Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2011-021234 | Judge: | Covil, Max |
File Date: | 11/30/2011 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Philip Hall | Plaintiff | Male | Ron Kilgard |
Jon W Thompson | Plaintiff | Male | Ron Kilgard |
Elected Officials Retirement Plan, The | Defendant | Bennett Cooper | |
Brian Tobin | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Richard J Petrenka | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Gregory Ferguson | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Lauren Kingry | Defendant | Female | Bennett Cooper |
Jeff Allen McHenry | Defendant | Male | Bennett Cooper |
Randie A Stein | Defendant | Unknown | Bennett Cooper |
Arizona Attorney Generals Office | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Speaker Of The Arizona House Of Representatives, The | Defendant | Pro Per | |
State Of Arizona | Intervenor | Charles Grube |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/28/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/28/2017 | |
6/28/2017 | JUD - Judgment | 7/3/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
6/22/2017 | NOT - Notice | 6/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Stipulated Form of Judgment on Remand | |||
6/14/2017 | NOT - Notice | 6/16/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment on Remand | |||
6/9/2017 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/9/2017 | |
6/8/2017 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 6/8/2017 | |
6/1/2017 | REL - Reply | 6/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply to Responses to Motion for Entry of Judgment on Remand | |||
6/1/2017 | REL - Reply | 6/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply to Responses to Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest | |||
6/1/2017 | REL - Reply | 6/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply to Responses to Motion for Award of Attorney Fees | |||
5/10/2017 | NOT - Notice | 5/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Replies to Defendants’ Responses to Plaintiffs’ Motions for: ? Entry of Judgment ? Prejudgment Interest ? Attorney Fees | |||
5/8/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 5/9/2017 | |
NOTE: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment by State of Arizona | |||
5/8/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES BY STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
5/8/2017 | RES - Response | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: EORP DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND | |||
5/8/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Prejudgment Interest by State of Arizona | |||
5/8/2017 | RES - Response | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees | |||
5/8/2017 | RES - Response | 5/10/2017 | |
NOTE: EORP DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST | |||
5/5/2017 | NOT - Notice | 5/9/2017 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF THIRD EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND, PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES | |||
5/1/2017 | NOT - Notice | 5/3/2017 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND, PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES | |||
4/24/2017 | NOT - Notice | 4/25/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment on Remand, Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees | |||
4/11/2017 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 4/11/2017 | |
4/11/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/11/2017 | |
4/4/2017 | MOT - Motion | 4/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Entry of Judgment on Remand | |||
4/4/2017 | MOT - Motion | 4/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest | |||
4/4/2017 | MOT - Motion | 4/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees | |||
3/30/2017 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 3/30/2017 | |
3/30/2017 | NOT - Notice | 3/31/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Related Case | |||
3/27/2017 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 3/28/2017 | |
3/27/2017 | LET - Letter | 3/28/2017 | |
3/24/2017 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 3/27/2017 | |
3/24/2017 | LET - Letter | 3/27/2017 | |
6/12/2015 | ORD - Order | 6/12/2015 | |
NOTE: FROM AZ SUPREME CT | |||
3/27/2015 | LET - Letter | 3/27/2015 | |
NOTE: FROM COA: APPELLANT'S FILING FEE DUE | |||
3/19/2015 | NOT - Notice | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order and Designation of Transcripts | |||
3/19/2015 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ORDER RE: REINSTATEMENT OF APPEAL (BACK TO DIV 1) | |||
3/19/2015 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 3/19/2015 | |
NOTE: FROM COA, DIV 2: RETURNING CASE TO DIV 1 | |||
3/16/2015 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 3/17/2015 | |
NOTE: FROM COA DIV 1: TRANSFERRING CASE TO COA, DIV 2 | |||
3/16/2015 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 3/17/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER: TRANSFERRING CASE FROM COA DIV 1 TO COA DIV 2 | |||
3/13/2015 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 3/13/2015 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
3/13/2015 | AIX - Appeals Index | 3/13/2015 | |
2/25/2015 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/26/2015 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Notice of Appeal | |||
2/23/2015 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/24/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal/Efile billing $92.00 | |||
2/23/2015 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/24/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of Cross-Appeal | |||
2/6/2015 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/9/2015 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Notice of Appeal | |||
1/29/2015 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 1/29/2015 | |
1/27/2015 | JUD - Judgment | 1/29/2015 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
1/27/2015 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 1/27/2015 | |
12/24/2014 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/24/2014 | |
12/22/2014 | REL - Reply | 12/22/2014 | |
NOTE: Reply to Responses to Motion for Entry of Judgment | |||
12/11/2014 | ORD - Order | 12/11/2014 | |
NOTE: ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO REPLY TO THE RESPONSES TO THE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |||
12/9/2014 | STP - Stipulation | 12/10/2014 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Reply to the Responses to the Motion for Entry of Judgment | |||
12/2/2014 | RES - Response | 12/3/2014 | |
NOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |||
12/2/2014 | RES - Response | 12/3/2014 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment | |||
11/26/2014 | ORD - Order | 11/26/2014 | |
NOTE: Order ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |||
11/24/2014 | STP - Stipulation | 11/24/2014 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |||
11/17/2014 | STP - Stipulation | 11/18/2014 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |||
11/3/2014 | MOT - Motion | 11/4/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion for Entry of Judgment | |||
10/6/2014 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 10/6/2014 | |
10/1/2014 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/1/2014 | |
9/19/2014 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 9/19/2014 | |
9/18/2014 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 9/18/2014 | |
8/26/2014 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/26/2014 | |
6/30/2014 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/30/2014 | |
6/9/2014 | REL - Reply | 6/9/2014 | |
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion for Reconsideration in Light of Recent Court of Appeals Decision | |||
6/2/2014 | RES - Response | 6/3/2014 | |
NOTE: EORP DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IN LIGHT OF RECENT COURT OF APPEALS DECISION | |||
6/2/2014 | RES - Response | 6/3/2014 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Response Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration Re Eligibility for Attorney Fees | |||
5/30/2014 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred | 5/30/2014 | |
5/22/2014 | NOT - Notice | 5/22/2014 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IN LIGHT OF RECENT COURT OF APPEALS DECISION | |||
5/12/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/12/2014 | |
5/6/2014 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 5/6/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration in Light of Recent Court of Appeals Decision | |||
4/15/2014 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 4/15/2014 | |
4/10/2014 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 4/10/2014 | |
3/31/2014 | REL - Reply | 3/31/2014 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion re Eligibility for Attorney Fees Under A.R.S. Sec. 12-341.01(A) | |||
3/28/2014 | ORD - Order | 3/28/2014 | |
NOTE: Order re Time for Plaintiffs and Proposed Class to File Reply re Motion re Eligibility for Attorney Fees Under A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A) | |||
3/25/2014 | STP - Stipulation | 3/25/2014 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Amend Time for Plaintiffs and Proposed Class to File Reply re Motion re Eligibility for Attorney Fees Under A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A) | |||
3/24/2014 | RES - Response | 3/25/2014 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Response Opposing Plaintiff's Motion Re Eligibility for Attorney Fees | |||
3/24/2014 | RES - Response | 3/25/2014 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion re Eligibility for Attorney Fees Under A.R.S. 12-341.01(A) | |||
3/17/2014 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 3/17/2014 | |
3/12/2014 | MOT - Motion | 3/12/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion re Eligibility for Attorney Fees Under A.R.S. Sec. 12-341.01(A) | |||
3/5/2014 | NOT - Notice | 3/5/2014 | |
NOTE: Proposed Agenda for Telephonic Status Conference: Friday March 7, 2014 10:00 a.m. | |||
3/3/2014 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/3/2014 | |
2/25/2014 | NOT - Notice | 2/25/2014 | |
NOTE: Notification of Decision in Fields -and- Request for Telephonic Status Conference | |||
8/29/2013 | 928 – ME: Stay of Proceedings | 8/29/2013 | |
8/21/2013 | ORD - Order | 8/26/2013 | |
NOTE: STAYING THIS ACTION PENDING DECISION OF ARIZONA SUPREME COURT | |||
8/14/2013 | MOT - Motion | 8/14/2013 | |
NOTE: Unopposed Motion for Stay Pending Decision of Arizona Supreme Court | |||
7/30/2013 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 7/30/2013 | |
7/17/2013 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 7/17/2013 | |
7/5/2013 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/5/2013 | |
5/29/2013 | ORD - Order | 5/29/2013 | |
NOTE: Order Amending Scheduling Order for Motions for Reconsideration | |||
5/28/2013 | REL - Reply | 5/28/2013 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply to the State's and the Plan's Responses to the Motions for Reconsideration | |||
5/21/2013 | MOT - Motion | 5/22/2013 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Motions for Reconsideration | |||
5/16/2013 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 5/16/2013 | |
5/14/2013 | ORD - Order | 5/20/2013 | |
NOTE: MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER RE OTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
5/10/2013 | RES - Response | 5/13/2013 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Response Opposing Plaintiffs' Motions for Reconsideration | |||
5/10/2013 | RES - Response | 5/13/2013 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration re Validity of 2000 EORP Vesting Statute & Motion for Reconsideration on Effect of Judicial Salary Clause on Increased Contribution Rate | |||
5/3/2013 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 5/6/2013 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Motions for Reconsideration | |||
4/19/2013 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 4/19/2013 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration re Validity of 2000 EORP Vesting Statute | |||
4/12/2013 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 4/12/2013 | |
4/4/2013 | ORD - Order | 4/5/2013 | |
NOTE: SCHEDULING/RE MOTIONS FOR RECONDISDERATION | |||
4/2/2013 | MOT - Motion | 4/3/2013 | |
NOTE: Motion for Scheduling Order re Motions for Reconsideration and Motion to Expedite | |||
3/29/2013 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/29/2013 | |
3/25/2013 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 3/25/2013 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration on Effect of Judicial Salary Clause on Increased Contribution Rate | |||
3/21/2013 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 3/21/2013 | |
2/19/2013 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 2/19/2013 | |
2/11/2013 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 2/12/2013 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Exhibits to Joint Statement of Facts | |||
2/11/2013 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 2/12/2013 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Exhibits to Joint Statement of Facts | |||
2/7/2013 | REL - Reply | 2/8/2013 | |
NOTE: EORP DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
2/7/2013 | REL - Reply | 2/8/2013 | |
NOTE: State's Joinder in Reply Brief | |||
1/23/2013 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 1/23/2013 | |
1/18/2013 | ORD - Order | 1/25/2013 | |
NOTE: EXPANDING PAGE LIMITS | |||
12/31/2012 | RES - Response | 1/2/2013 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -AND- REPLY TO DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
12/31/2012 | MOT - Motion | 1/2/2013 | |
NOTE: Motion to Expand Page Limits | |||
11/15/2012 | ORD - Order | 11/15/2012 | |
NOTE: Order re Schedule | |||
11/13/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 11/13/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Schedule | |||
11/8/2012 | RES - Response | 11/8/2012 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
11/8/2012 | NOT - Notice | 11/8/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata re EORP Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
11/7/2012 | RES - Response | 11/8/2012 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Response Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment And Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
11/7/2012 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 11/8/2012 | |
NOTE: EORP Defendants' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Moton for Summary Judgment | |||
9/21/2012 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 9/21/2012 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
9/21/2012 | NOT - Notice | 9/21/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice re Intervention of State of Arizona | |||
9/17/2012 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/17/2012 | |
9/14/2012 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance / Co-Chg Rcpt # 22456420 | |||
9/14/2012 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Joint Statement of Facts | |||
8/17/2012 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/17/2012 | |
8/15/2012 | ORD - Order | 8/23/2012 | |
NOTE: RE BRIEFING PROCEDURE AND SCHEDULE | |||
8/14/2012 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 8/14/2012 | |
8/10/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 8/10/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Briefing Procedure | |||
8/7/2012 | REQ - Request | 8/7/2012 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Request for Immediate Telephonic Status Conference | |||
7/23/2012 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/23/2012 | |
7/17/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 7/18/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Briefing Schedule | |||
6/21/2012 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/21/2012 | |
5/29/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 5/29/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Status Conference | |||
5/2/2012 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 5/2/2012 | |
3/29/2012 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/29/2012 | |
3/15/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 3/15/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Transfer | |||
2/3/2012 | ANS - Answer | 2/6/2012 | |
NOTE: Answer to Verified Complaint / CO CHG Receipt #21935107 | |||
1/12/2012 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 1/13/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Waiver of Issuance and Service of Process | |||
12/5/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/14/2011 | |
NOTE: AZ ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE 12/01/2011 | |||
12/5/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/14/2011 | |
12/5/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/14/2011 | |
NOTE: THE SPEAKER OF THE ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES SERVED 12/1/11 | |||
12/1/2011 | NOT - Notice | 12/1/2011 | |
NOTE: Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality | |||
11/30/2011 | COM - Complaint | 12/1/2011 | |
11/30/2011 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/1/2011 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
6/15/2012 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
8/9/2012 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/19/2012 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
12/17/2012 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
2/11/2013 | 15:00 | Oral Argument |
7/12/2013 | 15:30 | Oral Argument |
3/7/2014 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
4/4/2014 | 14:30 | Oral Argument |
8/22/2014 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/26/2014 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
9/29/2014 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/3/2014 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
10/30/2014 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
1/23/2015 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
6/6/2017 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
6/28/2017 | F:Philip Hall | $200,759.12 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Jon W Thompson | |||||
A: Elected Officials Retirement Plan, The | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
1/27/2015 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only |