« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-053056
Judge:
Julian, Melissa
File Date:
10/19/2010
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ronald E Ballard
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Palecek
Party Name
Teresa A Ballard
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
James Palecek
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2011
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
2/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2011
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/21/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/21/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.