Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-028870 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 10/14/2010 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Federal National Mortgage Association   Plaintiff    Matthew Silverman 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/28/2010  JFD - Judgment Forcible Detainer  11/10/2010   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
10/28/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/10/2010   
NOTE: SABIN AND JANE DOE BURRELL 10/14/2010 
10/18/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  10/26/2010   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL AND JANE DOE BURRELL OR CURRENT OCCUPANT SERVED 10/14/10 
10/18/2010  SUM - Summons  10/25/2010   
10/14/2010  COM - Complaint  10/15/2010   
10/14/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  10/15/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/28/2010  13:30  Forcible Detainer Hearing 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
10/28/2010  F:Federal National Mortgage Association    One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: Sabin Burrell