« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-003106 Judge: Gama, J. Richard
File Date: 2/2/2010 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Keith Deering   Plaintiff  Male  Paul Conant 
Mark Renberg   Plaintiff  Male  Paul Conant 
Chris Lombardo   Plaintiff  Male  Paul Conant 
Cheyenne Mountain Entertainment Inc   Plaintiff    Paul Conant 
Gary Whiting   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Vicki Whiting   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Garrick Properties L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Garvick Enterprises L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Fred Gagon   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Margaret Gagon   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Tree L L C, The   Defendant    Pro Per 
Ira Gagon   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Income Properties L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Vista Ridge I & I I, L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Robert Guenther   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Jaffa Partners   Defendant    Pro Per 
Todd Ellering   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
T A E Technologies Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
John Bellrose   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Jeff Hall   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Rob McKell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Nedra Roney McKell   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
M M O G U L S Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Gary Henrie   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Imran Safiulla   Defendant  Male  Gregory McGill 
Cheyenne Mountain Games Inc   Plaintiff    Lance Broberg 
Kayla Hall   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Paula Henrie   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Samuel Dalembert   Intervenor  Male  MARK DEATHERAGE 
David Roberts   Intervenor  Male  MARK DEATHERAGE 
Hetal Shah   Intervenor  Male  MARK DEATHERAGE 
Lowell Anderson   Endorsement Case  Male  Paul Conant 
Karl Hiatt   Endorsement Case  Male  Paul Conant 
Empire Enterprises Unlimited L L C   Endorsement Case    Pro Per 
Timothy Jensen   Endorsement Case  Male  Robert Royal 
Garrick Enterprises Llc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Mary Jenson   Defendant  Female  Robert Royal 
Morris C Aaron   Receiver  Male  Donald Ennis 
M C A Financial Group Ltd   Receiver    Christopher Bayley 
Dale B Murphy   Claimant  Male  Richard Thomas 
Nancy Murphy   Claimant  Female  Richard Thomas 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/29/2015  NOT - Notice  6/29/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MAY 2015 
6/26/2015  NOT - Notice  6/29/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MARCH 2015 
4/14/2015  NOT - Notice  4/15/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MARCH 2015 
3/11/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  3/11/2015   
NOTE: FOR EXHIBITS 
3/10/2015  NOT - Notice  3/11/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February 2015 
3/3/2015  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  3/3/2015   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
3/3/2015  AIX - Appeals Index  3/3/2015   
NOTE: AMENDED 
2/17/2015  NOT - Notice  2/18/2015   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in January 2015 
2/12/2015  MEM - Memorandum  2/17/2015   
NOTE: RECORD ON APPEAL - REQUEST FOR POST-TRANSMISSION FILINGS 
1/16/2015  NOT - Notice  1/20/2015   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN DECEMBER 2014 
12/30/2014  NOT - Notice  12/30/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN NOVEMBER 2014 
11/12/2014  NOT - Notice  11/13/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in October 2014 
9/17/2014  NOT - Notice  9/18/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN AUGUST 2014 
8/26/2014  NOT - Notice  8/27/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN JULY 2014 
7/23/2014  NOT - Notice  7/24/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN JUNE 2014 
7/21/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  7/22/2014   
7/21/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  7/22/2014   
7/15/2014  LET - Letter  7/15/2014   
7/11/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  7/14/2014   
7/10/2014  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  7/14/2014   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION 
7/10/2014  AIX - Appeals Index  7/14/2014   
6/24/2014  ORD - Order  6/27/2014   
NOTE: DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR 
6/20/2014  NOT - Notice  6/20/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MAY 2014 
6/10/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  6/10/2014   
6/9/2014  CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement  6/10/2014   
NOTE: HETAL SHAH, M.D.’S CIVIL APPEALS DOCKETING STATEMENT 
5/30/2014  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  6/17/2014   
NOTE: MARK DEATHERAGE/$500.00 
5/30/2014  REP - Report  5/30/2014   
NOTE: Status Report in Lieu of Joint Pre-Trial Statement 
5/27/2014  NOT - Notice  6/2/2014   
NOTE: OF CORRECTED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF DEBTOR(S) 
5/23/2014  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  5/27/2014   
NOTE: Hetal Shah, M.D.'s Notice of Appeal / efile billing $619 
5/20/2014  NOT - Notice  5/20/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in April 2014 
4/30/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  5/1/2014   
4/29/2014  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/29/2014   
4/28/2014  ORD - Order  5/1/2014   
NOTE: GRANTINT RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH LIQUIDATION PLAN 
4/22/2014  NOT - Notice  4/22/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MARCH 2014 
3/31/2014  NOT - Notice  4/1/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February 2014 
3/27/2014  314 - ME: Bankruptcy  3/27/2014   
3/24/2014  NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy  3/27/2014   
3/6/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  3/7/2014   
3/5/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  3/6/2014   
2/21/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  2/24/2014   
2/19/2014  NOT - Notice  2/19/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in January, 2014 
2/14/2014  NOT - Notice  2/14/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER’S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF, AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH, LIQUIDATION PLAN 
2/7/2014  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  2/7/2014   
2/7/2014  NOT - Notice  2/7/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
2/7/2014  NOT - Notice  2/7/2014   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
1/30/2014  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  1/30/2014   
1/29/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  1/30/2014   
1/29/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  1/30/2014   
1/23/2014  NOT - Notice  1/23/2014   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN DECEMBER, 2013 
1/16/2014  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  1/16/2014   
1/3/2014  REL - Reply  1/3/2014   
NOTE: REPLY TO RECEIVER’S AND HIATTS’ RESPONSE TO SHAH’S PARTIAL OBJECTION TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTION OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
1/3/2014  MOT - Motion  1/3/2014   
NOTE: EXPEDITED PROCEDURAL MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JANUARY 9, 2014 ORAL ARGUMENT 
12/31/2013  RES - Response  12/31/2013   
NOTE: Intervenors' Response to Objections of Timothy N. Jenson and Dale and Nancy Murphy to Receiver's Petition for Further Instructions Including Authorization to Make Distribution of Receivership Funds 
12/27/2013  REL - Reply  12/27/2013   
NOTE: OMNIBUS REPLY TO RESPONSES TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS Hearing on Petition DATE: Thursday, January 9, 2014 TIME: 3:00 p.m. PLACE: Maricopa County Superior Court, Courtroom 701 201 W. Jefferson Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2243 
12/27/2013  RES - Response  12/27/2013   
NOTE: Karl and Diana Hiatt's Response to the Objection of Timothy N. Jenson to Receiver's Petition for Further Instructions, Including Authorization to Make Distribution of Receivership Funds 
12/27/2013  NOT - Notice  12/30/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING KARL AND DIANA HIATT'S RESPONSE TO HETAL SHAH M.D.'S PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO RECEIVER'S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTION OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
12/26/2013  NOT - Notice  12/26/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN NOVEMBER, 2013 
12/24/2013  RES - Response  12/24/2013   
NOTE: KARL AND DIANA HIATT’S RESPONSE TO HETAL SHAH M.D.’S PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTION OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
12/24/2013  RES - Response  12/24/2013   
NOTE: KARL AND DIANA HIATT'S RESPONSE TO THE OBJECTION OF DALE B. AND NANCY MURPHY TO RECEIVER'S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTION OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
12/9/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  12/10/2013   
NOTE: Objection of Timothy N. Jenson to Receiver's Petition for Further Instructions, Including Authorization to Make Distributions of Receivership Funds 
12/9/2013  RES - Response  12/10/2013   
NOTE: Intervenors' Response in Support of Receiver's Petition for Further Instructions Including Authorization to Make Distribution of Receivership Funds 
12/9/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  12/10/2013   
NOTE: Hetal Shah, M.D.'s Partial Opposition to Receiver's Petition for Further Instructions Including Authorization to Make Distribution of Receivership Funds 
12/9/2013  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  12/10/2013   
12/9/2013  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  12/10/2013   
NOTE: OBJECTION OF DALE B. AND NANCY MURPHY TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
12/5/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  12/6/2013   
11/22/2013  NOT - Notice  11/22/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in October, 2013 
11/22/2013  RES - Response  11/25/2013   
NOTE: RESPONSE RE: NO OBJECTION TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS 
11/15/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/15/2013   
11/15/2013  PTT - Petition  11/15/2013   
NOTE: RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
11/15/2013  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  11/15/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
11/15/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/15/2013   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF: (1) RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS AND (2) NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER’S PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS, INCLUDING AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE DISTRIBUTIONS OF RECEIVERSHIP FUNDS 
10/21/2013  NOT - Notice  10/21/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in September, 2013 
9/23/2013  NOT - Notice  9/23/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in August, 2013 
8/26/2013  NOT - Notice  8/27/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN JULY, 2013 
8/21/2013  NOT - Notice  8/21/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in May, 2013 
8/8/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/10/2013   
8/8/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/10/2013   
8/6/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/8/2013   
7/24/2013  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  7/24/2013   
7/22/2013  NOT - Notice  7/22/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in June, 2013 
7/10/2013  NMR - Not Of Filing Monthly Report  7/11/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Status Report Dated June 30, 2013 
6/11/2013  NOT - Notice  6/11/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM CONTACT INFORMATION 
5/23/2013  NOT - Notice  5/23/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in April, 2013 
4/24/2013  NOT - Notice  4/24/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in March, 2013 
3/22/2013  NOT - Notice  3/25/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February, 2013 
2/26/2013  NOT - Notice  2/27/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in January, 2013 
2/4/2013  NOT - Notice  2/5/2013   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN DECEMBER, 2012 
1/16/2013  029 - ME: Status Conference  1/16/2013   
1/3/2013  NOF - Notice Of Filing  1/3/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Status Report Dated December 26, 2012 
12/17/2012  NOT - Notice  12/17/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In November, 2012 
12/17/2012  NOT - Notice  12/18/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In October, 2012 
12/11/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed  12/11/2012   
12/6/2012  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  12/6/2012   
12/4/2012  ORD - Order  12/10/2012   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING THE ADVANCEMENT OF COSTS OF DEFENSE UNDER D & O INSURANCE POLICY 
11/26/2012  STP - Stipulation  11/26/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATION OF JENSON AND RECEIVER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ADVANCEMENT OF COSTS OF DEFENSE UNDER D&O INSURANCE POLICY 
10/30/2012  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  10/30/2012   
10/24/2012  NOT - Notice  10/24/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in September, 2012 
10/15/2012  REL - Reply  10/16/2012   
NOTE: Joint Reply in Support of Motion for Order Authorizing the Advancement of Costs of Defense Under D&O Insurance Policy 
10/1/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/1/2012   
NOTE: RECEIVER’S LIMITED OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ADVANCEMENT OF COSTS OF DEFENSE UNDER D&O INSURANCE POLICY 
10/1/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/2/2012   
NOTE: Opposition to Motion for Order Authorizing the Advancement of Costs of Defense Under D&O Insurance Policy 
9/19/2012  NOT - Notice  9/20/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in August, 2012 
9/10/2012  MOT - Motion  9/11/2012   
NOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ADVANCEMENT OF COSTS OF DEFENSE UNDER D&O INSURANCE POLICY 
8/27/2012  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  8/27/2012   
8/24/2012  NOT - Notice  8/27/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In July, 2012 
8/23/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/23/2012   
8/20/2012  NOT - Notice  8/20/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in June, 2012 
8/10/2012  029 - ME: Status Conference  8/10/2012   
8/10/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  8/10/2012   
7/27/2012  REL - Reply  7/27/2012   
NOTE: TIMOTHY JENSON’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
7/26/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  7/27/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Opposition to Timothy Jenson's Motion to Consolidate 
7/26/2012  MOT - Motion  7/27/2012   
NOTE: JENSON’S RULE 60(C) MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDERS 
7/25/2012  RES - Response  7/26/2012   
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Timothy Jenson's Motion to Consolidate 
7/23/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/24/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Exhibit to Notice of Filing Transcript of March 23, 2012 Oral Argument 
7/23/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/25/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Transcript of March 23, 2012 Argument 
7/18/2012  MEM - Memorandum  7/19/2012   
NOTE: Joint Status Memorandum 
7/16/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  7/17/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MAY 2012 
7/11/2012  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  7/11/2012   
NOTE: TIMOTHY JENSON'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
6/28/2012  ORD - Order  7/10/2012   
NOTE: GRANTING RECEIVERS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH LIQUIDATION PLAN 
6/27/2012  REL - Reply  6/28/2012   
NOTE: RECEIVER’S REPLY TO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN APRIL, 2012 
6/26/2012  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel  6/26/2012   
6/26/2012  NOT - Notice  6/26/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in May, 2012 
6/25/2012  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  7/13/2012   
6/20/2012  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  6/20/2012   
6/20/2012  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  6/20/2012   
6/15/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  6/15/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN APRIL 2012 
6/8/2012  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  6/11/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL 
6/7/2012  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  6/7/2012   
6/4/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/4/2012   
5/25/2012  NOT - Notice  5/25/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in April, 2012 
5/16/2012  RQH - Request For Hearing  5/17/2012   
NOTE: Request for Hearing on Timothy Jenson's Objections to Receiver's Notices of Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. 
5/16/2012  REL - Reply  5/17/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Reply to Objection to Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in March, 2012 
5/7/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/8/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN MARCH 2012 
4/20/2012  REL - Reply  4/20/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Reply to Objection to Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred By MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February, 2012 
4/17/2012  NOT - Notice  4/17/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in March, 2012 
4/9/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  4/10/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN FEBRUARY 2012 
3/27/2012  LET - Letter  4/13/2012   
3/27/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  3/27/2012   
3/21/2012  REL - Reply  3/21/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Reply to Objection to Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in January 2012 
3/19/2012  NOT - Notice  3/20/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February, 2012 
3/13/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  3/14/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RECEIVER’S INTENT TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN JANUARY 2012 
3/1/2012  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  3/1/2012   
NOTE: ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice 
2/29/2012  NOT - Notice  3/1/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Receiver's Intent to Pay Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In January, 2012 
2/29/2012  REL - Reply  3/1/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Reply to Objection to Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in December, 2011 
2/28/2012  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  2/29/2012   
NOTE: Stipulation to Enter Judgment Dismissing Case No. CV2010-025559 with Prejudice 
2/23/2012  ORD - Order  2/23/2012   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE AND FILE REPLY TO OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN DECEMBER, 2011 
2/14/2012  STP - Stipulation  2/14/2012   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Serve and File Reply to Objection to Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in December, 2011 
2/7/2012  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  2/7/2012   
2/3/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/6/2012   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. IN DECEMBER, 2011 
2/1/2012  MOT - Motion  2/2/2012   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
2/1/2012  REL - Reply  2/2/2012   
NOTE: JENSON’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT LITIGATION STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT 
1/24/2012  022 - ME: Order Signed  1/24/2012   
1/23/2012  ORD - Order  2/2/2012   
NOTE: EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT LITIGATION STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT 
1/23/2012  ORD - Order  2/2/2012   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION 1 TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE AND FILE REPLY TO JENSONS RESPONSE TO RECEIVERS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH LIQUIDATION PLAN AND II TO REQUEST ORAL ARGUMENT ON CONTESTED MOTION 
1/23/2012  ORD - Order  2/2/2012   
NOTE: GRANTING RECEIVERS REQUEST FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE COMBINED RESPONSE AND REPLY TO TIMOTHY JENSON PLEADINGS AND FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS 
1/23/2012  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  3/14/2012   
1/18/2012  MOT - Motion  1/18/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT LITIGATION STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT 
1/13/2012  NOF - Notice Of Filing  1/13/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In December, 2011 
1/6/2012  REQ - Request  1/9/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's Request for Authorization to File Combined Response and Reply to Timothy Jenson Pleadings and For Leave to Exceed Page Limits 
1/6/2012  RES - Response  1/9/2012   
NOTE: Edward M. Burr, Jr.'s Joinder with Receiver's (I) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Complaint; and (II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Receiver's Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
1/6/2012  RES - Response  1/9/2012   
NOTE: Receiver's (I) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Complaint; and (II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Receiver's Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
1/6/2012  RES - Response  1/9/2012   
NOTE: Intervenors' I) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Complaint; and II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Reciever's Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed With, Liquidation Plan 
1/6/2012  DCL - Declaration  1/10/2012   
NOTE: Declaration of Wade M. Burgeson in Support of Receiver's (I) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Cmplt; and (II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Rcvrs Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
1/6/2012  DCL - Declaration  1/10/2012   
NOTE: Declaration of J. Dale Belt in Support of Receiver's (i) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Complaint; and (II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Rcvrs Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
1/6/2012  DCL - Declaration  1/10/2012   
NOTE: Declaration of Edward M. Burr, Jr. in Support of Rcvrs (I) Response to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to file Cmplt; and (II) Reply to Jenson's Response to Rcvrs Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
12/22/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  12/22/2011   
12/21/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  12/21/2011   
12/20/2011  STP - Stipulation  12/21/2011   
NOTE: STIPULATION (I) TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE AND FILE REPLY TO JENSON’S RESPONSE TO RECEIVER’S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF, AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH, LIQUIDATION PLAN; AND (II) TO REQUEST ORAL ARGUMENT ON CONTESTED MOTION 
12/20/2011  ORD - Order  12/27/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE AND FILE ANSWERING MEMORANDUM TO MOTION TO LIFT LITIGATION STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT 
12/20/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  12/20/2011   
12/19/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  12/20/2011   
NOTE: Amended Motion to Withraw with Consent 
12/16/2011  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  12/16/2011   
12/14/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  12/14/2011   
12/13/2011  STP - Stipulation  12/13/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Serve and File Answering Memorandum to Motion to Lift Litigation Stay and for Leave to File Complaint 
12/13/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  12/14/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw With Consent 
12/12/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  12/13/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In November, 2011 
12/12/2011  RES - Response  12/13/2011   
NOTE: JENSON’S RESPONSE TO RECEIVER’S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF, AND AUTHORIZATION TO PROCEED WITH, LIQUIDATION PLAN 
12/9/2011  MOT - Motion  12/12/2011   
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE 
11/30/2011  MOT - Motion  11/30/2011   
NOTE: MOTION TO LIFT LITIGATION STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT 
11/21/2011  CRT - Certification Of Mailing  11/22/2011   
NOTE: Certificate of Service of Receiver's Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
11/21/2011  CRT - Certification Of Mailing  11/22/2011   
NOTE: Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry of Order Establishing Procedures and Deadline (Bar Date) for Submitting Claims Against Receivership Estate 
11/18/2011  NOT - Notice  11/18/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Entry of Order Establishing Procedures and Deadline (Bar Date) for Submitting Claims Against Receivership Estate 
11/18/2011  MOT - Motion  11/18/2011   
NOTE: Receiver's Motion for Approval of, and Authorization to Proceed with, Liquidation Plan 
11/15/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  11/15/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In October, 2011 
10/19/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/19/2011   
10/19/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  10/19/2011   
10/17/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/17/2011   
10/17/2011  ORD - Order  10/25/2011   
NOTE: ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES AND DEALDINE BAR DATE FOR SUBMITTING CLAIMS AGAINST RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE 
10/14/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  10/17/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application For Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, LTD, in September, 2011 
10/10/2011  NOT - Notice  10/11/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL 
10/5/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  10/5/2011   
10/5/2011  CRT - Certification Of Mailing  10/6/2011   
NOTE: Certificate of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. 
9/26/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/30/2011   
9/23/2011  REL - Reply  9/23/2011   
NOTE: Receiver's Reply to Objection by Gary Whiting and CME/CMG Boards To The Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Timothy and Mary Jenson Re Dark Comet Lawsuit 
9/23/2011  REL - Reply  9/26/2011   
NOTE: Timothy and Mary Jenson's Reply to Objection by Whiting and CME/CMG Boards to Receiver's Proposed Settlement with the Jensons re Dark Commet Matter and Request for Hearing 
9/22/2011  REL - Reply  9/23/2011   
NOTE: The Roberts Group's Reply to The Objection to Receiver's Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement with Timothy and Mary Jenson re Dark Comet Lawsuit 
9/16/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  9/16/2011   
9/14/2011  ORD - Order  9/21/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO REPLY TO OBJECTION TO RECEIVERS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH TIMOTHY AND MARY JENSON RE DARK COMET LAWSUIT 
9/13/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/14/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application For Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA financial Group, Ltd. In August 2011 
9/1/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/1/2011   
9/1/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  9/1/2011   
NOTE: OBJECTION BY WHITING AND CME CMG BOARDS TO RECEIVERS PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE JENSONS REGARDING DARK COMET MATTER AND REQUEST FOR HEARING 
9/1/2011  STP - Stipulation  9/2/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Reply to Objection to Receiver's Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreement with Timothy and Mary Jensen Re Dark Comet Lawsuit 
8/30/2011  MOT - Motion  8/31/2011   
NOTE: Receiver's Motion For Order Establishing Procedures and Deadline (Bar Date) For Submitting Claims Against Receivership Estate 
8/23/2011  STP - Stipulation  8/24/2011   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR BOARDS TO OBJECT TO RECEIVERS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH TIMOTHY AND MARY JENSON RE DARK COMET LAWSUIT 
8/11/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/11/2011   
8/10/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/11/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Fililng Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in July, 2011 
8/5/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/5/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Operating Report and Status Update for Activities From May 1, 2011 through June 30, 2011 
8/2/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/3/2011   
NOTE: Objection to Receiver Settlement with Jenson and Request for Review and Comment 
7/29/2011  CER - Certificate  7/29/2011   
NOTE: Certificate of No Response or Opposition to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Timothy and Mary Jenson Re Dark Comet Lawsuit, and Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Motion 
7/14/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/15/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. In June, 2011 
7/12/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  7/12/2011   
7/11/2011  MOT - Motion  7/11/2011   
NOTE: Receiver's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement With Timothy and Mary Jenson Re Dark Comet Lawsuit 
6/15/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  6/16/2011   
NOTE: Notice of filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA financial Group, Ltd. in May, 2011 
6/7/2011  REP - Report  6/7/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Operating Report and Status Update From November 8, 2010 through April 30, 2011 
5/20/2011  NOT - Notice  5/20/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd., In April, 2011 
5/3/2011  ANS - Answer  5/3/2011   
NOTE: Timothy and Mary Jenson's Answer to the First Amended Verified Complaint; Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint 
4/20/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/20/2011   
4/19/2011  ORD - Order  4/25/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING THE STIPULATION 
4/15/2011  NOT - Notice  4/18/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application For Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in March, 2011 
4/13/2011  STP - Stipulation  4/13/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Jenson to Answer First Amended Complaint 
3/28/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  3/28/2011   
3/25/2011  ORD - Order  3/31/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING THE STIPULATION 
3/16/2011  NOT - Notice  3/17/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in February, 2011 
3/14/2011  STP - Stipulation  3/14/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Jenson to Answer First Amended Complaint 
3/9/2011  022 - ME: Order Signed  3/9/2011   
3/8/2011  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  3/8/2011   
3/8/2011  ORD - Order  3/17/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING THE STIPULATION 
3/8/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/8/2011   
2/21/2011  NOT - Notice  2/22/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application For Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in January, 2011 
2/15/2011  PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing  2/16/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Mailing 
2/14/2011  NOT - Notice  2/14/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Exhibit to Notice of Filing Cover sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, LTD. in December, 2010 
2/14/2011  STP - Stipulation  2/14/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Jenson to Answer First Amended Complaint 
2/4/2011  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  2/4/2011   
2/3/2011  OAR - Order Appointing Receiver  2/14/2011   
NOTE: AMENDED 
2/3/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  2/3/2011   
2/2/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  2/2/2011   
1/28/2011  STP - Stipulation  1/28/2011   
NOTE: Stipulation to Entry of Revised Amended Receivership Order in Resolution of Objections to Proposed Amended Receivership Order 
1/24/2011  REL - Reply  1/25/2011   
NOTE: Timothy and Mary Jensons Reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Verified Complaint (Rule 12(b)(6)) 
1/18/2011  NOT - Notice  1/18/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application for Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. in December, 2010 
1/10/2011  RES - Response  1/11/2011   
NOTE: Derivative Plaintiffs Response to Jensons Motion to Dismiss 
1/6/2011  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  1/6/2011   
1/3/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  1/4/2011   
NOTE: Objections to Proposed Amended Receivership Order 
12/30/2010  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  12/30/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness 
12/17/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  12/22/2010   
NOTE: THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT 
12/15/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  12/15/2010   
12/13/2010  ORD - Order  12/21/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING RECEIVERS MOTION I FOR DISCHARGE OF RECEIVER AND HIS COUNCEL II TO APPROVE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND III FOR EXONERATION OF THE RECEIVERS SURETY 
12/13/2010  ORD - Order  12/17/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
12/13/2010  NOT - Notice  12/13/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Cover Sheet Application For Fees and Expenses Incurred by MCA Financial Group, Ltd., in October and November 2010 
12/10/2010  ORD - Order  12/20/2010   
NOTE: WAIVING THE COMPLEX LITIGATION FEES AS THEY PERTAIN TO DEFENDANTS HARDEN IN THE ABOVE MATTER 
12/10/2010  MOT - Motion  12/10/2010   
NOTE: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN AMENDED RECEIVERSHIP ORDER 
12/3/2010  AFD - Affidavit On Default  12/6/2010   
NOTE: Affidavit for Entry of Default re Jensons 
12/3/2010  ADE - Application For Default  12/6/2010   
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default re Jensons 
11/24/2010  NOT - Notice  11/24/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Order 
11/19/2010  NOT - Notice  11/22/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Order 
11/18/2010  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel  11/18/2010   
11/16/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  11/16/2010   
11/16/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  11/23/2010   
11/15/2010  MOT - Motion  11/18/2010   
NOTE: TO WAIVE COMPLEX LITIGATION FEE FOR DEFENDANTS WENDI HARDEN AND WILLIAM SKIP HARDEN 
11/15/2010  MOT - Motion  11/16/2010   
NOTE: Motion for Approval of Receivers Deposit of Tax Credit Proceeds 
11/15/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/16/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/15/2010  MEM - Memorandum  11/16/2010   
NOTE: Joint Memorandum 
11/15/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/15/2010   
11/15/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/15/2010   
11/12/2010  WSH - Worksheet  11/24/2010   
11/11/2010  MOT - Motion  11/12/2010   
NOTE: Burrs Motion to Strike: Boards Objection to Accounting and Burrs Response to: Boards Motion for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 
11/10/2010  RES - Response  11/12/2010   
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Motion for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 
11/10/2010  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  11/26/2010   
NOTE: ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WENDI HARDIN AND WILLIAM SKIP HARDIN 
11/9/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/10/2010   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO ACCOUNTING: NO BILLING OR COST DATA WAS INTRODUCED INTO EVIDENCE AT HEARING TO SUPPORT TENS OF THOUSANDS IN PAYMENTS TO SIERRA JENSON DARK COMET AND BUGESONS FIRM; MOTION FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW 
11/8/2010  NOT - Notice  11/8/2010   
NOTE: Notice of withdrawal of Objections of Tim Jenson 
11/8/2010  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/8/2010   
11/8/2010  ORD - Order  11/22/2010   
NOTE: THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS THIS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN DAVID ROBERTS SAM DALEMBERT AND HETAL SHAH MD AND DARK COMET GAMES LLC FRESH START STUDIOS LLC AND KARL AND DIANA HIATT WHICH WAS SIGNED ONTO THE REVIEWED APPROVED AND CONSENTED TO BY THE RECEIVER EDWARD BURR SUBJECT TO COURT APPROVAL 
11/8/2010  BON - Bond  11/16/2010   
NOTE: $10,000.00 FOR MCA FINANCIAL GROUP LTD BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY 
11/8/2010  NOT - Notice  11/10/2010   
NOTE: OATH OF RECEIVER 
11/7/2010  MOT - Motion  11/8/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Take Witnesses Out of Order and to Schedule Testimony and Motion for Expedited Consideration 
11/5/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/8/2010   
NOTE: OBJECTION BY CME AND CMG TO PROPOSED ORDER 
11/5/2010  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  11/8/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw 
11/3/2010  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  11/3/2010   
11/3/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/8/2010   
NOTE: STIPULATED/CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WENDI HARDIN AND WILLIAM SKIP HARDIN 
11/3/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/4/2010   
NOTE: OBJECTION BY CME AND CMG TO THE JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN HIATT AND ROBERTS 
11/2/2010  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  11/10/2010   
NOTE: PAID 
11/2/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/2/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/2/2010  RES - Response  11/2/2010   
NOTE: Response to Joint Motion for Approval of Return of Assets to Receiver and Approval of Indebtedness for CME/CMG Pursuant to Settlement Agreement 
11/2/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/2/2010   
10/29/2010  ORD - Order  11/5/2010   
NOTE: THAT ANY RESPONSE OR OBJECTION TO ANY OF THE ABOVE DESCRIBED PENDING MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 3 2010 AT 5:00 PM 
10/28/2010  REQ - Request  10/28/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Request for Ruling on: Receivers Motion (I) For Discharge of Receiver and His Counsel, (II) To Approve Final Accounting; and (III) For Exoneration of the Receivers Surety; and Updated Final Accounting 
10/28/2010  MOT - Motion  10/28/2010   
NOTE: Supplement and Addendum to Joint Motion for Approval of Return of Assets to Receiver and Approval of Indebtedness for CME/CMG Pursuant to Settlement Agreement (Omitted Exhibit) 
10/27/2010  MOT - Motion  10/28/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Substitute Receiver and Request for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Shorten Response Time 
10/27/2010  MOT - Motion  10/28/2010   
NOTE: Joint Motion for Approval of Return of Assets to Receiver and Approval of Indebtedness for CME/CMG Pursuant to Settlement Agreement and Request for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Shorten Response Time 
10/20/2010  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  11/1/2010   
10/15/2010  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  10/15/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Lynch 
10/13/2010  053 - ME: Case Consolidation  10/13/2010   
10/13/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/13/2010   
10/12/2010  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  10/12/2010   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS 
10/12/2010  NOT - Notice  10/12/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Notice of Sale of Tax Credit and Accounting of Disbursements 
10/4/2010  325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation - eFIling Participation  10/4/2010   
10/1/2010  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  10/4/2010   
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID A. RAMEDEN 
9/23/2010  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  9/27/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice, All Claims as Against Defendant Jim Brown, Each Party to Bear Their Own Fees and Costs 
9/16/2010  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  9/20/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice of David A. Rameden 
9/13/2010  STA - Statement  9/14/2010   
NOTE: Position Statement Regarding Complex Track Recommendation 
9/10/2010  REQ - Request  9/13/2010   
NOTE: Request for Postponement of Ruling on Receivers Discharge Motion 
9/10/2010  PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause  9/14/2010   
NOTE: PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AT OCTOBER 6, 2010 HEARING RE: BOARD OF DIRECTORS 
9/9/2010  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  9/10/2010   
NOTE: Motion To Consolidate 
9/9/2010  REQ - Request  9/10/2010   
NOTE: EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR ORDERS OF INSTRUCTION TO RECEIVER TO PAY CRITICAL BILLS USING COLLECTED FUNDS ON HAND IN RECEIVER’S ACCOUNT (i.e., POWER WILL BE TURNED OFF ON MONDAY AND GAME WILL DIE UNLESS SRP BILL IS PAID, LANDLORD WILL EFFECT LOCKOUT AND TAKE POSSESSION OF ASSETS) 
8/25/2010  085 - ME: Conference  8/25/2010   
8/25/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/25/2010   
8/23/2010  MTT - Motion To Transfer  8/25/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Transfer Related Case 
8/18/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/18/2010   
8/18/2010  REL - Reply  8/19/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Reply to the Limited Objections to the Receivers Motion (I) For Discharge of Receiver and His Counsel; (II) To Approve Final Accounting; and (III) For Exoneration of the Receivers Surety 
8/16/2010  MTI – Motion to Intervene  8/16/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO INTERVENE 
8/10/2010  RQH - Request For Hearing  8/10/2010   
NOTE: Request for Expedited Hearing 
8/9/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/10/2010   
NOTE: Whiting and the Boards Partial Objection to Receivers Motion (1) For Discharge, (2) Final Accounting and (3) Exoneration of Surety 
7/30/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  7/30/2010   
NOTE: Partial Objection to Receivers Motion (I) For Discharge of Receiver and his Counsel; (II) to approve final accounting; and (III) for exoneration of the Receivers Surety 
7/20/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing  7/21/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Exhibit "A" to Receivers Motion (I) For Discharge of Receiver and His Counsel; (II) To Approve Final Accounting; and (III) For Exoneration of the Receivers Surety 
7/19/2010  MOT - Motion  7/20/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Motion (I) For Discharge of Receiver and His Counsel; (II) To Approve Final Accounting; and (III) For Exoneration of the Receivers Surety 
6/30/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/13/2010   
NOTE: ROBERT GUENTHER SERVED 03/29/2010 
6/30/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/13/2010   
NOTE: JAFFA PARTNERS LP SERVED 03/29/2010 
6/30/2010  SUM - Summons  7/7/2010   
6/30/2010  SUM - Summons  7/7/2010   
6/4/2010  NOT - Notice  6/5/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Request for Payment of Receivers May 2010 Fees and Costs 
5/25/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  5/25/2010   
5/20/2010  005 - ME: Hearing  5/20/2010   
5/12/2010  STP - Stipulation  5/12/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation and Request to Allow Gary Whiting To Represent Himself Pro Per herein 
5/10/2010  REL - Reply  5/10/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Reply to Response by the Board to Receivers Motion to Validate "JV Agreement" 
5/10/2010  REL - Reply  5/10/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Reply to Objection to Receivers Motion to Determine Validity of "JV Agreement" 
5/5/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/6/2010   
NOTE: Written Objections to Affidavit of Dale Grobois and Accompanying Objections to Receivers Motion to Determine Validity of J.V. Agreement 
5/5/2010  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  5/6/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Todd Ellering Only 
5/5/2010  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  5/6/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Tae Technologies Only 
5/4/2010  NOT - Notice  5/5/2010   
NOTE: Notice Re: Exhibit 3 to the Boards Response to Receivers Request for Determination of Validity of JV Agreement 
5/4/2010  NOT - Notice  5/5/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Request for Payment of Receivers April 2010 Fees and Costs 
5/4/2010  RES - Response  5/5/2010   
NOTE: Response by the Board to Receivers Motion to Validate JV Agreement 
5/4/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/7/2010   
NOTE: TO JOINT VENTURE AGREEMENT 
4/30/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/12/2010   
NOTE: SERVED GARRICK ENTERPRISES LLC 02/17/10 
4/30/2010  SUM - Summons  5/6/2010   
4/30/2010  SUM - Summons  5/6/2010   
4/30/2010  SUM - Summons  5/6/2010   
4/30/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/13/2010   
NOTE: GARVICK PROPERTIES LLC 02/17/10 
4/30/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/13/2010   
NOTE: MMOGULS INC 02/17/2010 
4/29/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  4/29/2010   
4/26/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  4/27/2010   
NOTE: Objection to Receivers Motion to Determine Validity of "JV Agreement" 
4/26/2010  ANS - Answer  5/25/2010  Defendant(27)  
NOTE: PAID 
4/26/2010  ANS - Answer  5/26/2010  Defendant(33)  
4/20/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  4/20/2010   
4/19/2010  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  4/20/2010   
NOTE: Motion to Consolidate 
4/15/2010  NOT - Notice  4/16/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Association As Co-Counsel 
4/14/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  4/14/2010   
4/8/2010  ANS - Answer  4/10/2010   
NOTE: Answer for Chariman of the Board of CME and CMG, Gary and Vicki Whiting, Garvick Properties, LLC, Garrick Enterprises, LLC, Vista Ridge I II, LLC, MMoguls, Inc., and Imran Saffiula 
4/7/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing  4/8/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Receivers Verification to Receivers Request for Expedited Status Conference AND DETERMINATION OF VALIDITY OF PRE-RECEIVERSHIP JOINT VENTURE AGREEMENT 
4/6/2010  REQ - Request  4/7/2010   
NOTE: Receivers Request for Expedited Status Conference and Determination of Validity of Pre-Receivership Joint Venture Agreement 
4/6/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/7/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
4/6/2010  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  4/12/2010   
3/29/2010  SUM - Summons  4/1/2010   
3/29/2010  SUM - Summons  4/1/2010   
3/29/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/2/2010   
NOTE: JEFF HALL AND KAYLA HALL 03/15/2010 
3/29/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/1/2010   
NOTE: GARY HENRIE 03/16/2010 
3/25/2010  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  4/1/2010   
NOTE: AS TO SHANE RUDMAN AND GINA RUDMAN ONLY 
3/18/2010  BON - Bond  3/19/2010  Receiver(31)  
NOTE: $10,000.00/ EDWARD BURR/ FIDELITY & DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND 
3/17/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed  3/17/2010   
3/17/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  3/17/2010   
3/15/2010  OAR - Order Appointing Receiver  3/19/2010   
3/15/2010  ORD - Order  3/23/2010   
NOTE: APPOINTING RECEIEVER 
3/15/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  3/18/2010   
NOTE: STIPULATED/ CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANTS SHANE RUDMAN AND GINA RUDMAN 
3/12/2010  NOT - Notice  3/14/2010   
NOTE: Notice Re: Hourly Rate of Edward ("Ted") Burr 
3/12/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  3/12/2010   
3/11/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/17/2010   
NOTE: T A E TECHNOLOGIES SERVED 2-18-2010 
3/11/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/17/2010   
NOTE: TODD ELLERING SERVED 2-18-2010 
3/11/2010  ANS - Answer  3/15/2010   
NOTE: Answer 
3/10/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  3/11/2010   
NOTE: Objection to Proposed Order Appointing Receiver; and Second Request for Emergency Hearing 
3/10/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  3/16/2010   
3/10/2010  ORD - Order  3/19/2010   
NOTE: THAT APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED ON MARCH 2 2010 SHALL BE WITHDRAWN AGAINST DEFENDANTS HARIND AND DEFENDANTS HARDIN SHALL HAVE AN OPEN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER 
3/9/2010  MOT - Motion  3/11/2010   
NOTE: FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT 
3/9/2010  STP - Stipulation  3/11/2010   
NOTE: EXPEDITED/ TO WITHDRAW APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS WENDY HARDIN AND JOHN DOE HARDIN AND AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWER 
3/9/2010  NOT - Notice  3/10/2010   
NOTE: Notice Re; Limited Vacature of Bankruptcy Stay to Permit State Court to Rule on Plaintiffs Receiver Application 
3/3/2010  SUM - Summons  3/5/2010   
3/3/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  3/3/2010   
3/3/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/5/2010   
NOTE: SHANE RUDMAN SERVED 02/18/10 
3/2/2010  NOT - Notice  3/9/2010   
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
3/2/2010  ADE - Application For Default  3/9/2010   
3/2/2010  AFD - Affidavit On Default  3/9/2010   
3/1/2010  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  3/2/2010   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE “JUSTICE COURT TRANSFER” WITH THIS DIVISION BASED UPON COMMON PLAINTIFFS (CME) AND DEFENDANTS (WHITING) 
3/1/2010  NOT - Notice  3/2/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Errata Re: Motion to Consolidate 
3/1/2010  MOT - Motion  3/2/2010   
NOTE: THE BOARD’S MOTION TO RE-URGE THE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM PLAINTIFF’S CORPORATE TAKEOVER AND “REMOVAL” OF DIRECTOR WHITING; AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING 
2/26/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  2/26/2010   
2/26/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  2/26/2010   
2/25/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/2/2010   
NOTE: VISTA RIDGE I & II 02/18/2010 
2/25/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/2/2010   
NOTE: INCOME PROPERTIES LLC 02/18/2010 
2/25/2010  NOT - Notice  2/26/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Justice Court Order Transferring the Case to this Court 
2/25/2010  NOT - Notice  2/26/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Proposed Receiver 
2/25/2010  NOT - Notice  2/26/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
2/25/2010  RES - Response  2/26/2010   
NOTE: Response to Transfer 
2/25/2010  MOT - Motion  2/27/2010   
NOTE: Defendant Boards Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiffs Violation of the Courts Order of 2/18/10 Prohibiting "The Submitting Party" Re: Proposed Receivers 
2/25/2010  MOT - Motion  2/27/2010   
NOTE: The Boards Second Supplement to Motion For Emergency Relief Re: Lockout and Removal 
2/25/2010  SUM - Summons  3/4/2010   
2/25/2010  SUM - Summons  3/4/2010   
2/24/2010  RES - Response  2/24/2010   
NOTE: Provisional Response to Emergency Motion for Telephonic Conference and For Relief from Plaintiffs Takeover of the Corporate Building and Files and Unlawful Lockout and Removal of Director Whiting 
2/24/2010  MOT - Motion  2/25/2010   
NOTE: The Boards Emergency Supplement Regarding Deerings Removal of CME Employees and Removal of Corporate Equipment 
2/23/2010  MOT - Motion  2/24/2010   
NOTE: The Boards Emergency Motion for Telephonic Conference and For Relief from Plaintiffs Takeover of the Corporate Buildings and Files and Unlawful Lockout and Removal of Director Whiting With Notice 
2/22/2010  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/24/2010   
2/22/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/25/2010   
2/19/2010  314 - ME: Bankruptcy  2/19/2010   
2/19/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  2/19/2010   
2/18/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  2/18/2010   
2/17/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  2/17/2010   
2/11/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/12/2010   
NOTE: Objection to Plaintiffs Violation of a Rule 65(e) Re: A Bond 
2/10/2010  REL - Reply  2/11/2010   
NOTE: REPLY ON THE BOARD’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
2/9/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing  2/10/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Supplemental Affidavit of Gary Whiting 
2/9/2010  056 - ME: Hearing Set  2/9/2010   
2/9/2010  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/18/2010   
2/9/2010  RES - Response  2/12/2010   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT GARY WHITING'S MOTION TO DISMISS 
2/9/2010  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  2/18/2010   
2/2/2010  COM - Complaint  2/2/2010   
2/2/2010  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  2/2/2010   
2/2/2010  APL - Application  2/2/2010   
NOTE: (I) FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; (II) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (III) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND (IV) DIRECTOR REMOVAL ARS 10-809 
2/2/2010  OSC - Order To Show Cause  2/5/2010   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/5/2010  11:30  Order To Show Cause 
2/5/2010  15:30  Order To Show Cause 
2/11/2010  13:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
2/17/2010  9:15  Status Conference 
2/24/2010  16:00  Status Conference 
3/11/2010  13:30  Status Conference 
3/15/2010  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
3/17/2010  9:00  Evidentiary Hearing 
4/16/2010  16:30  Status Conference 
5/12/2010  13:30  Order To Show Cause 
8/23/2010  10:00  Oral Argument 
10/28/2010  15:00  Hearing 
11/4/2010  11:00  Oral Argument 
11/8/2010  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
11/9/2010  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
12/13/2010  14:40  Hearing 
2/18/2011  9:00  Oral Argument 
3/7/2011  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
7/8/2011  11:30  Status Conference 
8/30/2011  9:00  Status Conference 
11/10/2011  9:00  Hearing 
12/9/2011  14:30  Hearing 
3/23/2012  9:30  Oral Argument 
3/23/2012  9:30  Oral Argument 
7/27/2012  13:30  Status Conference 
8/17/2012  14:00  Oral Argument 
11/30/2012  14:00  Oral Argument 
1/14/2013  9:00  Status Conference 
7/17/2013  9:00  Status Conference 
1/9/2014  15:00  Oral Argument 
2/7/2014  10:15  Status Conference 
6/9/2014  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Self-Service Center