Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2011-008331 Judge: McCoy, M. Scott
File Date: 4/13/2011 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
J P M C C 2007-C I B C19 Shea Boulevard L L C   Plaintiff    Jonathan Saffer 
Steven J Goodhue   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Terri J Goodhue   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/10/2015  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  4/13/2015   
4/10/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  4/13/2015   
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL 
3/2/2015  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  3/3/2015   
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL 
1/9/2015  LET - Letter  1/9/2015   
NOTE: FILING FEE DUE 
12/30/2014  AIX - Appeals Index  12/31/2014   
12/30/2014  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  12/31/2014   
11/28/2014  CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement  12/1/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Civil Appeals Docketing Statement 
11/28/2014  NOT - Notice  12/1/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant's Designation for Partial Transcript 
11/28/2014  NOT - Notice  12/1/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF ERRATA OF DEFENDANT’S CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETING STATEMENT 
11/14/2014  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  11/17/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF APPEAL 
11/14/2014  AFF - Affidavit  11/17/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Affidavit in Lieu of Bond 
10/14/2014  JUD - Judgment  10/14/2014   
NOTE: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF JPMCC 2007-CIBC19 SHEA BOULEVARD, LLC AND AGAINST STEVEN J. GOODHUE 
8/6/2014  NOT - Notice  8/7/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF JPMCC 2007-CIBC19 SHEA BOULEVARD, LLC AND AGAINST STEVEN J. GOODHUE 
7/22/2014  ORD - Order  7/22/2014   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT 
6/2/2014  ORD - Order  6/2/2014   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLANTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERLCIAMS 
5/28/2014  CER - Certificate  5/28/2014   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND NO OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
5/1/2014  MOT - Motion  5/2/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLANTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
3/24/2014  ORD - Order  3/24/2014   
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLANTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERLCIAMS 
3/24/2014  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  3/24/2014   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
3/19/2014  MOT - Motion  3/19/2014  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLANTIFF’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
2/12/2014  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  2/12/2014   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
2/12/2014  SOF - Statement Of Facts  2/12/2014   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 
12/18/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference  12/18/2013   
12/2/2013  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  12/2/2013   
11/25/2013  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  11/25/2013   
11/21/2013  MCO - Motion To Continue  11/21/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE 
10/18/2013  REQ - Request  10/18/2013   
NOTE: Request to Take Judicial Notice of Ruling by U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Arizona Case No. 2:10-bk-37387-SSC 
10/15/2013  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/15/2013   
10/4/2013  NOF - Notice Of Filing  10/7/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING NON-ARIZONA STATE CASES REFERENCED IN PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/20/2013  REL - Reply  9/23/2013   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
9/18/2013  ORD - Order  9/18/2013   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
9/6/2013  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document  10/11/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIMS 
8/30/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/30/2013   
8/30/2013  MOT - Motion  9/3/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND DATE TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
8/27/2013  ORD - Order  8/27/2013   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT 
8/21/2013  ORD - Order  8/21/2013   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
8/15/2013  MOT - Motion  8/16/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
8/15/2013  MOT - Motion  8/16/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT 
8/15/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/16/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
7/23/2013  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  7/23/2013   
6/28/2013  MOT - Motion  7/1/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLANTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERLCIAMS 
6/11/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference  6/11/2013   
6/5/2013  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  6/5/2013   
5/22/2013  MOT - Motion  5/23/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO RULE 56(f) 
5/22/2013  MTC - Motion To Compel  5/23/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant's Second Motion to Compel 
5/20/2013  RES - Response  5/21/2013   
NOTE: Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Compel 
5/8/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/8/2013   
4/30/2013  019 - ME: Ruling  4/30/2013   
4/29/2013  MOT - Motion  4/30/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 
4/29/2013  MTC - Motion To Compel  4/30/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant's Motion to Compel 
4/29/2013  NOT - Notice  4/30/2013  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant's Notice of Non-Service 
4/23/2013  NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure  4/23/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement 
4/23/2013  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  4/24/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Hearing 
4/19/2013  MOT - Motion  4/22/2013   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTTON FOR (1) PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND (2) SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
4/19/2013  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  4/22/2013   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR (1) PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND (2) SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED Hearing Date: July 19, 2013 10:00 a.m. 
4/19/2013  SOF - Statement Of Facts  4/22/2013   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT oF MOTION FOR (1 )PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE BREACH OF GUARANTY AND (2) SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL COUNTERCLAIMS 
4/15/2013  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  4/15/2013   
4/9/2013  NOT - Notice  4/9/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Requests for Admission and Interrogatories 
1/29/2013  005 - ME: Hearing  1/29/2013   
1/8/2013  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  1/8/2013   
1/3/2013  019 - ME: Ruling  1/3/2013   
12/28/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  12/28/2012   
NOTE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER 
12/19/2012  REL - Reply  12/20/2012  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: Defendant"s Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to DEFENDANT’S Motion for Leave to FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM 
12/19/2012  NOT - Notice  12/20/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Opinion 
12/13/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  12/14/2012  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANTS Motion for Reconsideration of THE COURT'S Scheduling Order of October 2, 2012 
12/7/2012  ORD - Order  12/7/2012   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO REPLY TO PLANTIFF’S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM 
12/5/2012  MOT - Motion  12/5/2012  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO REPY TO PLANTIFF’S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM 
11/27/2012  NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure  11/27/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement 
11/19/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/20/2012   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim 
11/2/2012  MTA - Motion To Amend  11/5/2012  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S Motion for Leave to FILE FIRST AmendED Answer and Counterclaim 
10/8/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  10/8/2012   
10/2/2012  ORD - Order  10/8/2012   
NOTE: SCHEDULING 
9/17/2012  MEM - Memorandum  9/17/2012   
NOTE: PreTrial Scheduling Memorandum 
8/29/2012  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  8/29/2012   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL 
8/15/2012  ORD - Order  8/15/2012   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/14/2012  MOT - Motion  8/14/2012   
NOTE: SECOND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/1/2012  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  8/1/2012   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 
7/24/2012  ORD - Order  7/24/2012   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
7/13/2012  MOT - Motion  7/16/2012   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER 
7/3/2012  NOT - Notice  7/3/2012   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA AND NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS 
7/3/2012  REL - Reply  7/3/2012   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS 
7/2/2012  ANS - Answer  7/2/2012   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS 
5/1/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  5/1/2012   
4/10/2012  ORD - Order  4/11/2012   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND DISCLOSURES 
4/2/2012  STP - Stipulation  4/3/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND DISCLOSURES 
3/21/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/21/2012   
3/20/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing  3/21/2012   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING RELEVANT DOCUMENTS FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT ADVERSARY PROCEEDING 
3/16/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  3/19/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
3/16/2012  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  3/19/2012   
2/9/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing  2/9/2012   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE 
8/23/2011  NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court  8/24/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal 
8/5/2011  SUM - Summons  8/9/2011   
8/5/2011  SUM - Summons  8/9/2011   
8/5/2011  SUM - Summons  8/9/2011   
8/3/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/4/2011   
NOTE: Affidavit of Service TERRI J GOODHUE 7/26/11 
8/3/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/4/2011   
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEVEN J GOODHUE 7/26/11 
7/20/2011  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  7/20/2011   
4/13/2011  COM - Complaint  4/14/2011   
4/13/2011  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  4/14/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/26/2012  9:00  Hearing 
1/25/2013  8:45  Hearing 
4/11/2013  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
6/6/2013  10:30  Hearing 
7/17/2013  13:55  Emergency Hearing 
7/19/2013  10:00  Oral Argument 
10/11/2013  14:30  Oral Argument 
11/26/2013  9:30  Status Conference 
12/17/2013  9:00  Status Conference 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
10/14/2014  F:J P M C C 2007-C I B C19 Shea Boulevard L L C  $10,150,453.89  One Time  Principal   
  A: Steven J Goodhue