« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-017838
Judge:
Viola, Danielle
File Date:
6/10/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jerrell Wayne Brooks
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Huntwork
Party Name
Sharon Spane
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Ken Bennett
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Barbara Bailey
Party Name
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Fulton Brock
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Don Stapley
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Andrew Kunasek
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Max Wilson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mary Rose Wilcox
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Helen Purcell
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
6/26/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2012
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/12/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2010
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
6/25/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2010
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/25/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2010
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2010
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
6/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2010
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
7/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2010
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
6/28/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND OFFICERS AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE / SHARON SPANE SERVED VIA FIRST CLASS MAIL 06/10/2010
Filing Date
6/14/2010
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
6/16/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/14/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearances / CO-CHG Receipt #20634209
Filing Date
6/10/2010
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
6/16/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE COMPLAINT NOMINATION PETITION CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO ARS 16-351
Filing Date
6/10/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/10/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/10/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/17/2010
Time
8:00
Event
Election Challenge
Date
6/18/2010
Time
15:00
Event
Election Challenge
Date
6/21/2010
Time
11:30
Event
Election Challenge
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.