Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-080988 Judge: Thompson, Peter
File Date: 11/24/2010 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
F I A Card Services N A   Plaintiff    Andrew Westle 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Unknown  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/30/2012  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  11/30/2012   
4/27/2011  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/27/2011   
3/17/2011  OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service  3/17/2011   
NOTE: ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE UNTIL MAY 17 2011 
3/16/2011  MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service  3/16/2011   
NOTE: Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Serve 
3/10/2011  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  3/11/2011   
3/2/2011  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  3/2/2011   
12/28/2010  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  12/30/2010   
11/24/2010  COM - Complaint  11/24/2010   
11/24/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/24/2010   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file