« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-018632
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
7/2/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
J P M C Specialty Mortgage L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Party Name
Todd A Jostes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Cami L Jostes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2010
Description
JFD - Judgment Forcible Detainer
Docket Date
8/5/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
7/26/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TODD JOSTES, CAMI L JOSTES SERVED 07/07/10
Filing Date
7/2/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/26/2010
Time
13:30
Event
Forcible Detainer Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/26/2010
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  J P M C Specialty Mortgage L L C
A: Todd A Jostes
Amount
 
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status