« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-091725
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
7/16/2010
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
American Express Centurion Bank
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
M'Cori Van Ess
Party Name
Wayne Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Edith Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2011
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction of Judgment
Filing Date
12/22/2010
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2010
Description
STJ - Stipulated Judgment
Docket Date
12/27/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/20/2010
Description
STJ - Stipulated Judgment
Docket Date
12/27/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION
Filing Date
11/19/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/24/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING
Filing Date
7/22/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAYNE HEMPHILL SERVED 07/20/2010
Filing Date
7/22/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/20/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2010
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
7/20/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
12/20/2010
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  American Express Centurion Bank
A: Wayne Hemphill
Amount
$8,749.98
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied