« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-097922
Judge:
Coffey, Rodrick
File Date:
8/23/2011
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Villages At Park Centre Owners Association, The
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jon Hultgren
Party Name
Devin Thomas
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Kendra Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
State Of Arizona, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (EARNINGS)
Filing Date
10/17/2016
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR CONTINUING
LIEN
Filing Date
8/19/2016
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
8/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/15/2012
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit Regarding Attorneys' Fees
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
8/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation
Filing Date
6/28/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default
Filing Date
6/28/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit on Default and Entry of Default
Filing Date
4/10/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default
Filing Date
4/10/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit on Default and Entry of Default
Filing Date
2/22/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA
Filing Date
12/8/2011
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAIN ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
11/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Matter on the Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
11/7/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED - DEVIN THOMAS AND KENDRA HEMPHILL SERVED 08/27/2011
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEVIN THOMAS AND KENDRA HEMPHILL 8/27/2011
Filing Date
9/7/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA, THE SERVED 08/29/11
Filing Date
8/23/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LIS PENDENS
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/2/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Default Hearing
Date
8/15/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Default Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
8/15/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Villages At Park Centre Owners Association, The
A: Devin Thomas
A: Devin Thomas
Amount
$500.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
8/15/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Villages At Park Centre Owners Association, The
A: Devin Thomas
A: Devin Thomas
Amount
$2,074.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
8/15/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Villages At Park Centre Owners Association, The
A: Devin Thomas
A: Devin Thomas
Amount
$1,434.30
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
8/15/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Villages At Park Centre Owners Association, The
A: Devin Thomas
A: Devin Thomas
Amount
$11,214.25
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status