« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-028864
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
10/13/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Alliance Bank Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Craig Ganz
Party Name
Sur-Way Concrete Construction Co Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert M Beaudry
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Barbara S Beaudry
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V, U S A, L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
B R V Properties L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Main Street L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gregory A Harrington
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Peter Workum
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry Revocable Trust Dated November 4, 2002 As Amended, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING RECEIVERS FINAL REPORT TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP AND DISMISSING PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
2/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Motion for Entry of Order (I) Approving Receivers Final Report, (II) Terminating Receivership, and (III) Dismissing Proceedings
Filing Date
2/11/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Entry of Order Terminating Receivership and Dismissal of Proceedings
Filing Date
2/2/2011
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Lack of Service
Filing Date
1/19/2011
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2010
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2010
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
12/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OATH OF RECEIVER
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
OAR - Order Appointing Receiver
Docket Date
12/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/24/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of No Objection To Application For Appointment Of Receiver And Lodging Of [Proposed] Order
Filing Date
11/12/2010
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
11/12/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2010
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/25/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Service Regarding Order To Show Cause
Filing Date
10/19/2010
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
10/25/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/14/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
10/13/2010
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
10/14/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPENDIX OF LOAN AND RELATED DOCUMENTS SUPPORTING COMPLAINT OF ALLIANCE AGAINST THE BEAUDRY DEFENDANTS AND THE BUYING GROUP DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
10/13/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/14/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/9/2010
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
12/13/2010
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.