Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-022802 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 7/29/2010 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Stearns Bank National Association   Plaintiff    Richard Chambliss 
N G S B, L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Nicholas R Glimcher   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/21/2011  DFJ - Default Judgment  3/28/2011   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
3/17/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/17/2011   
3/9/2011  APL - Application  3/10/2011   
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 
3/9/2011  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  3/10/2011   
NOTE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS 
3/9/2011  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  3/10/2011   
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS 
3/9/2011  SOC - Statement Of Costs  3/10/2011   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF COSTS 
2/11/2011  ADE - Application For Default  2/11/2011   
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
2/7/2011  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  2/11/2011   
NOTE: SABIN L BURRELL SERVED 1/10/11 
1/12/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/19/2011   
NOTE: SABIN L BURRELL SERVED 01/10/11 
1/12/2011  SUM - Summons  1/18/2011   
1/6/2011  ORD - Order  1/6/2011   
NOTE: ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE 
1/5/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  1/5/2011   
1/5/2011  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  1/5/2011   
1/5/2011  MOT - Motion  1/5/2011   
NOTE: RENEWED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 
12/17/2010  MOT - Motion  12/17/2010   
NOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON DEFENDANT 
11/29/2010  OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service  11/29/2010   
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE UNTIL 2-14-2011 AS TO SABIN L BURRELL 
11/24/2010  MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service  11/24/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE 
11/23/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/7/2010   
NOTE: NGSB LLC SERVED 11/21/10 
11/23/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/7/2010   
NOTE: NICHOLAS R GLIMCHER 11/21/2010 
11/23/2010  SUM - Summons  11/30/2010   
11/23/2010  SUM - Summons  11/30/2010   
11/3/2010  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  11/3/2010   
7/29/2010  COM - Complaint  8/2/2010   
7/29/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  8/2/2010   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/21/2011  F:Stearns Bank National Association  $922.14  One Time  Costs   
  A: N G S B, L L C         
  A: Nicholas R Glimcher         
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
3/21/2011  F:Stearns Bank National Association  $2,590.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: N G S B, L L C         
  A: Nicholas R Glimcher         
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
3/21/2011  F:Stearns Bank National Association  $46,189.50  One Time  Interest   
  A: N G S B, L L C         
  A: Nicholas R Glimcher         
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
3/21/2011  F:Stearns Bank National Association  $475,379.09  One Time  Principal   
  A: N G S B, L L C         
  A: Nicholas R Glimcher         
  A: Sabin L Burrell