Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2012-000456 | Judge: | Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer |
File Date: | 1/12/2012 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Thomas Parker | Plaintiff | Male | Caroline Pilch |
Eloyed Frank Griego | Plaintiff | Male | Caroline Pilch |
Lou Manganiello | Plaintiff | Male | Caroline Pilch |
Santos Robles | Plaintiff | Male | Caroline Pilch |
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System, The | Defendant | Bennett Cooper | |
Brian Tobin | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Richard Petrenka | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Gregory Ferguson | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Lauren Kingry | Defendant | Female | Bennett Cooper |
Jeff McHenry | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Randie Stein | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Phoenix Law Enforcement Association | Intervenor | Michael Napier |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/21/2017 | JUD - Judgment | 11/21/2017 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED | |||
11/17/2017 | STP - Stipulation | 11/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | |||
9/22/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/22/2017 | |
7/13/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/13/2017 | |
7/11/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/12/2017 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF RULING AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND IN HALL v. EORP | |||
5/5/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 5/5/2017 | |
4/18/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/18/2017 | |
4/13/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 4/13/2017 | |
4/13/2015 | 928 – ME: Stay of Proceedings | 4/13/2015 | |
3/16/2015 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/16/2015 | |
2/28/2013 | ORD - Order | 2/28/2013 | |
NOTE: Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY OF ACTION PENDING SUPREME COURT’S DECISION IN FIELDS AND HALL CASES | |||
2/26/2013 | STP - Stipulation | 2/27/2013 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Stay of Action Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Fields and Hall Cases | |||
1/31/2013 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 1/31/2013 | |
1/29/2013 | ORD - Order | 1/29/2013 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
1/18/2013 | STP - Stipulation | 1/22/2013 | |
NOTE: Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadlines | |||
1/10/2013 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/10/2013 | |
1/8/2013 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 1/8/2013 | |
1/7/2013 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 1/7/2013 | |
1/3/2013 | ORD - Order | 1/3/2013 | |
NOTE: Order RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
12/20/2012 | MOT - Motion | 12/20/2012 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
9/26/2012 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 9/26/2012 | |
9/19/2012 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 9/20/2012 | |
NOTE: Acceptance of Service Defendants Public Safety Personnel Retirement System, et. al. | |||
9/17/2012 | COM - Complaint | 9/18/2012 | |
NOTE: Complaint | |||
9/17/2012 | MEM - Memorandum | 9/18/2012 | |
NOTE: Joint Status/Scheduling Memorandum | |||
9/13/2012 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/13/2012 | |
9/7/2012 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/7/2012 | |
9/6/2012 | REL - Reply | 9/6/2012 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX LAW ENFORCMENT ASSOCITATION’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
8/31/2012 | RES - Response | 8/31/2012 | |
NOTE: Response in Opposition to the Request for a Three-Month Continuance Filed by Applicant in Intervention Phoenix Law Enforcement Association | |||
8/29/2012 | NOT - Notice | 8/29/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata | |||
8/28/2012 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 8/28/2012 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSOCIATION’S Expedited Motion To Continue | |||
8/16/2012 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/16/2012 | |
8/14/2012 | REQ - Request | 8/14/2012 | |
NOTE: Request for Rule 16(b) Conference | |||
6/20/2012 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 6/20/2012 | |
6/13/2012 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/13/2012 | |
6/8/2012 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 6/8/2012 | |
5/9/2012 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 5/9/2012 | |
5/8/2012 | NOT - Notice | 5/8/2012 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSOCIATION’S NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
5/7/2012 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 5/7/2012 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Oral Argument Scheduled for May 21, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. | |||
5/4/2012 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 5/4/2012 | |
4/23/2012 | REL - Reply | 4/24/2012 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSOCIATION’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO INTERVENE AS A PLAINTIFF | |||
4/19/2012 | REL - Reply | 4/20/2012 | |
NOTE: Phoenix Law Enforcement Associations Reply in Support of Its Motion to Intervene as a Plaintiff | |||
4/11/2012 | RES - Response | 4/12/2012 | |
NOTE: PSPRS Defendants' Response to PLEA's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff | |||
4/9/2012 | RES - Response | 4/9/2012 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Phoenix Law Enforcement Association's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff | |||
3/23/2012 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 3/23/2012 | |
NOTE: $301.00 RECEIVED FROM MICHAEL NAPIER FOR PHOENIX LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSOCIATION FOR INTERVENOR FEE | |||
3/23/2012 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 3/23/2012 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene | |||
3/1/2012 | ANS - Answer | 3/2/2012 | |
NOTE: Answer to Verified Complaint-Co Chrg Receipt #21998298 | |||
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | SUM - Summons | 1/27/2012 | |
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: THE PUBLIC SAFETY PERSONNEL RETIREMENT SYSTEM SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: BRIAN TOBIN SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: RICHARD PETRENKA SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: GREGORY FERGUSON SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: LAUREN KINGRY SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: JEFF MCHENRY SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/24/2012 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/1/2012 | |
NOTE: RANDIE STEIN SERVED 1/18/12 | |||
1/17/2012 | NOT - Notice | 1/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality Regarding Legislative Changes to ARS Section 38-843 and Section 38-856 By the Addition of ARS Section 38-856.02 and Section 38-856.04 | |||
1/12/2012 | COM - Complaint | 1/17/2012 | |
1/12/2012 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 1/17/2012 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/21/2012 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
6/5/2012 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
9/19/2012 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
4/26/2013 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
5/17/2013 | 9:30 | Cross-Motion For Summary Jdgmt |
7/26/2013 | 9:00 | Cross-Motion For Summary Jdgmt |
4/8/2015 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
5/2/2017 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
7/12/2017 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
9/20/2017 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
1/22/2018 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
11/21/2017 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only |