« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-052114 Judge: Flores, Lisa
File Date: 5/24/2010 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Encompass Insurance Company   Plaintiff    Evan Goldstein 
Theresa A Lee   Defendant  Female  Michael Shaw 
J L Lee   Defendant  Male  Michael Shaw 
Maxwell Rollin Pelton   Defendant  Male  Fredrick Aspey 
Roman Catholic Church Of The Diocese Of Phoenix, The   Defendant    Keith Ricker 
Immaculate Conception Roman Catholic Parish Cottonwood   Defendant    Keith Ricker 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/27/2010  JUD - Judgment  8/30/2010   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
8/24/2010  SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment  8/25/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation to Judgment 
7/21/2010  SOF - Statement Of Facts  7/21/2010   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Statement of Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment 
7/20/2010  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  7/21/2010   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 
7/13/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  7/16/2010   
7/13/2010  ANS - Answer  7/22/2010   
NOTE: PAID 
6/29/2010  ANS - Answer  7/8/2010   
NOTE: PAID 
6/29/2010  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/12/2010   
NOTE: FREDERICK ASPEY SERVED 06/22/2010 
6/29/2010  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  7/6/2010   
6/25/2010  ANS - Answer  7/14/2010   
NOTE: PAID 
6/8/2010  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  6/8/2010   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service Theresa A Lee and J.L 06/04/2010 
6/2/2010  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  6/2/2010   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service Immaculate Conception Roman Catholic Parish Cottonwood 06/01/10 
6/2/2010  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  6/2/2010   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix 06/01/2010 
5/24/2010  COM - Complaint  5/26/2010   
5/24/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/26/2010   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
8/27/2010  F:Encompass Insurance Company    One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: Theresa A Lee         
  A: J L Lee         
  A: Maxwell Rollin Pelton Jr.         
  A: Roman Catholic Church Of The Diocese Of Phoenix, The         
  A: Immaculate Conception Roman Catholic Parish Cottonwood         
click here for Law Library Resource Center