« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-007446
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Herrod
File Date:
8/2/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
F I A Card Services N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Todd Gurstel
Party Name
Robert D Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment/ EFILE BILLING $27
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF
COUNSEL OF RECORD
Filing Date
2/2/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel of Record and Order
Filing Date
3/20/2015
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF’S
COUNSEL’S FIRM NAME CHANGE
Filing Date
5/24/2012
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
5/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2012
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
6/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
5/7/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2012
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
4/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(a), A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(a), A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
12/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements
Filing Date
10/31/2011
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Affidavit for Entry of Judgment by Default and Without Hearing
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2011
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application and Affidavit of Default
Filing Date
9/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to Seek Entry of Default
Filing Date
8/12/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT HEMPHILL 8/9/2011
Filing Date
8/12/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2011
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
8/3/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/22/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: Robert D Hemphill
A: Robert D Hemphill
Amount
$11,430.56
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
5/22/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: Robert D Hemphill
A: Robert D Hemphill
Amount
$417.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
5/22/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: Robert D Hemphill
A: Robert D Hemphill
Amount
$11,013.56
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified
Date
11/17/2011
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: Robert D Hemphill
A: Robert D Hemphill
Amount
$399.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
11/17/2011
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: Robert D Hemphill
A: Robert D Hemphill
Amount
$11,013.56
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status