« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-020927
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
7/7/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arizona Early Childhood Development And Health Board
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Rhonda Barnes
Party Name
Kirk Adams
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Robert Burns
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Jorge Luis Garcia
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Linda Gray
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Chuck Gray
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Linda Lopez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Richard Miranda
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Thayer Verschoor
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Chad Campbell
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Steve Farley
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
David Lujan
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
John McComish
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Andrew Tobin
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Steve Yarbrough
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Braun
Party Name
Ken Bennett
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Carrie Brennan
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2010
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2010
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
7/16/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/19/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer To Plaintiffs Application for Order to Show Cause and Memorandum in Support and Verified Complaint for Special Action / CO-CHG Receipt #20708908
Filing Date
7/15/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Ken Bennetts Answer to Plaintiffs Verified Complaint for Special Action
Filing Date
7/15/2010
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/16/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Ken Bennetts Response to Plaintiffs Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
7/15/2010
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/15/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/13/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance - Filing fee
co-chg on receipt #20699922
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RICHARD MIRANDA SERVED 07/07/2010
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
LINDA LOPEZ SERVED 07/07/2010
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEVE YARBROUGH SERVED 07/07/2010
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANDREW TOBIN 07/07/2010
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAYER VERSCHOOR SERVED 07/07/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEVE FARLEY 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHAD CAMPBELL SERVED 07/07/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN MC COMISH 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
LINDA GRAY 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHUCK GRAY 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
JORGE LUIS GARCIA 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT BURNS 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
KIRK ADAMS 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
KEN BENNETT SERVED 07/07/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID LULAN 7/7/10
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2010
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
7/16/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RHIAN EVANS ALLVIN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
7/7/2010
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/12/2010
Time
11:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/26/2010
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.