« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-052005
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
3/21/2011
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael Forsyth
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kira Schlesinger Conrad
Party Name
Nadene Forsyth
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kira Schlesinger Conrad
Party Name
Peter Workum
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Greg Harrington
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert M Beaudry
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Rollman
Party Name
Thomas P Sylvester
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Rollman
Party Name
Barbara S Beaudry
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Richard Rollman
Party Name
Joanne E Workum
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE LIST AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DATES
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
4/13/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
3/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
2/6/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Defendants' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
9/9/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer-Efile Billing $223.00
Filing Date
7/29/2011
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
7/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Return of Service
Filing Date
4/26/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETER J WORKKUM 4/1/2011
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer / PAID
$223.00 RECEIPT #21316082
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.