« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-031989
Judge:
Viola, Danielle
File Date:
11/17/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil

Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
H K Real Estate L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Michael Curran
Party Name
Lynn Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2011
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2011
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
3/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2011
Description
530 - ME: Case Designated for Mandatory E-Filing
Docket Date
2/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/21/2011
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
1/6/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
12/16/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/7/2010
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/13/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYNN HEMPHILL AND JOHN DOE HEMPHILL 11/18/2010
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYNN HEMPHILL 11/18/2010
Filing Date
11/17/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/19/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.