Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-082338 Judge: Coffey, Rodrick
File Date: 12/17/2010 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Sabin Burrell   Plaintiff  Unknown  Richard Neuheisel 
Kelly Cook   Defendant  Unknown  Kurt Hammond 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/5/2012  ORD - Order  2/6/2012   
NOTE: **DENIED** ORDER REINSTATING 
2/3/2012  REL - Reply  2/3/2012   
NOTE: Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from Final Order 
2/1/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/1/2012   
1/6/2012  RES - Response  1/6/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR REINSTATMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 60 (c) (1) 
12/30/2011  MOT - Motion  1/3/2012   
NOTE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL ORDER PURSUANT TO ARCP RULE 60C 
12/16/2011  SOC - Statement Of Costs  12/16/2011   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS FOR DEFENDANT 
11/30/2011  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  11/30/2011   
7/21/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/21/2011   
7/6/2011  ANS - Answer  7/6/2011   
NOTE: ANSWER-Efile Billing $223.00 
7/6/2011  CCE - Controverting Certificate  7/6/2011   
NOTE: CONTROVERTING CERTIFICATE RE COMPULSORY ARBITRATION 
6/30/2011  AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default  7/1/2011   
NOTE: Affidavit of Default and Entry of Default 
6/30/2011  ADE - Application For Default  7/1/2011   
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default 
5/25/2011  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  5/25/2011   
1/13/2011  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  1/19/2011   
1/13/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/19/2011   
NOTE: KELLY COOK SERVED 01/08/11 
1/13/2011  SUM - Summons  1/19/2011   
12/17/2010  COM - Complaint  12/20/2010   
12/17/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  12/20/2010   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file