« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2011-094339 Judge: Welty, Joseph
File Date: 4/14/2011 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank   Plaintiff    Scott Potter 
Logan Franks   Defendant  Male  Dustin Horne 
Theresa Franks   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Guaranty Solutions Recovery Fund 1 L L C   Assignee    Dustin Horne 
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/21/2016  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  11/22/2016   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment 
11/18/2016  NOT - Notice  11/21/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Release and Quash of Writ of Garnishment against jp morgan chase bank n a 
11/16/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/28/2016   
11/3/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/3/2016   
10/24/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  11/9/2016  Garnishee Defendant(5)  
10/24/2016  APL - Application  10/25/2016   
NOTE: Application for Garnishment Judgment 
10/5/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  10/19/2016  Garnishee Defendant(5)  
9/23/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/28/2016   
9/19/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  9/20/2016   
9/16/2016  ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment  9/16/2016   
NOTE: RENEWAL AFFIDAVIT - Efile billing $27 
9/14/2016  NOT - Notice  9/14/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Assignment of Judgment and Notice of Appearance of Judgment Creditor Successor In Interest 
11/30/2011  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  11/30/2011   
NOTE: Partial Satisfaction of Judgment 
10/5/2011  DFJ - Default Judgment  10/13/2011   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
9/6/2011  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  9/7/2011   
NOTE: Affidavit of Attorneys Fees and Statement of Costs 
9/6/2011  MOT - Motion  9/7/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Default Judgment 
9/6/2011  DCL - Declaration  9/7/2011   
NOTE: Sum Certain Declaration 
8/17/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/17/2011   
8/4/2011  ADE - Application For Default  8/5/2011   
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default 
8/4/2011  AFD - Affidavit On Default  8/5/2011   
NOTE: Affidavit of Default 
7/6/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/7/2011   
NOTE: Proof of Service ON LOGAN FRANKS AND THERESA FRANKS SERVED 06/29/2011 
6/2/2011  ORD - Order  6/2/2011   
NOTE: ORDER PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE 
6/1/2011  MOT - Motion  6/2/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Alternative Service 
4/14/2011  COM - Complaint  4/15/2011   
4/14/2011  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  4/15/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/28/2011  9:00  Default Hearing 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
9/16/2016  F:M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank  $536,226.35  One Time  Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment  Satisfied 
  A: Logan Franks         
  A: Theresa Franks         
10/5/2011  F:M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank  $2,188.00  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Logan Franks         
  A: Theresa Franks         
10/5/2011  F:M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank  $1,625.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Logan Franks         
  A: Theresa Franks         
10/5/2011  F:M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank  $675,437.79  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Logan Franks         
  A: Theresa Franks         
click here for Law Library Resource Center