« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-005942
Judge:
Hannah, John
File Date:
3/28/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Hogan Manufacturing L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
STANLEY HAMMERMAN
Party Name
Doug Kircher
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Gramlich
Party Name
Michelle Kircher
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Richard Gramlich
Party Name
Robert B Davies
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Advanced Device Design Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Joseph Meaney
Party Name
Dr Sky Inc
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Christopher Desomma
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Gilbert
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
10/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2013
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2013
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/2/2013
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
10/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC., FRANK DESOMMA, AND CHRISTOPHER DESOMMA
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2013
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF
CLAIMS BET\ryEEN PATRIOT
ORDNANCE FACTORY,INC.
FRANK DESOMMA, ADVANCED
DEVICE DESIGN, INC., AND THE
ESTA.TE OF ROBERT B. DAVIES
Filing Date
9/17/2013
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC. FRANK DESOMMA, HOGAN MANUFACTURING LLC, ROBERT HOGAN, AND DAWN HOGAN
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2013
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC., FRANK DESOMMA, STEVEN KATES DBA "DR. SKY," AND DOUG AND MICHELLE KIRCHER - WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF
CLAIMS BETWEEN PATRIOT
ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.,
FRANK DESOMMA, STEVEN
KATES DBA “DR. SKY,” AND
DOUG AND MICHELLE KIRCHER
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2013
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY INC FRANK DESOMMA, HOGAN MANUFACTURING LLC, ROBERT HODAN AND DAWN HOGAN
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2013
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Between Patriot Ordnance Factory, Inc., Frank DeSomma, Hogan Manufacturing LLC, Robert Hogan and Dawn Hogan
Filing Date
6/26/2013
Description
928 – ME: Stay of Proceedings
Docket Date
6/26/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE TO PERMIT ALL PARTIES TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
6/5/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Stay Case to Permit All Parties to Finalize Settlement
Filing Date
5/22/2013
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
5/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/14/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata RE SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/9/2013
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel
Filing Date
5/8/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
5/8/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/9/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
5/7/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR TWELVE REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
4/29/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR TWELVE REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Revised Joint Pretrial Memorandum
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
4/17/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.’S AND FRANK DESOMMA’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY UNDER ARIZONA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 25(a)
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADD and Estate's Motion for Leave to Supplement Response in Opposition to POF'S and DeSomma'S Motion for SUbstitution of Party
Filing Date
4/10/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADD’S AND ESTATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO POF’S AND DESOMMA’S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY
Filing Date
4/3/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING RULE 4.2(c) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PATRIOT ORDANANCE FACTOR INC
Filing Date
3/29/2013
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
3/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2013
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
4/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEYS FOR STEVEN R KATES AND DR SKY INC WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
3/25/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
3/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY INC'S AND FRANK DESOMMA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18 2013
Filing Date
3/21/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2013
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/19/2013
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION TO WITHRAW FROM
REPRESENTATION OF DEFENDANTS/
COUNTERCLAIMANTS STEVEN R.
KATES AND DR. SKY, INC., WITH
CONSENT
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/20/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULTION TO EXTEND PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY INC'S AND FRANK DESOMMA'S DEALDINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/13/2013
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.'S AND FRANK DESOMMA'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.'S AND FRANK DESOMMA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2013
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADD's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.'S AND FRANK DESOMMA'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY UNDER ARIZONA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 25(A)
Filing Date
3/8/2013
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Christopher DeSomma's Answer
Filing Date
3/7/2013
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel and for Sanctions
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADD’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM AFFILIATION
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY, INC.’S AND FRANK DESOMMA’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO ADD’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
2/4/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADD’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
11/16/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR 90-DAY EXTENSION OF
TIME FOR ALL DEADLINES
Filing Date
11/15/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/15/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALL DEADLINES
Filing Date
11/2/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUGGESTION OF DEATH UPON THE RECORD OF COUNTERDEFENDANT ROBERT B. DAVIES
Filing Date
11/1/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2012
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
10/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFFS/ COUNTERDEFENDANTS POF-USA & DeSOMMA
Filing Date
10/19/2012
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
10/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2012
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
10/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory Inc.'s And Frank Desomma's Statement Of Non-Opposition To Christopher Desomma's Motion To Consolidate
Filing Date
10/4/2012
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
10/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joinder In Christopher DeSomma's Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joinder in Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER Approving Amended Joint Pretrial Memorandum and proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Joint Pretrial Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
9/21/2012
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
9/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER DESOMMA"S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2012
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Record
Filing Date
8/10/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER suspending discovery deadlines pending substitution of counsel
Filing Date
8/6/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Suspend Deadlines PENDING SUBSITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/20/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Suspend Deadlines Pending Substitution of Counsel & Request for Rule 16 Conference
Filing Date
7/12/2012
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
7/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2012
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTERCLAIMANTS/PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL JABURG & WILK P C
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
KATES' MOTION TO EXPAND PAGE LIMITS OF REPLY
Filing Date
6/1/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
KATES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTERCLAIMANTS'/PLANITFFS' COUNSEL JABURG & WILK, P.C.
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation To Extend Time To File Reply In Support Of Motion To Disqaualify Counterclaimants'/Plaintiffs' Counsel Jaburg & Wilk, P.C.
Filing Date
5/25/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Declaration of Frank DeSomma in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify
Filing Date
5/18/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS STEVEN KATES and DR. SKY, INC.’S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTERCLAIMANTS’/ PLAINTIFFS’ COUNSEL JABURG & WILK, P.C.
Filing Date
5/18/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Expand Page Limit
Filing Date
5/18/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNTERCLAIMANTS’/PLAINTIFFS’ COUNSEL JABURG & WILK, P.C.
Filing Date
5/16/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Brief Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Steven Kates and Dr. Sky Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counterclaimants'/Plaintiffs' Counsel Jaburg & Wilk, PC
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS STEVEN KATES and DR. SKY, INC.’S MOTION TO
DISQUALIFY COUNTERCLAIMANTS’/
PLAINTIFFS’ COUNSEL JABURG & WILK, P.C.
Filing Date
5/7/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Brief Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Steven Kates and Dr. Sky, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counterclaimants'/Plaintiffs' Counsel Jaburg & Wilk, P.C.
Filing Date
5/2/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN AND ROBERT DAVIES’ REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIMANTS’ COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
4/25/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Disqualify Counterclaimants/Plaintiffs Counsel Jaburg Wilk, P.C.
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
4/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
4/9/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Reply in Support of Motion to Correct Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/27/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN AND ROBERT DAVIES’ RESPONSE TO MOTION
Filing Date
3/21/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT DAVIES' AND ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Filing Date
2/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Motion to Correct Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/27/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Response in Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees
Filing Date
2/23/2012
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
2/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
2/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
2/21/2012
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
2/22/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Controverting Certificate
Filing Date
2/10/2012
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT DAVIES' AND ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN, INC.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Filing Date
2/8/2012
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
2/8/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2012
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/20/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
1/20/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT DAVIES' AND ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
1/18/2012
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
1/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Kates' Reply In Support of Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
1/3/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Patriot Ordnance Factory's Response in Opposition to Kates and Dr. Sky, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
12/9/2011
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
12/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterdefendants Advanced Device Design's and Robert Davies' Joinder in Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
12/7/2011
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
12/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joinder in Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
12/5/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterdefendants Advanced Device Design's and Robert Davies' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
11/30/2011
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
11/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
11/23/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Hogan Manufacturing, L.L.C. and Counterdefendants Robert and Dawn Hogan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/22/2011
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
11/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Consolidate
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
11/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Response in Opposition to MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/14/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Controverting Statement of Facts in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Counterdefendants' Response to Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Certain Claims and Compelling Arbitration on Such Claims
Filing Date
10/25/2011
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterdefendants Advanced Device Design's and Robert Davies' Response to Counterclaimants' Motion to Vacate Order
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiff/Counterdefendant's and Counterdefendant Robert and Dawn Hogan's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
9/22/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
RESPONSE TO “ADVANCED DEVICE
DESIGN’S AND ROBERT DAVIES’
MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO
COMPEL ARBITRATION”, AND
MOTION TO STAY AAA
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/20/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Certain Claims and Compelling Arbitration on Such Claims
Filing Date
9/16/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response in Opposition to ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGNS AND ROBERT DAVIES MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO STAY AAA PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2011
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Business Address for Counsel for Counterdefendant Advanced Device Design, Inc. and Robert B. Davies
Filing Date
9/6/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDNANCE FACTORY,
INC.’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO HOGAN MANUFACTURING,
LLC’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/15/2011
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2011
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
8/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Judge
Filing Date
8/5/2011
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
8/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Advanced Device Designs and Robert Davies Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration
Filing Date
8/3/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
8/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
7/29/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
8/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
7/25/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Counterclaim
Filing Date
7/25/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Hogan Manufacturing, L.L.C. and Counterdefendants Robert and Dawn Hogan's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
7/25/2011
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Demand for Jury Trial
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT B DAVIES AND ADVANCED DEVICE DESIGN INC 7/12/2011
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOUG DIRCHER SERVED 07/05/11
Filing Date
7/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHELLE KIRCHER 7/5/2011
Filing Date
6/27/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer and Counterclaim/e-File Billing $223
Filing Date
5/6/2011
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service for Patriot Ordnance Factory inc served 05/02/2011
Filing Date
4/29/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/29/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Vacating Entry of Default
Filing Date
4/27/2011
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
4/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default and Notice of Default
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRIOT ORDINANCE FACTORY INC 4/5/11
Filing Date
4/12/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/14/2011
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/16/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/23/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/18/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/15/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/27/2012
Time
16:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/7/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/3/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/18/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/1/2013
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/5/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/30/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/30/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/9/2013
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/5/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/25/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/8/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.