« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-099665
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Driggs
File Date:
10/27/2010
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Whitman
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Vicki Lopez
Party Name
Brenda Whitman
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Vicki Lopez
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Properties L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Main Street L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry U S A, L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2012
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
3/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
2/6/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
11/22/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order To Extend Arbitration Deadline
Filing Date
11/4/2011
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation To Extend Arbitration Deadline
Filing Date
10/13/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF WHITMANS’
A.R.S. § 12-341.01
OFFER OF SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decision and Order re Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, RESPONSE TO DECLARATION
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Arbitration Hearing
Filing Date
9/16/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE ARBITRATION AND EXTEND RULE 38.1 TIME LIMITS
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order to Extend Arbitration Deadline
Filing Date
8/17/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to Complete Arbitration and Extend Rule 38.1 Time Limits
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2011
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2011
Description
EDE - Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/4/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Appearance - Notice of Filing Declaration of Thomas P. Sylvester Regarding Entry of Default
Filing Date
3/31/2011
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
3/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Declaration of Thomas P. Sylvester Regarding Entry of Default
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to First Amended Complaint / paid $223.00 Receipt #21258831
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY USA LLC SERVED 02/18/2011
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY MAIN STREET LLC 02/18/2011
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY MAIN STREET LLC SERVED 02/10/11
Filing Date
2/18/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY PROPERTIES LLC 02/10/2011
Filing Date
2/18/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY USA LLC 02/10/11
Filing Date
2/4/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV MESA SERVED 01/29/11
Filing Date
2/4/2011
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 01/29/11
Filing Date
2/4/2011
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
2/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
1/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
1/24/2011
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
1/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY R V COMPANY 12/29/2010
Filing Date
1/8/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV MESA INC SERVED 12/29/10
Filing Date
10/27/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2010
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
10/28/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.