Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2010-099964 | Judge: | Thompson, Peter |
File Date: | 10/27/2010 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Diane Fernichio | Plaintiff | Female | Leonidas Condos |
Edkey Inc | Defendant | Debora Verdier | |
Choice Education And Development Corporation | Defendant | Debora Verdier | |
Sequoia Charter School Inc | Defendant | Debora Verdier |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/9/2012 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 3/9/2012 | |
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |||
3/8/2012 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 3/9/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice | |||
2/21/2012 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 2/21/2012 | |
2/16/2012 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 2/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Notice of Settlement | |||
2/9/2012 | REL - Reply | 2/10/2012 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Motion for PARTIAL Summary Judgment AND RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
1/19/2012 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 1/19/2012 | |
1/19/2012 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 1/19/2012 | |
1/18/2012 | ORD - Order | 1/25/2012 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN PRIVATE MEDIATION | |||
1/17/2012 | STP - Stipulation | 1/18/2012 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Participate in Private Mediation | |||
1/17/2012 | RES - Response | 1/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract Claim and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract Claim | |||
1/17/2012 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 1/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Defendants Choice Education and Development Corporation and Sequoia Charter School, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
1/17/2012 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 1/17/2012 | |
NOTE: Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants Choice Education and Development Corporation and Sequoia Charter School Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
1/17/2012 | RES - Response | 1/18/2012 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
12/29/2011 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 12/29/2011 | |
12/12/2011 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 12/13/2011 | |
NOTE: Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
12/12/2011 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/12/2011 | |
12/9/2011 | ORD - Order | 12/14/2011 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED SCHEDULING | |||
12/9/2011 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/9/2011 | |
12/2/2011 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/5/2011 | |
NOTE: Joint Scheduling Conference Memorandum | |||
11/8/2011 | ORD - Order | 11/14/2011 | |
NOTE: THAT DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR REASONABLE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,675.00 AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $29.00 IS GRANTED | |||
10/18/2011 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 10/18/2011 | |
10/13/2011 | REQ - Request | 10/14/2011 | |
NOTE: Request For Rule 16 Case management Conference and removal Form Inactive Calendar | |||
9/30/2011 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 10/3/2011 | |
NOTE: Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs | |||
9/28/2011 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 9/28/2011 | |
9/12/2011 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 9/12/2011 | |
9/12/2011 | MOT - Motion | 9/13/2011 | |
NOTE: Motion for Summary Disposition | |||
8/11/2011 | ORD - Order | 8/16/2011 | |
NOTE: PROTECTIVE | |||
8/4/2011 | STP - Stipulation | 8/5/2011 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Regarding Protective Order | |||
7/19/2011 | MOT - Motion | 7/20/2011 | |
NOTE: Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37(f) | |||
3/30/2011 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 3/30/2011 | |
3/16/2011 | 339 - ME: 100 Day Notice | 3/16/2011 | |
3/9/2011 | ANS - Answer | 3/9/2011 | |
NOTE: Answer | |||
3/9/2011 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/9/2011 | |
NOTE: Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration | |||
2/16/2011 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 2/16/2011 | |
2/16/2011 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/16/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | REL - Reply | 1/12/2011 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CHOICE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND SEQUOIA CHARTER SCHOOL, INC. AND COUNTS I, III, AND IV | |||
1/7/2011 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 1/7/2011 | |
12/22/2010 | NOT - Notice | 12/27/2010 | |
NOTE: SUBMISSION OF EXHIBITS A AND B INADVERTENTLY NOT ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |||
12/14/2010 | RES - Response | 12/20/2010 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANTS | |||
11/18/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/1/2010 | |
NOTE: CHOICE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION SERVED 10/27/10 | |||
11/18/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/1/2010 | |
NOTE: EDKEY INC 10/27/10 | |||
11/18/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/1/2010 | |
NOTE: SEQUOIA CHARTER SCHOOL INC 10/28/2010 | |||
11/17/2010 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 12/1/2010 | |
11/16/2010 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/23/2010 | |
NOTE: CHOICE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND SEQUOIA CHARTER SCHOOL INC AND COUNTS I III AND IV | |||
10/27/2010 | COM - Complaint | 10/28/2010 | |
10/27/2010 | REQ - Request | 10/28/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER TANGIBLE THINGS | |||
10/27/2010 | REQ - Request | 10/28/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER TANGIBLE THINGS | |||
10/27/2010 | REQ - Request | 10/28/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER TANGIBLE THINGS | |||
10/27/2010 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/28/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/15/2011 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/27/2011 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
12/8/2011 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/1/2012 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
4/10/2012 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |