
OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF
LAW
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
7/20/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND WRITTEN CLOSING ARGUMENTS
Filing Date
5/30/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
5/29/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Closing Argument
Filing Date
5/29/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Post Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
5/29/2015
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Closing Statement
Filing Date
5/26/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND WRITTEN CLOSING ARGUMENTS
Filing Date
5/21/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / CATHLEEN GLEASON / APRIL 6 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / RON SERIO / FEBRUARY 17 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / JANET SMITH / FEBRUARY 13 2013
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / KEVIN ROBINSON / APRIL 6 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / LORI STEWARD / FEBRUARY 14 2013
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / SCOTT MILLER / MARCH 12 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / RICK NAIMARK / FEBRUARY 14 2013
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / TIANA ROBERT / APRIL 2 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / KATHLEEN HAGGERTY / MARCH 19 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / DONNA BUELOW / MARCH 12 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JANICE GONZALES / LISA ESQUIVEL / MARCH 13 2015
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / DONNA BUELOW / FEBRUARY 13 2013
Filing Date
5/18/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
KRISTY A CETON / JANET SMITH / MARCH 19 2015
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Notice of Filing Original Sealed Deposition Transcripts
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2015
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRAIL/HEARING
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Notice of Filing Original Sealed Deposition Transcripts
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOTTY REAUME / JASON STOKES / MARCH 17 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / LUIS SCHMIDT / FEBRUARY 18 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / FRANK ANTHONY PICCIOLI / FEBRUARY 20 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / DAVID MEINER / FEBRUARY 12 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / LOUISA PEDRAZA / MARCH 27 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / CHARLENE LIMBECK / MARCH 26 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / LOUIS MATAMOROS / FEBRUARY 18 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / COLLEEN LOCKWOOD / MARCH 26 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / DAVID ROBINSON / FEBRUARY 11 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / JOAN LAUNDAUER OLSON / MARCH 26 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / PAUL ENNIS / FEBRUARY 11 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / JOHN LAY / FEBRUARY 11 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / PHILIP KODA / FEBRUARY 12 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / JOHN ESTES / FEBRUARY 12 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / VIRGINIA COTA / JANUARY 30 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / DANIEL RAMIREZ / MARCH 20 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / WILLLIE RARY PRICE JR / JANUARY 30 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / DEBRA NOVAK-SCOTT / FEBRUARY 20 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCILLA DAUGHTRY / VIVIAN VASQUEZ ESCOBAR / FEBRUARY 16 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROLYN T SULLIVAN / STUART CASEY / JANUARY 30 2015
Filing Date
5/11/2015
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARCELLA DAUGHTRY / RONALD RAMIREZ / FEBRUARY 17 2015
Filing Date
5/8/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AMENDED ANSWER TO INTERVENORS’ COMPLAINT AND SPECIAL ACTION COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/8/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint and Answer to Intervenors' Complaint and Special Action Complaint
Filing Date
5/7/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF
MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY
AND PRODUCTION OF
DOCUMENTS UNDER THE
FIDUCIARY EXCEPTION TO THE
ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR
LEAVE TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMITATION FOR
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO
COMPEL
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN
OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO
COMPEL TESTIMONY AND
PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
UNDER THE FIDUCIARY
EXCEPTION TO THE
ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS A
MATTER OF LAW
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE
DECLARATION OF JENNIFER
KROLL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AND
PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
UNDER THE FIDUCIARY
EXCEPTION TO THE ATTORNEYCLIENT
PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
5/4/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND ANSWER TO INTERVENORS COMPLAINT AND SPECIAL ACTION COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/4/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Motion to Strike Defendants' Amended Answer to Complaint and Amended Answer to Intervenors' Complaint and Special Action Complaint
Filing Date
5/3/2015
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
5/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' Motion to Compel Testimony and Production of Documents under the Fiduciary Exception to the Attorney-Client Privilege
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’
MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Filing Date
4/26/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS
MOTION IN LIMINE #5
Filing Date
4/26/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’
MOTION IN LIMINE #2
Filing Date
4/26/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE #3
Filing Date
4/26/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’ OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE #4
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE:
EXHIBIT B TO JOINT PRETRIAL
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AMENDED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED
FINDINGS OF FACT
AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/24/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Addendum to the Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/23/2015
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ANSWER TO INTERVENORS’ COMPLAINT AND SPECIAL ACTION COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/20/2015
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint and Answer to Intervenor Complaint
Filing Date
4/20/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING ADDENDUM
TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/20/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS’ DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS; DEFENDANTS’ COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS’ DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS
Filing Date
4/19/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT
PLAINTIFFS’ AND
INTERVENORS’ TRIAL
EXHIBITS AND PRETRIAL
FILINGS
Filing Date
4/16/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/15/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ AND INTERVENORS’
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT
AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relitigating Issues Already Decided by this Court
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine Regarding Untimely Disclosed Evidence
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine Regarding Undisclosed Information
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE OF CONTRACTS NOT REFERENCED IN THE COMPLAINTS
(MOTION IN LIMINE #3)
Filing Date
4/14/2015
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine Regarding Unwritten Contracts
Filing Date
3/31/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2015
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
3/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
2/24/2015
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
2/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF
RECORD
Filing Date
2/19/2015
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdrawal as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
2/9/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE RAVI PATEL
Filing Date
1/28/2015
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
1/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND/OR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
1/5/2015
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
1/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2014
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION AND
REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL
AND RESET TRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
12/19/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2014
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/9/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Notice Regarding Further Scheduling
Filing Date
8/15/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/15/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
6/16/2014
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
6/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Scheduling Report and Request for Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
6/13/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata
Filing Date
6/12/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to Intervenors' Complaint and Special Action Complaint
Filing Date
6/5/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order REGARDING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INTERVENORS' COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Granting Stipulation
and Request to Extend Time to File Joint
Report and Proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
5/29/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Intervenors' Complaint
Filing Date
5/28/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Request to Extend
Time to File Joint Report and Proposed
Scheduling Order
Filing Date
5/13/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
3/10/2014
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Further Support of Motion to Intervene
Filing Date
3/10/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL
CITATION OF AUTHORITY RE:
PLAINTIFFS’
BRIEF AS DIRECTED
BY COURT’S ORDER ENTERED
JANUARY 7, 2014
Filing Date
2/25/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion to Invervene
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/5/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT’S JANUARY 6, 2014 ORDER
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ BRIEF AS DIRECTED
BY COURT’S ORDER ENTERED
JANUARY 7, 2014
Filing Date
2/5/2014
Description
MTI – Motion to Intervene
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Intervene
Filing Date
1/7/2014
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2013
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/18/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
11/7/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record and Request to Take Judicial Notice
Filing Date
11/4/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record and Request to Take Judicial Notice
Filing Date
9/25/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Reset Oral Argument
Filing Date
8/26/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION
FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION OF TIME
ON PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN
FURTHER SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFFS’ RENEWED MOTION
FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
7/5/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER
SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION
FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/27/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER
SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for One Day Extension of Time on Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
6/25/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE
LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’
REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT
OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS’ STATEMENT OF
FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’
CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF
FACTS AND STATEMENT OF
ADDITIONAL FACTS
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/24/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’
RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS
CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
6/13/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
6/7/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
PLAINTIFFS’ OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/4/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata Re: Proposed Order submitted on Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed the Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Controverting Statement of Facts and Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Their Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Facts Precluding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/3/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE
LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’
MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/31/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order on Stipulation
and Request to Extend Deadlines
on Responses to Summary Judgment
Motions and on Defendants’ Response
to Renewed Motion for Class
Certification
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Request to Extend Deadlines on Responses to Summary Judgment Motions and on Defendants' Response to Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
5/9/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS’ TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
4/30/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants' to Respond to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
4/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION REQUESTING PLACEMENT OF THE CASE ON THE COURT'S ACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON DEFENDANTS’ MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON DEFENDANTS’ MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
4/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
4/3/2013
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
[Proposed] Order on Stipulation and Request to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
3/25/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Request to Extend
Time to File Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
3/20/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER
SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS
CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
1/31/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
1/17/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO
SUBSTITUTE LUIS SCHMIDT AS A
NAMED PLAINTIFF FOR JAMES P.
TIERNEY II
Filing Date
1/14/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
1/14/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
1/7/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Regarding Briefing Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE LUIS SCHMIDT AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF FOR JAMES P. TIERNEY II
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
11/1/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order on Stipulation regarding Deadlines for Discovery and Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
10/25/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation regarding Deadlines for
Discovery and Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
10/24/2012
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
10/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Combined Application for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND
MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
8/29/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY
INJUNCTION, JUDGMENT OF MANDAMUS AND EXPEDITED DETERMINATION
Filing Date
8/24/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limitation of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Combined Application for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Judgment of Mandamus and Expedited Determination
Filing Date
8/24/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Combined Application for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Judgment of Mandamus and Expedited Hearing
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
8/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Wesley Stockard
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
8/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan Hoffman
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to Complaint
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Certification of Agreement with Plaintiffs' Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
7/30/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF MANDAMUS AND FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINAI
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
8/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITY OF PHOENIX RETIREMENT SYSTEM BOARD
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITY OF PHOENIX RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITY OF PHOENIX
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITY OF PHOENIX RETIREMENT SYSTEM BOARD
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION. OF FRANK PICCIOLI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF MANDAMUS AND FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION AND PRELIMINARY & PERMANENT
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF DEBRA NOVAK-SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF JAMES P. TIERNEY II IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION. OF RONALD RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON PLAINTIFFS’ COMBINED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS
AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR
JUDGMENT OF MANDAMUS AND
FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION
AND PRELIMINARY AND
PERMANENT INJUNCTION
Filing Date
7/2/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2012
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/10/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/25/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Hearing
Date
9/21/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/1/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/8/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/17/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/26/2014
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/2/2015
Time
10:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
2/6/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/17/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
4/10/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/17/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/20/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/23/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
4/27/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/6/2015
Time
9:15
Event
Trial
Date
5/8/2015
Time
10:15
Event
Trial
Date
5/11/2015
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/9/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/6/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/20/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/18/2015
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/11/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/23/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/20/2021
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
City Of Phoenix, City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System, City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board
A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960
A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960
Amount
$8,668.64
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
5/20/2021
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
City Of Phoenix, City Of Phoenix Employee Retirement System, City Of Phoenix Retirement System Board
A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960
A: American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960
Amount
$64,086.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Frank Piccioli, Debra Novak-Scott, Ronald Ramirez, American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2960, American Federation Of State County And Municipal Employees A F L-C I O Local 2384administrative Sup, Luis Schmidt, Stuart Casey, Virginia Cota, Paul Enniss, Vivian Escobar, John F Estes, Philip Koda, John Lay, Louis Matamoros, David Meiner, Joan Olson, Willie R Price Jr., David Robinson
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$22,328.37
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
David Robinson
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$373.99
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Willie R Price Jr.
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$758.10
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Joan Olson
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$772.69
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
David Meiner
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$156.77
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Louis Matamoros
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$160.74
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
John Lay
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$234.32
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Philip Koda
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$629.54
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
John F Estes
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$128.17
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Paul Enniss
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$725.85
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Vivian Escobar
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$878.48
Frequency
One Time
Type
Partial Judgment
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Virginia Cota
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$314.09
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
9/28/2016
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Stuart Casey
A: City Of Phoenix
A: City Of Phoenix
Amount
$349.30
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status