Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2010-070607 | Judge: | Newcomb, Casey |
File Date: | 11/4/2010 | Location: | Northwest |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Tina Cernak | Plaintiff | Female | Patrick Monahan |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/26/2011 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 1/28/2011 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
1/26/2011 | MOT - Motion | 1/28/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
1/3/2011 | ADE - Application For Default | 1/5/2011 | |
12/13/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2010 | |
NOTE: JANE DOE JOSTES 12/07/2010 | |||
12/13/2010 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 12/16/2010 | |
11/4/2010 | COM - Complaint | 11/5/2010 | |
11/4/2010 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 11/5/2010 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
1/26/2011 | F:Tina Cernak | $329.20 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
1/26/2011 | F:Tina Cernak | $301.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
1/26/2011 | F:Tina Cernak | $683.70 | One Time | Interest | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
1/26/2011 | F:Tina Cernak | $13,674.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Todd Jostes |